USA, et al v. Russell, et al
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00012-PGR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C Simon +1 602 514 7610 +1 602 514 7650 Tom.Simon@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 8/7/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-05387
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1708.F
Offense Level 4
181708 and 2 POSSESSION OF STOLEN MAIL
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1708.F
Offense Level 4
181708 and 2 POSSESSION OF STOLEN MAIL
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1708.F
Offense Level 4
181708 and 2 POSSESSION OF STOLEN MAIL
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 111 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt; as to dft Melinda Lou Russell; dft discharged from supervised release and proceedings in this case are terminated re: [111-1] (REW)
    LREF
    Blank 106 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
    ( FILED: 1/16/04) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Liz Lemke; admit/deny hearing held as to dft Michael Brnadon Johnson; re: revocation petition [100-1]; dft admits allegations #8, 6; remaining allegations to be dismissed at final disposition hearing ; final disposition hearing set for 9:30 2/10/04 for Michael Brandon Johnson [106-2] (REW)
      LREF
      Blank 105 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Order
      MINUTE ORDER re: [100-1] ; admit/deny hearing set for 2:30 1/12/04 for Michael Brandon Johnson [105-2] (REW)
        LREF
        Blank 99 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
        NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Darcy A Cerow appears and terminating attorney Timothy C Holtzen for USA (LCF)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 Appeal Record Returned
          Original Record received from 9CCA re [58-1]; 1 volume clerk's record; 3 transcripts (#74, 76, 78) in one expando (REW)
            LREF
            Blank 98 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
            Waiver and ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Melinda Lou Russell regarding waiver of counsel and hearing on modification of conditions of supervised release (REW)
              LREF
              Blank 94 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Order Returned Executed
              ORDER executed on 12/19/02 as to defendant Michael Brandon Johnson re order [93-1] . (REW)
                LREF
                Blank 93 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion for order for transportation for a chemical dependency evaluation by Michael Brandon Johnson [92-1]; USM directed to transport dft for chemical dependency evaluation (cc: cnsl/USM) (REW)
                  LREF
                  Blank 113 Filed: 12/2/2002, Entered: 5/24/2005 USCA Mandate
                  CERTIFIED COPY of 9CCA Mandate as to Melinda Lou Russell; appellant's motion to dismiss granted; appeal dismissed, re: 01-10388 [58-1] (cc: PGR/pts/prob/USM/USAO/dfns) (REW)
                    LREF
                    Blank 91 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                    ( FILED: 11/22/02) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Bill McNutt . re: revocation petition as to Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] ; held admit/deny hearing ; final disposition hearing set for 9:30 1/13/03 for Michael Brandon Johnson [91-2] (REW)
                      LREF
                      Blank 89 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Order
                      MINUTE ORDER re: revocation petition as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] ; admit/deny hearing reset for 1:30 11/20/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson [89-2] (REW)
                        LREF
                        Blank 87 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        ( FILED: 11/18/02) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan . re: revocation petition as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] ; preliminary exam waived ; detention hrg submitted , ; admit/deny hearing set for 10:00 11/21/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson [87-3] (REW)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 10/23/2002, Entered: 10/23/2002 Acknowledgment of Receipt of ROA
                          LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL from 9CCA Acknowledging receipt of DC record as to Melinda Lou Russell (REW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 82 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                            NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Timothy C Holtzen appears and terminating attorney Thomas C Simon for USA (REW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 81 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002, Terminated: 10/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting petition on supervised release as to Melinda Lou Russell; ORDERED on 3rd day of October 2002 that the condition of supervised release requiring the defendant to pay restitution in an amount to be determined be VACATED re: [81-1] (PHR)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Appeal Record Sent to USCA
                                Clerk's record on appeal transmitted to 9th Circuit as to Melinda Lou Russell [58-1]; 1 volume clerk's record; 3 transcripts (#74, 76, 78) in one expando (REW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Receipt
                                  RETURNED MAIL addressed to dft Melinda Lou Russell, re: mandate #77; remailed to: 8401 S Kolb Rd, Unit 420, Tucson AZ 85706-9624 (REW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 80 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                    WAIVER AND ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Michael Brandon Johnson regarding modification of probation conditions, re: judgment [70-4] (REW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 79 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                      CJA Form 24 copy 3 authorization voucher for payment of Transcript by Melinda Lou Russell ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (REW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Certificate of Record
                                        Certificate of Record Transmitted to 9th Circuit as to dft Melinda Lou Russell re [58-1] (REW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 78 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 Transcript -Appeal
                                          Court Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings for the following date(s): 5/21/01 ; re: sentencing as to Melinda Lou Russell; CtRptr: Bill McNutt (REW)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 77 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 10/17/2001 USCA Mandate
                                            CERTIFIED COPY of 9CCA Mandate as to Melinda Lou Russell dismissing the appeal as duplicative of 01-10388, re: 01-10389 dismissed [59-1] (cc: PGR/pts/prob/USM/USAO/dfns) (REW)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 75 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                              CJA Form 24 copy 3 authorization voucher for payment of Transcript by Melinda Lou Russell ; ordered by Mag Judge Morton Sitver (REW)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 74 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Transcript -Appeal
                                                Court Reporter's Transcript of Proceedings for the following date(s): 3/13/01 ; re: change of plea as to Melinda Lou Russell (taped proceedings) (REW)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 8/16/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001 USCA Mandate
                                                  CERTIFIED COPY of 9CCA Order dismissing the appeal (01-10389) as duplicative of 01-10388, re: 01-10389 dismissed [59-1] (cc: PGR/pts/prob/USM/USAO/dfns) (REW)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                    ( FILED: 8/7/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: Vicki Reger; sentencing held as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson; granting motion for downward departure by Michael Brandon Johnson [67-1] ; sentencing held see judgment for sentencing [69-2] (REW)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue sentencing for one week by Michael B Johnson [63-1] sentencing reset for 10:00 8/7/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                        Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Melinda Lou Russell as to Melinda Lou Russell; ordering transcripts for hearings of 3/13/01, 5/15/01 and 5/21/01 (REW)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 USCA Case Number
                                                          Notification by 9th Circuit of appellate docket number 01-10389 re [59-1] as to dft Melinda Lou Russell (REW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001 USCA Case Number
                                                            Notification by 9th Circuit of appellate docket number 01-10388 re [58-1] as to dft Melinda Lou Russell (REW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                              CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Melinda Lou Russell appointing Donald MacPherson ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (REW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 62 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001 Receipt
                                                                RETURNED MAIL addressed to dft Melinda Lou Russell, re: appeal packets; marked "Return to Sender, unclaimed/not in custody" (REW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 61 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Time Schedule Order
                                                                  ORDER for 9th Circuit Time Schedule as to Melinda Lou Russell re [59-1] (REW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 60 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Time Schedule Order
                                                                    ORDER for 9th Circuit Time Schedule as to Melinda Lou Russell re [58-1] (REW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 6/19/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      PAYMENT voucher by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Melinda Lou Russell for CJA atty Gregory Anthony Bartolomei (former emp)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 56 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: 6/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to withdraw as attorney by Gregory Anthony Bartolomei as to Melinda L Russell [55-1] ; terminating attorney Gregory Anthony Bartolomei for Melinda Lou Russell for appointment of counsel , appointing counsel for Melinda Lou Russell Donald W MacPherson cc: usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 6/7/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Notice of Appeal
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by dft Melinda Lou Russell from District Court judgment, re: conviction and sentence (cc: 9CCA/PGR/pts/BAS/USAO/dfns/dft) (appeal filed by dft as pro se; dft has appointed counsel) (REW) Modified on 10/17/2001
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 7/2/2001 Notice of Appeal
                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by dft Melinda Lou Russell from District Court judgment, re: conviction and sentence (cc: 9CCA/PGR/pts/BAS/USAO/dfns/dft) (appeal filed by counsel) (REW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 55 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 6/4/2001, Terminated: 6/13/2001 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                              EX PARTE MOTION to withdraw as attorney by Gregory Anthony Bartolomei as to Melinda L Russell [55-1] (former emp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 53 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Melinda Lou Russell by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (former emp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                  JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Melinda Lou Russell Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) 2. Dismissed on gov motion , sentencing for Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) 1. Committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for TWENTY (20) MONS followed by SUPERVISED RELEASE for THREE (3) YRS; SA:$100 ; RESTITUTION to be determined ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt cc: usm/pb/pts/usa/cnsl/finance/jgmdrw (former emp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                                                    PLEA agreement filed as to Melinda Lou Russell (former emp)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 51 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                      ( FILED: 5/22/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: BMcNutt ; sentencing held for Melinda L Russell ; committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prison for 20 months; supervised release of 3 years; SA:$100; all remaining counts dismissed [51-2] (former emp)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: 5/7/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                        Sentencing Memorandum filed by Melinda Lou Russell (former emp)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 47 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: 5/2/2001 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                                                                                          OBJECTION by Melinda Lou Russell to the draft pre-sentence report. (former emp)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Order
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 2:00 5/14/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson cc: pb/pts/usa/cnsl [46-2] (former emp)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 3/14/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Melinda Lou Russell cc:pb/pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt and consent of Melinda Lou Russell for referral to Magistrate Judge for change of plea. (former emp)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/14/2001, Terminated: 8/20/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ( FILED: 3/14/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver: Ct Rptr: Interpreter: Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) enters a plea of guilty to the Indictment , presentence investigation ordered , plea agreement lodged as to Melinda Lou ; sentencing set for 9:30 5/21/01 for Melinda Lou Russell [cc: usm/pb/pts/usa/cnsl/pgr] [40-5] (former emp)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial [37-1] by Michael Brandon Johnson, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [37-2] by Michael Brandon Johnson ; pretrial motions ddl set for 3/22/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson ; trial set for 9:00 4/24/01 for Melinda Lou Russell, for Michael Brandon Johnson , excludable delay in the interest of justice started cc: pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Order
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 8:45 3/13/01 for Melinda Lou Russell [38-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial [28-1], granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Melinda Lou Russell [28-2] ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 2/27/01 for Melinda Lou Russell; trial reset for 9:00 3/27/01 for Melinda Lou Russell , excludable delay in the interest of justice started cc: pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to quash warrant and issue summons by USA as to dft Michael B Johnson [27-1] (summons issued by MCC-pd) (former emp)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 1/24/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                            MOTION to continue trial [28-1] , for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Melinda Lou Russell [28-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 26 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ( FILED: 1/18/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver dft Melinda Lou Russell arraigned; not guilty to all counts plea entered; Attorney present; , ; pretrial motions due 1/25/01 for Melinda Lou Russell ; trial set for 9:00 2/27/01 for Melinda Lou Russell [cc: pts/usa/cnsl] [26-3] (former emp)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                NOTICE issued for dft Melinda Lou Russell to appear for arraignment before Magistrate Judge Morton Sitver on 1/10/01 at 10:00 cc: all cnsl/usa/pts (former emp)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT by USA attorney Thomas C Simon. Counts filed against Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) 1-2, Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 1-2 (former emp)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/26/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 CJA 20 Appointment
                                                                                                                    CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Melinda Lou Russell appointing , Gregory A Bartolomei on 10/19/00 [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson as to Melinda Lou Russell re: detention order [8-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ( FILED: 10/24/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson; dft Russell present w/ cnsl; detention hrg held dft detained as a serious flight risk and economic danger; prelim hrg is set for 10/31/00 at 9:00 a.m before Mag Judge Mathis; status hrg re prelim hrg held [7-1] re: minute entry [7-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ( FILED: 10/19/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson; defendant Russell is present w/ cnsl; detention issue reopened at the request of the dft; no objection by the USA; status hrg re prelim hrg is reset to 10/24/00 at 9:15 a.m before this Court; detention hrg is set for 10/24/00 at 9:15 a.m. before this Court [6-1] re: minute entry [6-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 10/16/2000, Entered: 10/17/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Morton Sitver as to Melinda Lou Russell re: detention order [5-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                              CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Melinda Lou Russell [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ( FILED: 10/13/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver Ct Rptr: S 00-159 granting motion for withdrawal of counsel by Melinda Lou Russell [0-0] ; terminating attorney Jane L McClellan for Melinda Lou Russell first appearance of Melinda Lou Russell ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Melinda Lou Russell appears with counsel Jane McClellan; dft proceeded with a detention hearing as pro se; Court grants leave to reopen detention for an impatient rehabilitation program; Greg Bartolomei has been assigned to represent dft at the prelim hearing; detention hearing held, dft continued detained pending trial; prelim hearing and re-appointment of counsel hearing set 10/19/00 at 3:30 pm before Mag Judge Anderson [3-3] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver appointing counsel for Melinda Lou Russell, Jane L McClellan [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Complaint
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed as to Melinda Lou Russell [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                      ORAL MOTION for withdrawal of counsel by Melinda Lou Russell [0-0] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: 10/16/2000 Arrest
                                                                                                                                        DEFENDANT Melinda Lou Russell arrested. Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (LCF)
                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?