USA v. Russell
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00012-PGR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 1:31 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas C Simon +1 602 514 7610 +1 602 514 7650 Tom.Simon@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 11/7/2007
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1708.F
Offense Level 4
181708 and 2 POSSESSION OF STOLEN MAIL
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1708.F
Offense Level 4
181708 and 2 POSSESSION OF STOLEN MAIL
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (83) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION as to Michael Brandon Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 3/17/10.(REW)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 122 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Order/Judgment Revoking Supervised ReleaseCourt Filing
    ORDER REVOKING SUPERVISED RELEASE 11/7/07 as to Michael Brandon Johnson- Committed to BOP for a term of 8 months followed by supervised release for a term of 22 months. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/7/07.(TLJ)
      LREF
      Legal Document 121 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt : Admit/Deny Hearing re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 11/6/2007. Defendant waives time for sentencing and PSR. Final Disposition Hearing held. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Elizabeth Lemke). (JIR)
        LREF
        Legal Document 120 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - FPD
        NOTICE OF FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER SUBSTITUTION: Karen M Wilkinson appearing for Michael Brandon Johnson. Attorney Lorna Ann Spencer terminated. (Wilkinson, Karen)
          LREF
          Legal Document 117 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Thomas C Simon appearing for USA. Attorney Darcy A Cerow terminated. (Simon, Thomas)
            LREF
            Legal Document 119 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
            ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to Michael Brandon Johnson. Signed by Judge Michelle H Burns on 10/4/07.(TLJ)
              LREF
              Legal Document 118 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Detention HearingCourt Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michelle H Burns : Detention Hearing oral argument supervised release as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 10/4/2007. Defendant continued detained.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (TLJ)
                LREF
                Legal Document 115 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michelle H Burns : Status Hearing as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 10/2/2007, Preliminary Revocation Hearing re: Supervised Release Violation waived as to Michael Brandon Johnson on 10/2/2007. Admit/Deny Hearing set for 11/6/2007 01:30 PM before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Detention Hearing set for 10/4/2007 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Defendant ordered temporarily detained.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (TLJ)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 116 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Warrant Returned Executed
                  Petition for Violation of Supervised Release Warrant Returned Executed on 9/28/07 as to Michael Brandon Johnson. (MAP)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 114 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Initial Appearance - Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jay R Irwin : FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. Appointment of Counsel Hearing as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 9/28/07,Initial Appearance re Revocation of Supervised Release as to Michael Brandon Johnson held on 9/28/2007. Defendant ordered temporarily detained. Status regarding Detention and Preliminary Revocation Hearing set for 10/2/07 at 11:00 a.m.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (TLJ)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Arrest
                      Arrest of Michael Brandon Johnson (AJT, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Warrant Issued
                        Supervised Release WARRANT issued for Michael Brandon Johnson ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (REW)
                          LREF
                          Blank 112 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                          PETITION TO REVOKE Supervised Release as to Michael Brandon Johnson ; petition filed on 5/9/05. (REW)
                            LREF
                            Blank 111 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt; as to dft Melinda Lou Russell; dft discharged from supervised release and proceedings in this case are terminated re: [111-1] (REW)
                              LREF
                              Blank 110 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                              AMENDED ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt revoking supervised release re: order [109-2], re: minutes [108-1], re: petition [100-1] sentencing for Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2. !!! 3/10/04 - Amended Order filed to state Supervised Release Revoked !!! !!! 2/13/04 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 31 months !!! - !!! 1/14/03 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 3 years !!! Sentenced to probation for a term of 5 years; S/A $100 (REW)
                                LREF
                                Blank 109 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt re: minutes [108-1], sentencing for Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2. !!! 2/13/04 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 31 months !!! - !!! 1/14/03 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 3 years !!! Sentenced to probation for a term of 5 years; S/A $100 (REW)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 108 Filed: 2/10/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
                                  (FILED: 2/10/04) MINUTES: Final disposition hearing held on supervised release as to Michael Brandon Johnson before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Liz Lemke; see order for sentence, re: petition [100-1] [108-1] (REW)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 107 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/4/2004 Memorandum
                                    Disposition Memorandum by dft Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 106 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                      ( FILED: 1/16/04) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Liz Lemke; admit/deny hearing held as to dft Michael Brnadon Johnson; re: revocation petition [100-1]; dft admits allegations #8, 6; remaining allegations to be dismissed at final disposition hearing ; final disposition hearing set for 9:30 2/10/04 for Michael Brandon Johnson [106-2] (REW)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 105 Filed: 12/29/2003, Entered: 12/29/2003 Order
                                        MINUTE ORDER re: [100-1] ; admit/deny hearing set for 2:30 1/12/04 for Michael Brandon Johnson [105-2] (REW)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 104 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                          ORDER of detention pending further order of the Court by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson as to Michael Brandon Johnson re: detention [104-1] (LAD)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 103 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                            ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson appointing counsel Karen Wilkinson for Michael Brandon Johnson (LAD)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 102 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                              CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Michael Brandon Johnson (LAD)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 101 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                (FILED: 12/22/03) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson initial appearance re: petition for revocation of supervised release [100-1]; appointing counsel Karen Wilkinson for Michael Brandon Johnson ; detention hearing submitted; dft continued detained pending disposition; preliminary revocation hearing waived; dft held to answer before District Court; admit/deny hearing to be set before Judge Rosenblatt [cc: all counsel] [101-2] (LAD)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 100 Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                  PETITION TO REVOKE Supervised Release as to Michael Brandon Johnson; petition filed on 11/12/03. (LAD)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank -- Filed: 12/19/2003, Entered: 12/22/2003 Arrest
                                                    DEFENDANT Michael Brandon Johnson arrested (on petition for revocation) (LAD)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 123 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 2/26/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                      Supervised Release Violation Petition Warrant Returned Executed on 12/17/03 as to Michael Brandon Johnson. (MAP)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 99 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                        NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Darcy A Cerow appears and terminating attorney Timothy C Holtzen for USA (LCF)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003 Appeal Record Returned
                                                          Original Record received from 9CCA re [58-1]; 1 volume clerk's record; 3 transcripts (#74, 76, 78) in one expando (REW)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 4/29/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            Waiver and ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Melinda Lou Russell regarding waiver of counsel and hearing on modification of conditions of supervised release (REW)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt revoking probation as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson sentencing for Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2. !!! 1/14/03 - Probation Revoked; dft committed to custody of BOP for a term of 5 months to be followed by supervised release for a period of 3 years !!! Sentenced to probation for a term of 5 years; S/A $100 ; dft remanded to custody of USM (REW)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 96 Filed: 1/14/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003 Supervised Release - Revocation HrgCourt Filing
                                                                ( FILED: 1/14/03) MINUTES: Final disposition hearing held on supervised release as to Michael Brandon Johnson before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Bill McNutt . re: petition [83-1] ; see order for ruling [96-1] (REW)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Memorandum
                                                                  DISPOSITION MEMORANDUM by dft Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Order Returned Executed
                                                                    ORDER executed on 12/19/02 as to defendant Michael Brandon Johnson re order [93-1] . (REW)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion for order for transportation for a chemical dependency evaluation by Michael Brandon Johnson [92-1]; USM directed to transport dft for chemical dependency evaluation (cc: cnsl/USM) (REW)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002, Terminated: 12/6/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                        MOTION for order for transportation for a chemical dependency evaluation by Michael Brandon Johnson [92-1] (REW)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                          ( FILED: 11/22/02) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt . Ct Rptr: Bill McNutt . re: revocation petition as to Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] ; held admit/deny hearing ; final disposition hearing set for 9:30 1/13/03 for Michael Brandon Johnson [91-2] (REW)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                            WARRANT returned executed on 11/8/02 as to Michael Brandon Johnson (custody by detainer from ASP-Safford) (REW)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 89 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Order
                                                                              MINUTE ORDER re: revocation petition as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] ; admit/deny hearing reset for 1:30 11/20/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson [89-2] (REW)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 88 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER of detention pending further proceedings by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan as to Michael Brandon Johnson, re: revocation proceedings re: detention [88-1] (REW)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 87 Filed: 11/15/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                  ( FILED: 11/18/02) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan . re: revocation petition as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] ; preliminary exam waived ; detention hrg submitted , ; admit/deny hearing set for 10:00 11/21/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson [87-3] (REW)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER by Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan appointing Karen Wilkinson as counsel for Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                      CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                        ( FILED: 11/15/02) MINUTES: before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan; initial appearance of dft Michael Brandon Johnson; Attorney present; re: petition as to Michael Brandon Johnson [83-1] appointing Karen Wilkinson as counsel for Michael Brandon Johnson , ; detention hearing set for 10:30 11/15/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson , before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan , ; preliminary exam set for 10:30 11/15/02 for Michael Brandon Johnson , before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan , [84-7] (REW)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Petition to Revoke Probation/Release
                                                                                          PETITION TO REVOKE Probation as to Michael Brandon Johnson ; petition filed on 6/19/02. (REW)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/15/2002 Arrest
                                                                                            DEFENDANT Michael Brandon Johnson arrested. (minute entry of 11/12/02 listed date of arrest as 11/12/02; subsequent returned warrant listed arrest date as 11/8/02; custody location changed as of 11/8/02) (REW) Modified on 11/18/2002
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of attorney for USA : Timothy C Holtzen appears and terminating attorney Thomas C Simon for USA (REW)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002, Terminated: 10/3/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting petition on supervised release as to Melinda Lou Russell; ORDERED on 3rd day of October 2002 that the condition of supervised release requiring the defendant to pay restitution in an amount to be determined be VACATED re: [81-1] (PHR)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 80 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  WAIVER AND ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Michael Brandon Johnson regarding modification of probation conditions, re: judgment [70-4] (REW)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 9/6/2001 Transcript
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of sentencing by Court Reporter: Vicki Reger as to Michael Brandon Johnson for the following date(s): 8/7/01 (REW)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 72 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/16/2001 Transcript Order Form - Appeal
                                                                                                      Transcript Designation and Ordering Form by Michael Brandon Johnson; ordering transcript for hearing of 8/7/01 (REW)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        JUDGMENT of Probation issued by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt for Michael Brandon Johnson Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 1. Dismissed. , sentencing for Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2. Sentenced to probation for a term of 5 years; S/A $100 , Case closed (REW)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ( FILED: 8/7/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: Vicki Reger; sentencing held as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson; granting motion for downward departure by Michael Brandon Johnson [67-1] ; sentencing held see judgment for sentencing [69-2] (REW)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                            NOTICE of filing letter by dft Michael Brandon Johnson as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Motion for Departure
                                                                                                              MOTION for downward departure by Michael Brandon Johnson [67-1] (REW)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 67 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Memorandum
                                                                                                                Sentencing Memorandum by dft Michael Brandon Johnson as to dft Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 66 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 7/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue sentencing for one week by Michael B Johnson [63-1] sentencing reset for 10:00 8/7/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson (REW)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: 7/24/2001, Terminated: 7/31/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                    MOTION to continue sentencing for one week by Michael B Johnson [63-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Michael Brandon Johnson by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (REW)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/22/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ( FILED: 5/22/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: BMcNutt ; sentencing held for Melinda L Russell ; committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prison for 20 months; supervised release of 3 years; SA:$100; all remaining counts dismissed [51-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/17/2001 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                          PLEA agreement filed as to Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 5/15/2001, Entered: 5/16/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ( FILED: 5/16/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: BMcNutt Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 2 enters a plea of guilty , , ; sentencing set for 9:30 7/30/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson ; dft to remain released pending sentencing [cc: pb/pts/usa/cnls] [49-4] (former emp) Modified on 05/17/2001
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 46 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: 4/25/2001 Order
                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 2:00 5/14/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson cc: pb/pts/usa/cnsl [46-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 45 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Michael B Johnson [44-1], granting motion to continue trial by Micheal B Johnson [44-2] ; pretrial motions ddl reset for 4/16/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson ; trial reset for 9:00 5/22/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson , excludable delay in the interest of justice started cc: pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 44 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001, Terminated: 3/23/2001 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for extension of time to file pretrial motions by Michael B Johnson [44-1] , to continue trial by Micheal B Johnson [44-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 43 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001 Other Notice
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of confession, admissions and statements purs. to Local Rule 4.11 as to Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to continue trial [37-1] by Michael Brandon Johnson, granting motion for extension of time to file pretrial motions [37-2] by Michael Brandon Johnson ; pretrial motions ddl set for 3/22/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson ; trial set for 9:00 4/24/01 for Melinda Lou Russell, for Michael Brandon Johnson , excludable delay in the interest of justice started cc: pts/usa/cnsl (former emp)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 2/27/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER ; possible chg of plea hearing set for 8:45 3/13/01 for Melinda Lou Russell [38-2] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 2/22/2001, Entered: 2/23/2001, Terminated: 2/28/2001 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to continue trial [37-1] by Michael Brandon Johnson , and for extension of time to file pretrial motions [37-2] by Michael Brandon Johnson (CMM)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 2/12/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS executed upon Michael Brandon Johnson on 2/5/01 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver setting conditions of release; reside at the Hedrick House, Tucson Bond set to PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE for Michael Brandon Johnson. (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23
                                                                                                                                                CJA Form 23 financial affidavit by Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER by Mag Judge Morton Sitver appointing counsel, Karen Wilkinson, FPD for Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/9/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ( FILED: 2/9/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Morton Sitver: first appearance of Michael Brandon Johnson ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Michael Brandon Johnson appears with counsel Karen M Wilkinson , dft Michael Brandon Johnson arraigned; not guilty to all counts plea entered; Attorney present; , location of release started , ; pretrial motions due 2/22/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson ; trial set for 9:00 3/27/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson [cc: usm/pts/usa/cnsl/pgr] [32-6] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001 Warrant Returned Unexecuted
                                                                                                                                                      Indictment WARRANT returned unexecuted as to Michael Brandon Johnson (quashed 1/23/01 and summons issued) (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 Service - Miscellanous
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS issued as to Michael Brandon Johnson ; arraignment hearing set for 10:45 2/7/01 for Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 1/23/2001, Entered: 1/24/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt granting motion to quash warrant and issue summons by USA as to dft Michael B Johnson [27-1] (summons issued by MCC-pd) (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 27 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001, Terminated: 1/23/2001 Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to quash warrant and issue summons by USA as to dft Michael B Johnson [27-1] (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Notice IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE issued for dft Melinda Lou Russell to appear for arraignment before Magistrate Judge Morton Sitver on 1/10/01 at 10:00 cc: all cnsl/usa/pts (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/3/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Warrant Issued
                                                                                                                                                                Indictment RETAINER WARRANT issued for Michael Brandon Johnson (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/18/2001 Indictment
                                                                                                                                                                  INDICTMENT by USA attorney Thomas C Simon. Counts filed against Melinda Lou Russell (1) count(s) 1-2, Michael Brandon Johnson (2) count(s) 1-2 (former emp)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/26/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ( FILED: 10/24/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson; dft Russell present w/ cnsl; detention hrg held dft detained as a serious flight risk and economic danger; prelim hrg is set for 10/31/00 at 9:00 a.m before Mag Judge Mathis; status hrg re prelim hrg held [7-1] re: minute entry [7-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/25/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ( FILED: 10/19/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson; defendant Russell is present w/ cnsl; detention issue reopened at the request of the dft; no objection by the USA; status hrg re prelim hrg is reset to 10/24/00 at 9:15 a.m before this Court; detention hrg is set for 10/24/00 at 9:15 a.m. before this Court [6-1] re: minute entry [6-1] [ 2:00-m -5387 ] (PHR)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?