USA, et al v. Perez-Coral
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:01-cr-00014-PGR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janice M Marquez +1 602 514 7500

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Phoenix Division
Filed 1/2/2001
County Maricopa
Terminated 4/2/2001
Reopened
Magistrate Case
200-mj-00406
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a)and enhanced by (b)(2) Re-Entry After Deportation
Count 1
Citation Section 8 U.S.C. § 1326A.F
Offense Level 4
81326(a)and enhanced by (b)(2) Re-Entry After Deportation
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
Flags CLOSED, DFT-SENTENCED
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 Judgment Returned Executed
JUDGMENT and commitment returned executed upon Victor Perez-Coral 5/2/01 started 5/2/01 at FCI SAF at Safford, AZ. (DMT)
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    PAYMENT voucher by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt as to Victor Perez-Coral for CJA atty Atmore L Baggot (DMT)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Victor Perez-Coral sentencing for Victor Perez-Coral (1) count(s) 1. Custody of BOP for term of FORTY THREE (43) MOS followed by supervised release for term of THREE (3) YRS. S/A: $100 ,ORD committed to custody of BOP Case closed ; ordered by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt. cc: usm, prob, pts, cnsl, immigration, order book, finance] (DMT)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Plea Agreement
        PLEA agreement filed as to Victor Perez-Coral (DMT)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
          STATEMENT of reasons for imposing sentence as to Victor Perez-Coral by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt (DMT)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
            ( FILED: 4/2/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: Bill McNutt Interpreter: Gloria Segien ; sentencing held as to dft Victor Perez-Coral, downward departure granted See jgm and commitment [17-2] (DMT)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 3/30/2001, Entered: 4/3/2001 Response to Motion
              RESPONSE by pla to objection to presentence investigation report, and supplemental objection by dft Victor Perez-Coral (DMT)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: 3/15/2001 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                SUPPLEMENT to OBJECTION by Victor Perez-Coral to pre-sentence report. (DMT)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/28/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  ( FILED: 2/28/01) MINUTES: before Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt Ct Rptr: Bill McNutt Interpreter: Sary Tavrytzky, spanish ; sentencing reset for 9:30 4/2/01 for Victor Perez-Coral Dft remanded to custody of USM [cc: prob, cnsl] [14-2] (DMT)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 2/23/2001, Entered: 2/26/2001 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report
                    OBJECTION by Victor Perez-Coral to pre-sentence report. (DMT)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 2/2/2001, Entered: 2/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Paul G. Rosenblatt that upon request of US Probation Officer sentencing reset for 9:30 2/26/01 for Victor Perez-Coral [cc:prob, cnsl] (DMT)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                        ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson of the Findings and Recommendation upon a plea of guilty as to Victor Perez-Coral. [cc:cnsl] (DMT)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                          ( FILED: 1/2/01) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson Interpreter: Louis Velasco, spanish plea hrg held Victor Perez-Coral (1) count(s) 1 enters a plea of guilty , ; sentencing set for 9:30 2/12/01 for Victor Perez-Coral , remanded to USM plea agreement lodged as to Victor Perez-Coral [cc: usm, prob, pts, cnsl, interpreter, LOA, cd] [10-4] (DMT) Modified on 01/02/2001
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                            ORDER by Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson and consent of dft to go forward with plea of guilty before a Magistrate Judge re: order [9-1] (DMT)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001 Waiver - Miscellaneous
                              WAIVER of indictment by Victor Perez-Coral (DMT)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 1/2/2001, Entered: 1/2/2001 Information - Misdemeanor
                                INFORMATION by USA attorney Janice M Marquez. Counts filed against Victor Perez-Coral (1) count(s) 1 (DMT)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 CJA 20 Appointment
                                  CJA Form 20 copy 4 as to Victor Perez-Coral appointing , Atmore Baggot on 12/3/00 [ 2:00-m -406 ] (PHR)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 12/19/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER plea hearing set for 10:00 1/2/01 for Victor Perez-Coral , before Mag Judge Lawrence O. Anderson [5-3] [ 2:00-m -406 ] (PHR)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/20/2000 Other Notice
                                      NOTICE by pla USA that no conflict exist as to VAM re dft Perez-Coral [ 2:00-m -406 ] (PHR)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2000, Entered: 12/19/2000 Waiver of Indictment
                                        WAIVER of Indictment pending by USA as to Victor Perez-Coral ; Judge drawn to hear plea: Rosenblatt [ 2:00-m -406 ] (former emp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                          ORDER of detention pending trial by Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis as to Victor Perez-Coral re: detention order [3-1] [ 2:00-m -406 ] (SMM)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                            ( FILED: 12/5/00) MINUTES: before Mag Judge Virginia A. Mathis Ct Rptr: M00-176 Interpreter: Sary Tavrytzky Bond set to SPANISH for Victor Perez-Coral. , first appearance of Victor Perez-Coral ; informed of rights, charges, etc.; , dft Victor Perez-Coral appears with counsel Atmore L Baggot; detention hearing submitted and dft Victor Perez-Coral detained as a flight risk; prelimianry hearing waived and dft Victor Perez-Coral held to ans before USDC [cc: USMS, PTS, CJA, VAM] [2-4] [ 2:00-m -406 ] (SMM)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT filed as to Victor Perez-Coral [ 2:00-m -406 ] (SMM)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/5/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Arrest
                                                DEFENDANT Victor Perez-Coral arrested. Victor Perez-Coral (1) count(s) cmp [ 2:00-m -406 ] (SMM)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 54 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?