MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-01618-JBA
District Judge Janet Bond Arterton, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 21, 2019 at 1:21 PM DT (1.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bufete MF & Co., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephan Erich Seeger +1 203 324 2296 +1 203 348 7313 seegerkid2@aol.com
No Logo Jurgen Mossack, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephan Erich Seeger +1 203 324 2296 +1 203 348 7313 seegerkid2@aol.com
No Logo Mossack Fonseca & Co., SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephan Erich Seeger +1 203 324 2296 +1 203 348 7313 seegerkid2@aol.com
No Logo Ramon Fonseca, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephan Erich Seeger +1 203 324 2296 +1 203 348 7313 seegerkid2@aol.com
v.
Netflix, Inc. Netflix, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cowdery & Murphy, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Healy +1 860 278 5555 jhealy@cowderymurphy.com
Office New Haven
Filed 10/15/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Fairfield
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None Report on Patent/Trademark Form
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
    First Memorandum in Opposition re [9] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bufete MF & Co., Ramon Fonseca, Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A.. (Seeger, Stephan)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
        LREF
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Amended Complaint
        AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected as to Parties against Netflix Inc., filed by Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Jurgen Mossack, Bufete MF & Co..(Seeger, Stephan)
          LREF
          Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Amended Complaint
            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs, filed by Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Jurgen Mossack, Bufete MF & Co..(Seeger, Stephan)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
              Memorandum in Opposition re [6] First MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Proposed Temporary Restraining Order, [3] First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , [2] First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , [5] First EXPARTE MOTION Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kate Chilton, # (2) Declaration of Christian Davin, # (3) Declaration of Tom J. Ferber, # (4) Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G, # (10) Exhibit H)(Healy, James)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
              MOTION for Attorney(s) Michael Adelman, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5487972) by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael Adelman, Esq.)(Healy, James)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                MOTION for Attorney(s) Tom J. Ferber, Esq. to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-5487967) by Netflix Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Affidavit of Tom Ferber, Esq.)(Healy, James)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER: As set forth at the telephonic conference held on October 16, 2019, Plaintiffs shall file their Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [9] by 12:00 p.m. on October 17, 2019. Defendant shall file its Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by 5:00 p.m. on October 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/16/19. (Gutierrez, A.)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Report on Patent/Trademark Form
                    AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: # (1) Copy of Complaint) (Reis, Julia)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Electronic Summons Issued
                      ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Netflix Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Stephan Erich Seeger* *810 Bedford Street, Suite #3* *Stamford, CT 06901*. (Reis, Julia)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Electronic Service Documents
                        NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of [1] Complaint, filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., [2] First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., [3] First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., [4] Memorandum in Support of Motion, filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., [5] First EXPARTE MOTION Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., [6] First MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Proposed Temporary Restraining Order filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., [7] Notice (Other) filed by Jurgen Mossack, Mossack Fonseca & Co., S.A., Ramon Fonseca, Bufete MF & Co., [8] Notice of Appearance filed by Netflix Inc., [9] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Netflix Inc., [10] Order on Pretrial Deadlines, [11] Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Netflix Inc., [12] Electronic Filing Order, [13] Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 10/16/2019. (Reis, Julia)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Netflix Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Netflix Inc. for Netflix Inc.. (Healy, James)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                            MOTION to Dismiss by Netflix Inc..Responses due by 11/6/2019 (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, # (2) Exhibit Declaration of Kate Chilton in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Healy, James)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                            NOTICE of Appearance by James John Healy on behalf of Netflix Inc. (Healy, James)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                              STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/15/2019. (Reis, Julia)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Electronic Filing OrderCourt Filing
                                ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 10/15/2019. (Reis, Julia)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Order on Pretrial Deadlines
                                  Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/14/2019. Discovery due by 4/15/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/20/2020. Signed by Clerk on 10/15/2019. (Reis, Julia)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 Notice - other
                                    First NOTICE by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A. Pursuant to FRCP 65(b) (Seeger, Stephan)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 ~Motion for Order to Show Cause
                                      First MOTION for Order to Show Cause with Proposed Temporary Restraining Order by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A.. (Seeger, Stephan)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 ~Ex Parte Motion
                                        First EXPARTE MOTION Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, Bufete MF & CO.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Arthur Ventura Jr.)(Seeger, Stephan)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 memorandum in support of motion
                                          First Memorandum in Support re [2] First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , [3] First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Arthur Ventura Jr.)(Seeger, Stephan)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 Motion for preliminary injunction
                                            First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A..Responses due by 11/5/2019 (Seeger, Stephan)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 Motion for TRO
                                              First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bufete MF & CO., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Arthur Ventura Jr.)(Seeger, Stephan)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against Netflix Inc. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5485136.), filed by MOSSACK FONSECA & CO., S.A., RAMON FONSECA, JURGEN MOSSACK, Bufete MF & CO..(Seeger, Stephan) Modified text to update parties 10/16/2019 (Anastasio, F.).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                  Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                    Judge Janet Bond Arterton added. (Oliver, T.)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 234 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?