Weinhardt v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-06644-WHO
District Judge William H. Orrick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 18, 2020 at 6:06 PM DT (11.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jennifer Weinhardt, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fears Nachawati PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew R McCarley +1 214 890 0711 +1 214 890 0712 mccarley@fnlawfirm.com
v.
Altria Group, Inc. Altria Group, Inc., Defendant
JUUL Labs, Inc. JUUL Labs, Inc., Defendant
Pax Labs, Inc. Pax Labs, Inc., Defendant
Philip Morris USA, Inc. Philip Morris USA, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Phillip Morris USA, Inc."
Office San Francisco
Filed 10/16/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County San Francisco
Terminated
Origin 8
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Proposed Summons
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                    Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Complaint
                      COMPLAINT against Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., PAX Labs, Inc., Phillip Morris USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13798326.). Filed byJennifer Weinhardt. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(McCarley, Matthew) (Filed on 10/16/2019)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 14 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?