King County v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-01664-MAT
District Judge Mary Alice Theiler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 8, 2019 at 6:37 PM ST (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo King County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Felicia Craick +1 206 623 1900 fcraick@kellerrohrback.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keller Rohrback LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gretchen Freeman Cappio +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 gcappio@kellerrohrback.com
Space Alison Smith Gaffney +1 206 623 1900 agaffney@kellerrohrback.com
Space Dean Noburu Kawamoto +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dkawamoto@kellerrohrback.com
Space Derek W Loeser +1 206 623 1900 +1 206 623 3384 dloeser@kellerrohrback.com
v.
No Logo Altria Client Services, Defendant
No Logo Altria Group Distribution Company, Defendant
Altria Group, Inc. Altria Group, Inc., Defendant
JUUL Labs, Inc. JUUL Labs, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nu Mark Innovations Ltd, Defendant
No Logo Nu Mark LLC, Defendant
Pax Labs, Inc. Pax Labs, Inc., Defendant
Office Seattle
Filed 10/16/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County King
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag JURYDEMAND
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Case Transferred Out - Email notification
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None MDL Transfer Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Notice of Related Case
      NOTICE of Related Case(s) 19-cv-1600, by Plaintiff King County. (Loeser, Derek)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Notice to Filer
        NOTICE TO FILER: re [1] Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 10/22/2019. (SNP)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 Summons issued
          Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (SNP)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
            Hon. Mary Alice Theiler added. (SNP)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Complaint
              COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Altria Client Services, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Juul Labs, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Nu Mark LLC, PAX Labs, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5968368) Attorney Derek W Loeser added to party King County(pty:pla), filed by King County. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons)(Loeser, Derek)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 17 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?