Liliana Awan v. Tesla Motors, Inc, et al
State Civil Lawsuit County Court in and for Broward County, Florida, Case No. CACE19021110

Tags
Last Updated October 23, 2019 at 12:41 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Awan, Liliana, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla Florida, Inc. Tesla Florida, Inc., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc"
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None
Order Granting Motion: FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
    Blank 37 Filed: 7/14/2021, Entered: None
    Order Granting Motion: FOR ADMISSION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
      Blank 36 Filed: 6/5/2021, Entered: None
      Calendar Call-Order Setting Trial: Calendar Call: 05-27-2022
        Blank 35 Filed: 5/17/2021, Entered: None
        Order Setting Case Management Conference: 06-04-2021
          Blank 34 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None
          Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: VERIFIED Party: Plaintiff Awan, Liliana
            Blank 33 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None
            Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: VERIFIED Party: Plaintiff Awan, Liliana
              Blank 32 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None
              Notice of Appearance
                Blank 31 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None
                Order Granting Motion to Withdraw
                  Blank 30 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: None
                  Notice of Hearing
                    Blank 29 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: None
                    Motion to Withdraw: AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS Party: Plaintiff Awan, Liliana
                      Blank 28 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None
                      Response to Request for Production
                        Blank 27 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None
                        Response to Request for Production
                          Blank 26 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None
                          Request for Production: FIRST Party: Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc
                            Blank 25 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None
                            Notice of Propounding Interrogatories
                              Blank 24 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: None
                              Amended Request to Produce
                                Blank 23 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: None
                                Request for Production of Documents
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 3/16/2020, Entered: None
                                  Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None
                                    Response to Request to Produce
                                      Blank 20 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None
                                      Confidential Envelope
                                        Blank 19 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None
                                        Order Granting Motion: ORDER GRANTING PLTF'S PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF CONTINGENCY FEE CONTRACT
                                          Blank 18 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None
                                          Order Vacating: DELETE ATTACHMENT
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None
                                            Petition: FOR APPROVAL OF CONTINGENCY FEE CONTRACT
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Service of Interrogs
                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None
                                                Request for Production of Documents
                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None
                                                  Reply to Affirmative Defenses
                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: None
                                                    Answer to Complaint: Party: Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc Defendant Tesla Florida, Inc
                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None
                                                      Agreed Order: GRANTING VERIFIED MOTION FOR ADMISSION OF STEVE W. BERMAN, ESOUIRE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE
                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None
                                                        Summons Returned Served: 10/22/2019 Party: Defendant Tesla Florida, Inc
                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None
                                                          Summons Returned Served: 10/22/2019 Party: Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc
                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None
                                                            Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice: Steve W. Berman Esq Party: Plaintiff Awan, Liliana
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None
                                                              Pro Hac Vice: Payor: GROSSMAN ROTH YAFFA COHEN PA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A195547; ; Amount: $100.00
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None
                                                                Filing Fee: Payor: GROSSMAN ROTH YAFFA COHEN PA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A188063; ; Amount: $401.00
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None
                                                                  Summons Issued Fee: Payor: GROSSMAN ROTH YAFFA COHEN PA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A188063; ; Amount: $10.00
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None
                                                                    Summons Issued Fee: Payor: GROSSMAN ROTH YAFFA COHEN PA ; Userid: CTS-fg/t ; Receipt: 20191FA1A188063; ; Amount: $10.00
                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None
                                                                      Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None
                                                                        eSummons Issuance: Party: Defendant Tesla Florida, Inc
                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None
                                                                          eSummons Issuance: Party: Defendant Tesla Motors, Inc
                                                                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            Complaint (eFiled)

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 277 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?