Neil Anderson v. Tesla Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, Case No. 37-2019-00053408-CU-BC-NC

Tags
Last Updated October 24, 2019 at 1:29 PM DT (1.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anderson, Neil Graham, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Inc.; DBA : Tesla Motors, Inc."
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None
Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Anderson, Neil Graham. Refers to: Tesla Inc.
    Blank 7 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None
    Case initiation form printed.
      Blank 6 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None
      Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/13/2020 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.
        Blank 5 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None
        Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.
          Blank 4 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None
          Summons issued.
            Blank 3 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None
            Original Summons filed by Anderson, Neil Graham. Refers to: Tesla Inc.
              Blank 2 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None
              Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Anderson, Neil Graham. Refers to: Tesla Inc.
                Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None ?
                Complaint filed by Anderson, Neil Graham. Refers to: Tesla Inc.

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 33 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?