Quercia v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-06901-WHO
District Judge William H. Orrick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2020 at 10:38 PM DT (10.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anastasia Quercia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 12th Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Brian Moll +1 312 462 1700 kmoll@molllawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by molllawgroup.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Michael Cady +1 312 462 1700 scady@molllawgroup.com
v.
Altria Group, Inc. Altria Group, Inc., Defendant
JUUL Labs, Inc. JUUL Labs, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren Michelle Loew +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 lloew@foley.com
Philip Morris USA, Inc. Philip Morris USA, Inc., Defendant
Office San Francisco
Filed 10/24/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated
Origin 6
Reopened
Lead Case
319-md-02913-WHO
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 1:19-cv-05664[Illinois Northern]
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Pro Hac Vice
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Proposed Summons
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Complaint
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 case transferred in - district transfer
                  Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:19-cv-05664. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank  MDL Member Case
                    MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 3:19-md-02913-WHO; Northern District of Illinois, 19-05664 Quercia, opened in California Northern District as 19-06901 pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 1 cc: JPMDL (wsnS-adi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2019)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change In Counsel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 case transferred in - district transfer
                        TRANSFERRED to the USDC Northern District of California the electronic record. (sxb, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Order
                          CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC Northern District of California. (sxb, )
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  terminated case
                            Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2913 Conditional Transfer Order filed 10/18/2019 (sxb, )
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendant's agreed motion to extend deadlines and reschedule is granted as follows: the initial status conference set for 10/22/2019 is vacated, and the deadlines for holding a Rule 26(f) conference and exchanging settlement proposals are also vacated. (mk)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/3/2019, Entered: 10/3/2019 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
                                SUPPLEMENT to extension of time[11] (Joint) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Loew, Lauren)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019 Notice of hearing on motion
                                  NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Michelle Loew for presentment of extension of time[11] before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 10/8/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Loew, Lauren)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: 10/2/2019, Terminated: 10/7/2019 ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
                                    MOTION by Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. for extension of time (Loew, Lauren)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 9/30/2019 Notice - other
                                      NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Juul Labs, Inc. (Loew, Lauren)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Set HearingsCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 10/22/2019 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Order on Motion to stay
                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion hearing held on 9/4/2019. For the reasons stated, the Court grants in part the agreed motion to stay proceedings pending JPML determination [5]. Specifically, the request to stay is denied with respect to any motions challenging subject matter jurisdiction, standing, or other motions under Rule 12(b)(1). Mailed notice. (jjr, )
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019 Notice of hearing on motion
                                            NOTICE of Motion by Lauren Michelle Loew for presentment of motion to stay[5] before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 9/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Loew, Lauren)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019 Notice - other
                                              NOTICE by Juul Labs, Inc. of Filing of Attorney Appearance (Loew, Lauren)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019, Terminated: 9/4/2019 Motion To Stay
                                                MOTION by Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. to stay proceedings pending JPML Motion (AGREED) (Loew, Lauren)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: 8/29/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Juul Labs, Inc. by Lauren Michelle Loew (Loew, Lauren)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anastasia Quercia by Kenneth Brian Moll (Moll, Kenneth)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anastasia Quercia by Stephen Michael Cady (Cady, Stephen)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT filed by Anastasia Quercia; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16165329. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Cady, Stephen)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  ECF Transfer In - converted docket entry
                                                          CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, )
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?