KUPPERMAN v. HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-03224-RJL
District Judge Richard J. Leon, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 30, 2019 at 6:19 PM ST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo CHARLES M KUPPERMAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sorkin Law Group APLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles J. Cooper +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ccooper@cooperkirk.com
Space Michael William Kirk +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 mkirk@cooperkirk.com
v.
Schiff, Adam Schiff, Adam, Defendant
Officially listed as "ADAM SCHIFF"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 225 9700 douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
No Logo CAROLYN B. MALONEY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 225 9700 douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "DONALD J. TRUMP"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Marshall Bernie +1 202 616 8488 +1 202 616 8470 andrew.m.bernie@usdoj.gov
Space James Mahoney Burnham +1 202 353 5049 james.burnham@usdoj.gov
Space Cristen C. Handley +1 202 305 2677 cristen.handley@usdoj.gov
Space Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
No Logo ELIOT ENGEL, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 225 9700 douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
United States House of Representatives United States House of Representatives, Defendant
Officially listed as "HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A."

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 225 9700 douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
Pelosi, Nancy Pelosi, Nancy, Defendant
Officially listed as "NANCY PELOSI"
United States House of Representatives Speaker of the House, United States House of Representatives, January 4, 2007 - January 3, 2011

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 225 9700 douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
Office Washington, DC
Filed 10/25/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County 88888
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag TYPE-E
  Entries (81) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 58 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Notice of appearance
NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth S. Theodore on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Theodore, Elisabeth)
    LREF
    Legal Document 57 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Notice - other
    NOTICE by DONALD J. TRUMP re [56] Reply to opposition to Motion, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Amended Reply)(Handley, Cristen)
      LREF
      Legal Document 56 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
      REPLY to opposition to motion re [40] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment (Reply in Support of Defendant President Donald J. Trump's Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Gilligan, James)
        LREF
        Legal Document 55 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Memorandum in opposition
        Memorandum in opposition to re [43] MOTION to Modify ADD THE HONORABLE PAUL D. IRVING AS CO-DEFENDANT filed by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
          LREF
          Legal Document 54 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Reply to opposition to Motion
          REPLY to opposition to motion re [41] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss filed by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Letter, Douglas)
            LREF
            Legal Document 53 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Notice of appearance
            NOTICE of Appearance by Sally Pei on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Pei, Sally)
              LREF
              Legal Document 52 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Notice of appearance
              NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Stanton Jones on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Jones, Robert)
                LREF
                Legal Document 51 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel F. Jacobson on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Jacobson, Daniel)
                  LREF
                  Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                  MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of [50] Defendant Donald J. Trump's Consent Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/4/2019. (lcrjl2)
                    LREF
                    Blank  Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                    MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of [44] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File a Consolidated Response Brief and to Enlarge the Page Limit, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 12/4/2019. (lcrjl2)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019, Terminated: 12/4/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                      Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Handley, Cristen)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/28/2019, Entered: 11/28/2019 Notice - other
                        NOTICE of Intent to Respond by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Letter, Douglas)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Response to motion
                            RESPONSE re [41] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant President Donald J. Trump's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Response to the House Defendants' Motion to Dismiss) filed by DONALD J. TRUMP. (Gilligan, James)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Response to motion
                                RESPONSE re [40] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts)(Letter, Douglas)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Notice of appearance
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Jose Joel Alicea on behalf of CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN (Alicea, Jose)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re [41] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss , [40] MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN. (Cooper, Charles)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019, Terminated: 12/4/2019 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                            MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Motion to modify
                                              MOTION to Modify ADD THE HONORABLE PAUL D. IRVING AS CO-DEFENDANT by CHARLES M. KUPPERMAN (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019, Terminated: 11/18/2019 Motion to clarify
                                                Joint MOTION to Clarify or, in the alternative, Joint MOTION to Modify (Without Extension) the Briefing Schedule by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bernie, Andrew)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Order on Motion to clarify
                                                  MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of President Trump and the House Defendants' joint [42] Motion for Clarification or, in the Alternative, Modification (Without Extension) of the Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that the briefing schedule set by the Court's [19] November 4, 2019 Order remains in effect. All arguments in opposition to a position taken in any November 14, 2019 dispositive motion, including any arguments President Trump or the House Defendants intend to raise in opposition to the other's position on the merits, shall be raised in opposition briefs filed on or before November 27, 2019. President Trump and the House Defendants may file reply briefs in support of their dispositive motions on or before December 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/18/2019. (lcrjl2)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 41 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                    MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss by ELIOT ENGEL, CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts, # (2) Declaration of Matthias Mitman, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Bernie, Andrew)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Notice - other
                                                        NOTICE by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY (Pittard, William)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  Order
                                                          MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of [39] Notice by John Michael Mulvaney, the status conference scheduled for this afternoon (November 12, 2019) is no longer necessary and is hereby VACATED. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall proceed on the briefing schedule set by [19] the Court's November 4, 2019 Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/12/2019. (lcrjl3)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE MOTION HEARING PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on November 11, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-30. Date of Issuance: November 11, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 12/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/9/2020.(wz)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Notice of withdrawal of motion
                                                              NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY re [26] MOTION to Intervene (Pittard, William)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Megan Barbero on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Barbero, Megan)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019, Terminated: 11/11/2019 Motion to intervene
                                                                  Emergency MOTION to Intervene and Join Motion for Access by CBS Broadcasting Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Kelley, Matthew)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Kelley on behalf of CBS Broadcasting Inc., NBCUniversal Media, LLC. (Kelley, Matthew)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                      LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASSOCIATED PRESS, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, POLITICO LLC, Reuters News & Media Inc., WP CO., LLC (Kelley, Matthew)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 32 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019, Terminated: 11/11/2019 Motion to intervene
                                                                        Emergency MOTION to Intervene and for Access to Hearing by ASSOCIATED PRESS, CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC., DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, POLITICO LLC, Reuters News & Media Inc., WP CO., LLC (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Kelley, Matthew)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Kelley on behalf of CABLE NEWS NETWORK, INC., ASSOCIATED PRESS, DOW JONES & COMPANY, INC., NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY, POLITICO LLC, Reuters News & Media Inc., WP CO., LLC (Kelley, Matthew)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document 30 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Response to motion
                                                                            RESPONSE re [26] MOTION to Intervene filed by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 29 Filed: 11/11/2019, Entered: 11/11/2019 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                              Memorandum in opposition to re [26] MOTION to Intervene filed by ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF. (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference scheduled for 11/12/2019, at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (tg)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Telephone Conference held on 11/11/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba.) (tg)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER. In light of John Michael Mulvaney's [37] Notice of Withdrawal of his Motion to Intervene, which states his intention to file his complaint as a related case, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties to this case and to Mr. Mulvaney's proposed related case shall appear for a status conference on November 12, 2019, at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon to address opposition, if any, to the related case status and to address any minor adjustments to the briefing schedule that the Court will make should the Court determine that the cases are related. However, as I indicated during the conference call today, under no circumstances will the December 10, 2019 oral argument date be delayed. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/11/2019. (lcrjl2)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Order on motion to intervene
                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Media Coalition's [32] and CBS News and NBC's emergency [35] Motions to Intervene and for Access to Hearing, it is hereby ORDERED that the motions are DENIED. The telephonic conference to which movants seek access is not under seal. Because of the time-sensitive nature of the motion that is in dispute, the conference call is being held on a federal holiday, and the courthouse is closed. The Court cannot accommodate movants' request for live access to the telephonic conference. But the Court expects a transcript of the proceeding to become available shortly after it ends, and movants may obtain a copy. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/11/2019. (lcrjl2)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 28 Filed: 11/10/2019, Entered: 11/10/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Anderson Grogg on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Grogg, Adam)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference regarding the [26] Motion to Intervene filed by John Michael Mulvaney is set for Monday, November 11, 2019, at 5:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Leon. Counsel for all parties to this suit and counsel for the proposed intervenor shall call chambers together, and the Court will hear oral argument on the Motion at that time. To the extent any party wishes to additionally respond in writing to the Motion to Intervene, the written response must be filed with the Court no later than 2:00 PM on Monday, November 11, 2019, and it must not exceed 10 pages. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/9/2019. (lcrjl2)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher C. Muha on behalf of JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY (Muha, Christopher)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019, Terminated: 11/11/2019 Motion to intervene
                                                                                              WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO NOTICE FILED 11/11/2019.....MOTION to Intervene by JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 (House Email and Subpoena), # (2) Exhibit 2 (White House Counsel Letter and OLC Opinion), # (3) Exhibit 3 (Proposed Complaint), # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Pittard, William) Modified on 11/12/2019 (znmw).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by William Bullock Pittard, IV on behalf of JOHN MICHAEL MULVANEY (Pittard, William)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                  NOTICE by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT OF TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on November 6, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-10. Date of Issuance: November 6, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/4/2020.(wz)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 Motion to vacate
                                                                                                      MOTION to Vacate [19] Order,,,,, by ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DONALD J. TRUMP served on 11/6/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/04/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Telephone Conference held on 11/6/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba.) (tg) Modified to correct date of conference on 11/8/2019 (tg).
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Telephone Conference held on 11/6/2019. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba.) (tg) Modified to correct date of conference on 11/8/2019 (tg).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that a telephonic conference is set for today, November 6, 2019, at 5:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Leon. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/6/2019. (lcrjl2)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                              NOTICE by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN (Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER. Upon further review of the [15] transcript of the October 31, 2019 status conference in this matter, and upon consideration of plaintiff's [18] November 4, 2019 letter to the Court, it is hereby ORDERED that the briefing schedule in this case is amended and clarified as follows. On or before November 14, 2019, defendants shall file any dispositive motions they intend to bring in this case. In support of their motions, defendants should raise all arguments--including both arguments relating to the justiciability of plaintiff's claims and arguments relating to the merits of plaintiff's claims--that, they contend, provide a basis for resolving plaintiff's claims as a matter of law. On or before November 27, 2019, all parties shall file any briefs in opposition, whether relating to justiciability or the merits. On or before December 4, 2019, defendants may file reply briefs in support of the grounds for resolving plaintiff's claims that were raised in their opening briefs. At the December 10, 2019 hearing, the parties should be prepared to address all dispositive issues--whether relating to justiciability or the merits--on which they have a position. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 11/4/2019. (lcrjl2)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE Letter Correspondence to Court by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN (Cooper, Charles) Modified on 11/4/2019 (jf).
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' dispositive motions due by 11/14/2019; opposition briefs by all parties due by 11/27/2019; defendants' reply briefs due by 12/4/2019. (tg)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re [18] Notice (Other) was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading in proper format. (Counsel should review LCvR 5.1 (a) CORRESPONDENCE WITH THE COURT. (jf)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ELIOT ENGEL served on 10/29/2019; HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A. served on 10/29/2019; CAROLYN B. MALONEY served on 10/29/2019; NANCY PELOSI served on 10/29/2019; ADAM SCHIFF served on 10/29/2019 (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Affidavit, # (4) Affidavit)(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct service date (zeg).
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/28/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/27/2019. (Cooper, Charles) Modified on 11/4/2019 to correct serve/answer due date (jf).
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF STATUS CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS before Judge Richard J. Leon held on October 31, 2019; Page Numbers: 1-32. Date of Issuance: November 1, 2019. Court Reporter/Transcriber: William Zaremba; Telephone number: (202) 354-3249. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, PDF or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 11/22/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2020.(wz)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Serena Maya Schulz Orloff on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Orloff, Serena)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Barry Tatelman on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Tatelman, Todd)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Josephine T. Morse on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Morse, Josephine)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Leon: Status Conference held on 10/31/2019. Defendants' Briefs are due by 11/14/2019; Plaintiff's Response is due by 11/27/2019; Replies are due by 12/4/2019; Oral Argument is set for 12/10/2019 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. (Court Reporter: William P. Zaremba) (jth)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion to continue
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of defendants' [10] Motion to Reschedule Status Conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Because the principal purpose of the October 31 status conference is simply to set a briefing schedule, and because each moving party has multiple counsel listed in the signature block on the motion, the conflict identified by defendants is not a sufficient reason to change the date of the status conference. The Court will, however, reschedule the status conference to 4:00 PM on October 31, 2019, to increase the likelihood that all counsel will be able to attend. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/30/2019. (lcrjl2)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth J. Shapiro on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Shapiro, Elizabeth)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019, Terminated: 10/30/2019 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Continue Status Conference by DONALD J. TRUMP (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Handley, Cristen)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF (Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Cristen Cori Handley on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Handley, Cristen)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Marshall Bernie on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Bernie, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Myers, Steven)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by James Mahoney Burnham on behalf of DONALD J. TRUMP (Burnham, James)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/28/2019. (lcrjl2)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to ELIOT ENGEL, HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES OF THE U.S.A., CAROLYN B. MALONEY, NANCY PELOSI, ADAM SCHIFF, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # (1) Notice and Consent)(zmc)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER. Due to the time-sensitive nature of the issues raised in this case, it is hereby ORDERED that a status conference is set for October 31, 2019, at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge Richard J. Leon. It is further ORDERED that plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Minute Order on all defendants named in the complaint, and that counsel for each defendant shall enter an appearance as soon as possible in advance of the status conference. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Richard J. Leon on 10/28/2019. (lcrjl2)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                            Case assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (zmc)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Kirk on behalf of CHARLES M KUPPERMAN (Kirk, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6481004) filed by CHARLES M KUPPERMAN. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Civil Cover Sheet, # (4) Summons, # (5) Summons, # (6) Summons, # (7) Summons, # (8) Summons, # (9) Summons, # (10) Summons, # (11) Summons)(Cooper, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?