EEOC v. REFORMED CHURCH IN
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-04709-FSH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "EQUAL EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITY COMMISSION"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anna M. Stathis +1 212 748 8508
v.
No Logo REFORMED CHURCH IN AMERICA BUILDING AND EXTENSION FUND, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
Office Newark
Filed 9/26/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Essex
Terminated 4/30/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BF, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 6/22/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
Consent Decree. Ordered that this case is closed as per Judge Faith S. Hochberg (mh)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 Terminated Case
    Case closed (mh)
      LREF
      Blank 12 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER, dismissing action as settled ( signed by Judge Faith S. Hochberg )n/m (mh)
        LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/11/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 4/9/01; The following actions were taken, [8-1] motion to amend [7-1] answer taken under advisement pursuant to Rule 78 By Mag. Judge Stanley R. Chesler (mh)
          LREF
          Blank 10 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Affidavit
          SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT of Corrado Gigante on behalf of EEOC (mh)
            LREF
            Blank 9 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001 Certification
            CERTIFICATION of MATTHEW V. DELDUCA w/attached exhibits A-B on behalf of REFORMED CHURCH IN Re: [8-1] motion to amend [7-1] answer (DD)
              LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: 3/16/2001, Terminated: 4/30/2001 Motion to Amend/Correct
              Notice of MOTION to amend [7-1] answer by REFORMED CHURCH IN, Motion set for 4/9/01 on [8-1] motion ; w/cert. of serv. (Letter Brief/PO Subm) (DD)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: 3/1/2001 Amended Answer to Complaint
                AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by REFORMED CHURCH IN AMERICA : amends [5-1] answer w/certsvc. (mh)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                  Pretrial SCHEDULING ORDER setting Amending of pleadings on 2/28/01 ; Joining of Parties 2/28/01 Discovery cutoff 6/1/01 ; Dispositive Motion due on or before 6/16/01 Pretrial conference 10:30 10/15/01 ; ( signed by Mag. Judge Stanley R. Chesler ) nm (DR)
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/8/2000, Terminated: 4/30/2001 Answer
                    ANSWER to Complaint by REFORMED CHURCH IN and certificate of service (DR)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/27/2000, Entered: 10/27/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 3:30 11/29/00 ( signed by Mag. Judge Stanley R. Chesler ) (DR)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: 10/23/2000 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                        APPLICATION by REFORMED CHURCH IN and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 11/7/00 for REFORMED CHURCH IN nm (DR)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Summons Issued
                          SUMMONS(ES) issued for REFORMED CHURCH IN ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel at One Newark Center, New Jersey) (dr) Modified on 09/28/2000
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge STANLEY R. CHESLER (dr)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ wv (dr)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 64 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?