Jory G Michael v. Tesla, Inc., Tesla Energy Operations, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Ramsey Housing Conciliation Court, Case No. 62-CO-19-4688

Tags
Last Updated October 28, 2019 at 6:30 PM EDT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Michael, Jory G, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020
Order for Dismissal
    Blank 8 Filed: 2/1/2020, Entered: 2/1/2020
    Stipulation
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None
      Notice of Settlement
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020
        Order for Judgment and Judgment
          Blank 5 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019
          Notice of Hearing
            Blank 4 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019
            Request for Continuance
              Blank 3 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None
              Notice of Hearing
                Blank 2 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None
                Affidavit of Service
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/14/2019, Entered: None
                  Statement of Claim and Summons

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 83 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?