Debretsion v. Tesla, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19040562

Tags
Last Updated March 19, 2021 at 8:34 PM DT (1.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Debretsion , Tekie, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kaufman, Scott, Attorney
No Logo Tahsildoost, Soheyl, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Breach of Contract/Warranty
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None ?
Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/10/2021 10:00 AM D- 520
    Blank 28 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None ?
    Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/10/2021 10:00 AM D- 520
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None ?
      Case Management Conference Order Issued (3 Pages)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None ?
        Proof of Service by Mail of Case management Statement Filed (2 Pages)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None ?
          Case Management Statement of Tekie Debretsion Filed (5 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None ?
            Case Management Statement of Tesla, Inc Filed (6 Pages)
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None ?
              Motion to Compel (Motion) - Dropped (2 Pages)
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None ?
                Civil Law and Motion Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                  Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (2 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: - Stip re: Binding Arbitration (3 Pages)
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Proof of Service by Mail of Stip and order Filed (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 18 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 07/13/2020 02:00 PM D- 520
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Proof of Service Filed (2 Pages)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Case Management Statement of Tekie Debretsion Filed (5 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 14 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Hearing Reset to Motion to Compel (Motion) 06/11/2020 02:00 PM D- 520
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 06/15/2020 02:30 PM D- 520
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Hearing Reset to Civil Law and Motion 04/29/2020 02:00 PM D- 520 (1 Page)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Motion to Compel (Motion) Hearing Confirmed for 04/01/2020 02:00 PM D- 520
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                          Motion to Compel (Motion) Filed for Defendant (39 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                            Hearing Reset to Case Management Conf Continuance 04/28/2020 02:30 PM D- 520
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None ?
                                              Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla, Inc Filed (1 Page)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                                  Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    Initial Case Management Conference 03/11/2020 09:30 AM D- 520 (2 Pages)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Tekie Debretsion (1 Page)
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          Complaint Breach of Contract/Warranty Filed (7 Pages)

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?