Fay et al v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-10098-LLS
District Judge Louis L. Stanton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 4, 2019 at 9:37 AM EST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ian Fay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
No Logo Kathryn Fay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheldon J Schlesinger PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
Space Jeffrey L. Haberman +1 954 320 9507 +95320950 953 320 9509 JHaberman@schlesingerlaw.com
v.
Altria Group, Inc. Altria Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony D Boccanfuso +1 212 715 1315 +1 212 715 1399 anthony_boccanfuso@aporter.com
JUUL Labs, Inc. JUUL Labs, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Evall +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 6302 jevall@gibsondunn.com
No Logo New York Smoke Shop, Inc., Defendant
Philip Morris USA, Inc. Philip Morris USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony D Boccanfuso +1 212 715 1315 +1 212 715 1399 anthony_boccanfuso@aporter.com
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/30/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None MDL Order Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 Notice of appearance
    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Louis Haberman on behalf of Ian Fay(as the parent and natural guardian of K.F., a minor), Ian Fay(individually), Kathryn Fay(individually), Kathryn Fay(as the parent and natural guardian of K.F., a minor). (Haberman, Jeffrey)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice - other
        NOTICE of Consent to Removal re: [1] Notice of Removal,. Document filed by Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Altria Group, Inc. for Philip Morris USA, Inc.. Document filed by Philip Morris USA, Inc..(Boccanfuso, Anthony)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Altria Group, Inc..(Boccanfuso, Anthony)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None Letter
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Notice of appearance
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony D Boccanfuso on behalf of Altria Group, Inc., Philip Morris USA, Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Letter
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Removal of Party
                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Joseph Evall. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: K.F.. The party was added to the case in error. (pc)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Add Party for Pleading
                            ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Plaintiffs/Petitioners JUUL Labs, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to [1] Notice of Removal,.Document filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. Related document: [1] Notice of Removal,.(Evall, Joseph)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Remand to State Court
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                Case Designated ECF. (pc)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank  Case Designation
                                  Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                    CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
                                      ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Joseph Evall re: Document No. [1] Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Add Kathryn Fay and Ian Fay with the party text "as the parent and natural guardian of K.F., a minor" for each to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (pc)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Related Case Statement
                                        ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Joseph Evall to Document No. [4] Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; Do not file a related case statement if the related case is not in the Southern District of New York. (pc)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
                                          ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Evall. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kathryn Fay, Ian Fay. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Statement of Relatedness
                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 3:19-md-02913-WHO. Document filed by JUUL Labs, Inc..(Evall, Joseph) Modified on 10/31/2019 (pc).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Altria Group, Inc. for JUUL Labs, Inc.. Document filed by JUUL Labs, Inc..(Evall, Joseph)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Evall, Joseph)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 notice of removal
                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 159047/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17865344).Document filed by JUUL Labs, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- State Court Filings, # (2) Exhibit B- Declaration of Diana Gnyp)(Evall, Joseph)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?