John C. Depp, II v. Amber Laura Heard
State Civil Lawsuit Fairfax County Circuit Court, Case No. CL-2019-002911

Tags
Last Updated October 31, 2019 at 3:51 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo John C. Depp, II, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Amber Laura Heard, Defendant
  Entries (496) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 496 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021
Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
    Blank 495 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021
    Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel
      Blank 494 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: 6/9/2021
      Defendant's Motion to Compel
        Blank 493 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: 6/2/2021
        Order Dated June 2, 2021
          Blank 492 Filed: 5/27/2021, Entered: 5/27/2021
          Foreign Subpoena for iO Tillett Wright
            Blank 491 Filed: 5/25/2021, Entered: 5/25/2021
            Foreign Subpoena for iO Tillett Wright
              Blank 490 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021
              Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer & Grounds of Defense and Supplemental Plea in Bar Praecipe
                Blank 489 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: 5/21/2021
                Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer & Grounds of Defense and Supplemental Plea in Bar
                  Blank 488 Filed: 5/12/2021, Entered: 5/12/2021
                  Order Dated May 12, 2021
                    Blank 487 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: 5/5/2021
                    Plaintiff's Proposed Order
                      Blank 486 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021
                      Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                        Blank 485 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: 4/23/2021
                        Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                          Blank 484 Filed: 4/22/2021, Entered: 4/22/2021
                          Order Dated April 22, 2021
                            Blank 483 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021
                            Order Dated April 19, 2021
                              Blank 482 Filed: 4/14/2021, Entered: 4/14/2021
                              Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Attorneys' Fees
                                Blank 481 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021
                                Defendant's Notification of Judicial Notice of Adjudicated Facts & Law
                                  Blank 480 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021
                                  Defendant's Supplemental Plea in Bar
                                    Blank 479 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021
                                    Defendant's Amended Answer and Grounds of Defense
                                      Blank 478 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021
                                      Defendant's Motion for Amended Answer & Grounds of Defense, Supplemental Plea in Bar, Schedule a Hearing, Set Briefing Schedule and Stay Discovery Praecipe
                                        Blank 477 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021
                                        Defendant's Memorandum for Amended Answer & Grounds of Defense, Supplemental Plea in Bar, Schedule a Hearing, Set Briefing Schedule and Stay Discovery
                                          Blank 476 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021
                                          Defendant's Motion for Amended Answer & Grounds of Defense, Supplemental Plea in Bar, Schedule a Hearing, Set Briefing Schedule and Stay Discovery
                                            Blank 475 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021
                                            Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                              Blank 474 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021
                                              Plaintiff's Memorandum to Compel
                                                Blank 473 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: 4/8/2021
                                                Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                  Blank 472 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: 4/7/2021
                                                  Declaration of Benjamin G. Chew
                                                    Blank 471 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: 3/31/2021
                                                    Order Dated March 31, 2021
                                                      Blank 470 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: 3/29/2021
                                                      Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration
                                                        Blank 469 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021
                                                        Order Dated March 26, 2021
                                                          Blank 468 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: 3/26/2021
                                                          Order Dated March 26, 2021
                                                            Blank 467 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: 3/12/2021
                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Wasser, Cooperman & Mandles, PC
                                                              Blank 466 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021
                                                              Order Dated March 8, 2021
                                                                Blank 465 Filed: 3/8/2021, Entered: 3/8/2021
                                                                Letter Dated March 8, 2021
                                                                  Blank 464 Filed: 3/5/2021, Entered: 3/5/2021
                                                                  Agreed Order Dated March 5, 2021
                                                                    Blank 463 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021
                                                                    Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Samuel A. Moniz as Co-Counsel for Plaintiff
                                                                      Blank 462 Filed: 2/24/2021, Entered: 2/24/2021
                                                                      Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Samuel A. Moniz
                                                                        Blank 461 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: 2/23/2021
                                                                        Praecipe
                                                                          Blank 460 Filed: 2/23/2021, Entered: 2/23/2021
                                                                          Order Dated February 23, 2021
                                                                            Blank 459 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021
                                                                            Order Dated February 22, 2021
                                                                              Blank 458 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021
                                                                              Notice
                                                                                Blank 457 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021
                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Adam Waldman
                                                                                  Blank 456 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021
                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Adam Waldman
                                                                                    Blank 455 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: 2/22/2021
                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Whitney Henriquez
                                                                                      Blank 454 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021
                                                                                      Order Dated February 19, 2021
                                                                                        Blank 453 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021
                                                                                        Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Present Audiovisual Testimony Praecipe
                                                                                          Blank 452 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: 2/19/2021
                                                                                          Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Present Audiovisual Testimony
                                                                                            Blank 451 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: 2/17/2021
                                                                                            Plaintiff's Memorandum to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                              Blank 450 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021
                                                                                              Plaintiff's Memorandum to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                Blank 449 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021
                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Children's Hospital Los Angeles
                                                                                                  Blank 448 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021
                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for iO Tillett Wright
                                                                                                    Blank 447 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021
                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for iO Tillett Wright
                                                                                                      Blank 446 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021
                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Memorandum to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                        Blank 445 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021
                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Memorandum to Compel
                                                                                                          Blank 444 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021
                                                                                                          Agreed Order Dated February 12, 2021
                                                                                                            Blank 443 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: 2/12/2021
                                                                                                            Agreed Order Dated February 12, 2021
                                                                                                              Blank 442 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021
                                                                                                              Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                Blank 441 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021
                                                                                                                Defendant's Opposition to Appointment of a Conciliator & Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                  Blank 440 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: 2/11/2021
                                                                                                                  Defendant's Opposition to Appointment of a Conciliator & Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                    Blank 439 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021
                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for American Civil Liberties Union, Inc.
                                                                                                                      Blank 438 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021
                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for American Civil Liberties Union, Inc.
                                                                                                                        Blank 437 Filed: 2/8/2021, Entered: 2/8/2021
                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Whitney Henriquez
                                                                                                                          Blank 436 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021
                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Motion to Present Audiovisual Testimony Praecipe
                                                                                                                            Blank 435 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021
                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Memorandum to Present Audiovisual Testimony
                                                                                                                              Blank 434 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021
                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Motion to Present Audiovisual Testimony
                                                                                                                                Blank 433 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: 2/5/2021
                                                                                                                                Consent Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Jessica N. Meyers
                                                                                                                                  Blank 432 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021
                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Anthony Romero
                                                                                                                                    Blank 431 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021
                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Anthony Romero
                                                                                                                                      Blank 430 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021
                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Benjamin Wizner
                                                                                                                                        Blank 429 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021
                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Benjamin Wizner
                                                                                                                                          Blank 428 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021
                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
                                                                                                                                            Blank 427 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021
                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 426 Filed: 2/4/2021, Entered: 2/4/2021
                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Elon Musk
                                                                                                                                                Blank 425 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021
                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Tasya van Ree
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 424 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021
                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Tasya van Ree
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 423 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021
                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Bianca Butti
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 422 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021
                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Bianca Butti
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 421 Filed: 2/3/2021, Entered: 2/3/2021
                                                                                                                                                        Consent Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Leo J. Presiado
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 420 Filed: 2/1/2021, Entered: 2/1/2021
                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Attorney's Fees Declaration
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 419 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: 1/27/2021
                                                                                                                                                            Order Dated January 27, 2021
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 418 Filed: 1/27/2021, Entered: 1/27/2021
                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Eric M. George
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 417 Filed: 1/26/2021, Entered: 1/26/2021
                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Deny Remainder of Defendant's Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 416 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: 1/25/2021
                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration of Benjamin G. Chew
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 415 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021
                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Answer and Grounds of Defense
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 414 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021
                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Motion for Appointment of a Conciliator & Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 413 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021
                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Motion and Memorandum to Appoint Conciliator and Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 412 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021
                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Motion for Appointment of a Conciliator & Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 411 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021
                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Response to Motion to Deny the Remainder of Defendant's Plea in Bar Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 410 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021
                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Response to Motion to Deny the Remainder of Defendant's Plea in Bar & Schedule Evidentiary Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 409 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for The Art of Elysium
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 408 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Edward White
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 407 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Edward White & Co., LLP
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 406 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Jennifer Howell
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 405 Filed: 1/21/2021, Entered: 1/21/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Tyler Hadden
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 404 Filed: 1/20/2021, Entered: 1/20/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Dated January 20, 2021
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 403 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Order Establishing Adjudication Process for Attorneys' Fees Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 402 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: 1/15/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Order Establishing Adjudication Process for Attorneys' Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 401 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Motion to Deny the Remainder of Defendant's Plea in Bar Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 400 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Memorandum to Deny the Remainder of Defendant's Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 399 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Motion to Deny the Remainder of Defendant's Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 398 Filed: 1/14/2021, Entered: 1/14/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Dated January 14, 2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 397 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Dated January 12, 2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 396 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: 1/12/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Erin Boerum
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 395 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Christi Dembrowski
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 394 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Sean Bett
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 393 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Stephen Deuters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 392 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 391 Filed: 1/11/2021, Entered: 1/11/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for LAPD Discovery Section
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 390 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 389 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 388 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Christian Carino
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 387 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Debbie Lloyd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 386 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Jack Whigham
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 385 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Laura Divenere
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 384 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Michele Mulrooney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 383 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Tracey Jacobs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 382 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: 1/7/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Wasser, Cooperman & Mandles, PC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 381 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Dated January 5, 2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 380 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Quash Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 379 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 378 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Dated January 4, 2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 377 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Opinion Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 376 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Dated December 30, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 375 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Motion for Order Establishing Adjudication Process for Attorneys' Fees Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 374 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Memorandum for Order Establishing Adjudication Process for Attorneys' Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 373 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Motion for Order Establishing Adjudication Process for Attorneys' Fees
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 372 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: 12/30/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Dated December 30, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 371 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: 12/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 370 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: 12/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 369 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: 12/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 368 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 367 Filed: 12/28/2020, Entered: 12/28/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 366 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Judge White Dated December 23, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 365 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Judge White Dated December 22, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 364 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for iO Tillett Wright
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 363 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Tasya van Ree
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 362 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Tasya van Ree
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 361 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Bianca Butti
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 360 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Bianca Butti
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 359 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Whitney Henriquez
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 358 Filed: 12/22/2020, Entered: 12/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Whitney Henriquez
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 357 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for iO Tillett Wright
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 356 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for American Civil Liberties Union, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 355 Filed: 12/15/2020, Entered: 12/15/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Dated December 15, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 354 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Greg Williams
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 353 Filed: 12/14/2020, Entered: 12/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Dated December 14, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 352 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 351 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: 12/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 350 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: 12/3/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Dated December 3, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 349 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 348 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for David Kipper
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 347 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Debbie Lloyd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 346 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Raquel Pennington
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 345 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Melanie Inglessis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 344 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for David Kipper
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 343 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: 12/1/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Debbie Lloyd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 342 Filed: 11/25/2020, Entered: 11/25/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Dated November 25, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 341 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Dated November 23, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 340 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Dated November 19, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 339 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 338 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: 11/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Motion and Memorandum to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 337 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 336 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 335 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Action Property Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 334 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Action Property Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 333 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Action Property Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 332 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Action Property Management
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 331 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Cornelius Harrell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 330 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Wasser, Cooperman & Mandles
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 329 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Laura Wasser
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 328 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Brandon Patterson
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 327 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Trinity Esparza
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 326 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Alejandro Romero
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 325 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Robin Baum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 324 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Laura Divenere
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 323 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Jack Whigham
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 322 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Christian Carino
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 321 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Tracey Jacobs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 320 Filed: 11/9/2020, Entered: 11/9/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Opposition to Reasonableness of Defendant's Attorneys' Fees and Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 319 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Dated November 6, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 318 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Dated November 6, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 317 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service for Raquel Pennington
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 316 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Affidavit of Service for iO Tillet Wright
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 315 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: 11/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of Service for Tasya Van Ree
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 314 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Consent Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 313 Filed: 11/2/2020, Entered: 11/2/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration of J. Benjamin Rottenborn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 312 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Tracey Jacobs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 311 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Christian Carino
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 310 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Jack Whigham
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 309 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Laura Divenere
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 308 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 307 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 306 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 305 Filed: 10/28/2020, Entered: 10/28/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Opposition to Reasonableness of Defendant's Attorneys' Fees and Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 304 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: 10/27/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 303 Filed: 10/27/2020, Entered: 10/27/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Dated October 27, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 302 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Elaine Charlson Bredehoft
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 301 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Sanctions Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 300 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Opposition to Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 299 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 298 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 297 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 296 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Dated October 15, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 295 Filed: 10/10/2020, Entered: 10/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Dated October 10, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 294 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum in Support of Demurrer and Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 293 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Deposition, Production of Documents and Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 292 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Elon Musk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 291 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Counterclaim Plaintiff's Response to Demurrer and Plea in Bar Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 290 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: 9/28/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Counterclaim Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Demurrer and Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 289 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for American Civil Liberties Union, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 288 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Dated September 25, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 287 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Motion for Sanctions Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 286 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 285 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 284 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 283 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 282 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 281 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions and Motions in Limine Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 280 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions and Motions in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 279 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent Order Dated September 14, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 278 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Motion to Sustain Demurrer and Plea in Bar Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 277 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Demurrer and Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 276 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Motion to Sustain Demurrer and Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 275 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Agreed Order Dated September 14, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 274 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Dated September 14, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 273 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Orders Dated September 14, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 272 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 271 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: 9/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 270 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: 9/9/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 269 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Motion for Sanctions and Motions in Limine Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 268 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Memorandum Supporting Motion for Sanctions and Motions in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 267 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Motion for Sanctions and Motions in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 266 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 265 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 264 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 263 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 262 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to File Extended Brief and For Briefing Schedule
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 261 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Motion for Briefing Schedule Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 260 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Extended Brief and For Briefing Schedule on Demurrer and Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 259 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: 8/31/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Demurrer and Plea In Bar to Counterclaims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 258 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Natasha Brooks
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 257 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 256 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 255 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 254 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Tracey Jacobs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 253 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Jack Whigham
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 252 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Christian Carino
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 251 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for LAPD Corporate Designee
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 250 Filed: 8/19/2020, Entered: 8/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Wasser, Cooperman & Mandles
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 249 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Laura Divenere
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 248 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Brandon Patterson
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 247 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Christi Dembrowski
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 246 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Melissa Saenz
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 245 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Tyler Hadden
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 244 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Robin Baum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 243 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Joel Mandel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 242 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Laura Wasser
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 241 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Edward White
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 240 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Cornelius Harrell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Trinity Esparza
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 238 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Corporate Designee of Eastern Columbia Building
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 237 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Alejandro Romero
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 236 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Corporate Designee of Eastern Columbia Building
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 235 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Custodian of Records of The Mandel Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 234 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 233 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 232 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: 8/14/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Elon Musk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 231 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Los Angeles Police Department
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 230 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for American Civil Liberties Union
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 229 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Twitter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 228 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Jennifer Howell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 227 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for The Art of Elysium
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 226 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Counterclaims
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 225 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Answer and Grounds of Defense
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 224 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Dated August 10, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 223 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Dated August 10, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 222 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: 8/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Dated August 10, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 221 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: 8/7/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 220 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: 8/7/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 219 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: 8/7/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 218 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Jennifer Howell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 217 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 216 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 215 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: 7/9/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Judicial Notification of UK Court Rulings Impacting This Matter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 214 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: 7/6/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Friday Motions Day Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 213 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 212 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 210 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 209 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Brief of Ashley Ruth Moy? as Amicus Curiae in Support of Plaintiff's Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 208 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 207 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: 6/19/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 206 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order to Withdraw Roberta Kaplan, John Quinn, Julie Fink, and Davida Brook as Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 205 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Friday Motions Day Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Friday Motions Day Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 201 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 200 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: 6/12/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 199 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: 6/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service for Children's Hospital of Los Angeles
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 198 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: 6/1/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Children's Hospital of Los Angeles
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 197 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: 5/18/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Dated May 18, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 196 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Dated May 11, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 195 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: 5/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion to Withdraw Elliot Weingarten as Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: 4/2/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Laura Divenere
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 193 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Dated April 1, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 192 Filed: 3/27/2020, Entered: 3/27/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opinion Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 191 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: 3/24/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 190 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Kate James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 189 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service for Kate James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 188 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Kate James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Stratton Films, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Elisa's Attic, LLC
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Christi Dembrowski
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Walt Disney Motion Pictures Group Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Stephen Deuters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 180 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Edward White & Co. LLP
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 179 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Sean Bett
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 178 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Edward White
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 177 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Robin Baum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Jack Whigham
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Tracey Jacobs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Christian Carino
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 173 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Lauren Shapiro
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 172 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Brandon McCulloch
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 171 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Dated January 16, 2020
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Kelly Milano
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Co-Counsel's Consent Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Stephen Deuters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Stephen Deuters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Stephen Deuters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Sean Bett
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Sean Bett
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Melissa Saenz
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Tyler Hadden
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Megan Silverman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for ZZIDIDLE, Inc. d/b/a Tourjet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Sean Bett
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Stephen Rodrick
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Stephen Deuters
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Demurrer and Plea In Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Dated December 13, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Dated December 12, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Affidavit of Service for Officer Saenz
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Affidavit of Service for Officer Hadden
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Amanda de Cadenet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Tyler Hadden
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for LAPD Discovery Section
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Melissa Saenz
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Use Prior Depositions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Use Prior Depositions Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Amended Demurrer and Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Amended Demurrer and Plea in Bar Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Dr. Connell Cowan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Debbie Lloyd
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Monroe Tinker
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Dated December 5, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Judge White Dated December 5, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Officer Melissa Saenz
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Officer Tyler Hadden
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Judge White Dated December 2, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Calendar Control Order Dated November 27, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Motion for Continuance Based on Plaintiff's Discovery Abuses
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 130 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Use Prior Depositions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Motion to Use Prior Depositions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Motion to Use Prior Depositions Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Davida Brook as Co-Counsel for Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Davida Brook
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Dated November 20, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Dated November 15, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Jerry Bruckheimer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Calendar Control Order Dated November 13, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Dated November 12, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 120 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Her Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures and for Bifurcation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 119 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures and for Bifurcation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Expert Disclosures and for Bifurcation Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 117 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Dated November 8, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 116 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Dated November 8, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 115 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Rule 4:10 Motion for an IME
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Rule 4:10 Motion for an IME Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 113 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Ellen Barkin
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Paul Bettany
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Emergency Motion to Compel and to Enforce the Court's October 18 Order and Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 110 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Responsive Pleading
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 109 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Responsive Pleading Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 108 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Opposition to the Virginia Press Association's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curia Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 107 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiff's Response to Non-Party VPA's Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 106 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Her Rule 4:10 Motion for an Independent Mental Examination of Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 105 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Rule 4:10 Motion for an Independent Mental Examination of Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 104 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 103 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Praecipe Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 102 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for iO Tillet Wright
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 101 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Joshua Drew
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 100 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Dated October 28, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 99 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Sepehr Daghighian, Hackler Daghighian Martino & Novak
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opposed Motion of the Virginia Press Association for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 97 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Appearance for Jennifer A. Nelson
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 96 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion for Leave to Withdraw Joshua Matz as Counsel of Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 95 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order from October 18, 2019 Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 94 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Continuance Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 93 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Foreign Subpoena for Elon Musk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 92 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Pleadings Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 91 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Demurrer and Plea in Bar Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 90 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Bloom, Hergott, Diemer, Rosenthal, LaViolette, Feldman, Schenkman & Goodman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 89 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 88 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Documents
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 87 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Expanded Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 86 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Her Expanded Motion to Compel Documents and Medical Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 85 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Expanded Motion to Compel Documents and Release Medical Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 84 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 83 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Motion to Compel Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 82 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Responsive Pleading Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 81 Filed: 9/23/2019, Entered: 9/23/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Filed in Chambers
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 80 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: 9/13/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order from September 13, 2019 Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 79 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 78 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 77 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Supreme Court of Virginia
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 76 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: 9/12/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent Order for Adam R. Waldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 75 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: 9/11/2019 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to Judge White
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 74 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Adam R. Waldman
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 73 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Adam R. Waldman as Co-Counsel for Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 72 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Certificate of Counsel Benjamin G. Chew
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 71 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 70 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: 9/6/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 69 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Demurrer and Plea in Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Amended Responsive Pleading
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 67 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John C. Quinn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 66 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice John C. Quinn as Co-Counsel for Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 65 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Julie Fink
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 64 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Julie E. Fink as Co-Counsel for Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 63 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua Matz
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 62 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Joshua Matz as Co-Counsel for Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 61 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Roberta A. Kaplan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Roberta A. Kaplan as Co-Counsel for Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 59 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Appearance for Joshua R. Treece
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/5/2019, Entered: 9/5/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Appearance for J. Benjamin Rottenborn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Friday Motions Day Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Foreign Subpoena for Raquel Pennington
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: 8/27/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Foreign Subpoena for Elizabeth Marz
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Foreign Subpoena for Raquel Pennington
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 51 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Foreign Subpoena for Melanie Inglessis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Foreign Subpoena for Joshua Drew
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Foreign Subpoena for Jodi Gottlieb
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Foreign Subpoena for Elizabeth Marz
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/16/2019, Entered: 8/16/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Agreed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion for Entry of a Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Affidavit of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order from Hearing on June 28, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/8/2019, Entered: 8/8/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript Attached to Order Entered August 8, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Opinion Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 41 Filed: 6/27/2019, Entered: 6/27/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 39 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss/Transfer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 38 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss/Transfer Praecipe
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent Order Admitting Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Consent Order Admitting Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Gilmore Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Attridge Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: 5/21/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent Order Admitting Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Subpoena Duces Tecum (Murphy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiff's Cover Letter for Subpoena Duces Tecum (Murphy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Vasquez Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 5/20/2019, Entered: 5/20/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: 5/10/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Consent Order Admitting Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/9/2019, Entered: 5/9/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Cover Letter for Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Weingarten Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Cover Letter for Plaintiff's Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/3/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Returned Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/30/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order for a Briefing Schedule on the Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Reporter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Reporter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/12/2019, Entered: 4/12/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Consent Order Admitting Pro Hac Vice Counsel for Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Plea In Bar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Motion for Leave for Briefing Schedule and Evidentiary Hearing on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Schwartz Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            George Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Cover Letter for Defendant's Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/29/2019, Entered: 3/29/2019 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Plaintiff Opposing Judge Pre-Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/26/2019, Entered: 3/26/2019 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Defendant Requesting Judge Pre-Assignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: 3/19/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Agreed Order from March 19, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: 3/19/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Reporter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: 3/19/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Calendar Control Order from March 19, 2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: 3/4/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Civil Case Summary Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/1/2019, Entered: 3/1/2019
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Complaint

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 766 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?