Lynn Thompson v. Tesla Motors Inc et al
State Civil Lawsuit Second Judicial District Court, Case No. CV19-02115

Tags
Last Updated November 1, 2019 at 9:18 PM EDT (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Thompson, Lynn, Plaintiff
v.
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Musk, Elon"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
No Logo Onqglobal, Inc, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc."
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None
Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7915260 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-09-2020:08:49:52
    Blank 53 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None
    Ord Granting Mtn: Transaction 7915258 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 06-09-2020:08:48:51
      Blank 52 Filed: 6/9/2020, Entered: None
      Case Stayed: CASE STAYED PENDING ARBITRATION
        Blank 51 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None
        Request for Submission: Transaction 7890368 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-22-2020:14:36:57 DOCUMENT TITLE: TESLA’S MOTION TO DISMISS LYNN THOMPSON’S COMPLAINT AND COMPEL ARBITRATION PARTY SUBMITTING: JOSEPH ORTUNO, ESQ DATE SUBMITTED: 05/22/2020 SUBMITTED BY: SJA DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE:
          Blank 50 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None
          Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7890376 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 05-22-2020:14:39:11
            Blank 49 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None
            Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7788407 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-11-2020:16:43:18
              Blank 48 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None
              Notice of Entry of Ord: Transaction 7788398 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-11-2020:16:42:14
                Blank 47 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None
                Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7775624 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-05-2020:08:16:26
                  Blank 46 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None
                  Ord Granting Mtn: MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - Transaction 7775622 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 03-05-2020:08:15:33
                    Blank 45 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None
                    Reply: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (RESPONSE TO ONQGLOBAL) - Transaction 7738042 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 02-12-2020:15:54:31
                      Blank 44 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None
                      Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7738046 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-12-2020:15:55:31
                        Blank 43 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None
                        Opposition to Mtn: OnQGlobal, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint - Transaction 7727737 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 02-07-2020:09:46:43
                          Blank 42 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None
                          Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7727848 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-07-2020:09:48:47
                            Blank 41 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None
                            Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7723922 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 02-05-2020:16:16:29
                              Blank 40 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None
                              Reply: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND - Transaction 7723895 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 02-05-2020:16:15:32
                                Blank 39 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None
                                Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7715460 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-31-2020:12:50:16
                                  Blank 38 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None
                                  Reply: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND MOTION TO STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS AND RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND - Transaction 7715393 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 01-31-2020:12:49:08
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None
                                    Opposition to Mtn: OPPOSITION TO TESLA DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO AMEND (FIRST REQUEST, SECOND AMENDMENT) - Transaction 7703618 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 01-24-2020:14:31:28
                                      Blank 36 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None
                                      Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7703651 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-24-2020:14:32:25
                                        Blank 35 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None
                                        Reply to/in Opposition: OnQGlobal, Inc.'s Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice - Transaction 7684816 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 01-14-2020:13:17:38
                                          Blank 34 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None
                                          Reply: REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND MOTION TO STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS AND RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS - Transaction 7685361 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 01-14-2020:14:56:59
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None
                                            Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7685376 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-14-2020:14:58:12
                                              Blank 32 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None
                                              Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7684848 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-14-2020:13:19:13
                                                Blank 31 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None
                                                Request for Submission: Transaction 7684816 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 01-14-2020:13:17:38 DOCUMENT TITLE: OnQGlobal, Inc.’s Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice PARTY SUBMITTING: WADE BEAVERS, ESQ DATE SUBMITTED: 01/14/2020 SUBMITTED BY: SJA DATE RECEIVED JUDGE OFFICE:
                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None
                                                  Opposition to Mtn: OPPOSITION TO ONQGLOBAL, INC.’S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - Transaction 7679534 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 01-10-2020:11:51:55
                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None
                                                    Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7679607 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-10-2020:11:54:02
                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                      Opposition to Mtn: OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION, AND MOTION TO STAY JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS - Transaction 7666987 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 01-03-2020:14:56:20
                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                        Amended Complaint: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES - Transaction 7666947 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 01-03-2020:14:52:40
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                          Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7666450 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-03-2020:12:04:37
                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                            Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7667032 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-03-2020:14:53:40
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                              Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7667051 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-03-2020:14:57:41
                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None
                                                                Supplemental: SUPPLEMENTAL CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Transaction 7666444 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-03-2020:12:03:27
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                  Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7663306 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 01-02-2020:10:08:00
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                    Statement: ONQGLOBAL, INC.'S DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO NRCP 7.1 - Transaction 7663235 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 01-02-2020:10:06:21
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                      Payment Receipted: A Payment of $213.00 was made on receipt DCDC652290.
                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                        Def 1st Appearance - CV: ONQGLOBAL, INC. - Transaction 7663235 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 01-02-2020:10:06:21
                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None
                                                                          Mtn Dismiss with Prejudice: ONQGLOBAL INC'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE AND ALTERNATIVE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION - Transaction 7663235 - Approved By: YVILORIA : 01-02-2020:10:06:21
                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                            Declaration: DECLARATION OF SERVICE, ASHLEY KLEIN FLYNN, R/A FOR TESLA MOTORS INC 12/09/2019 - Transaction 7657330 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-27-2019:11:27:24
                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                              Declaration: DECLARATION OF SERVICE, KAREEM WILLIAMS OBO ONQGLOBAL, INC 12/12/2019 - Transaction 7657330 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-27-2019:11:27:24
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7657341 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-27-2019:11:28:35
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                  Payment Receipted: A Payment of $243.00 was made on receipt DCDC651967.
                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                    Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7654081 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 12-24-2019:09:08:01
                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                      Mtn to Dismiss: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted or, in the Alternative, Motion to Compel Arbitration, and Motion to Stay Judicial Proceedings - Transaction 7653772 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 12-24-2019:09:06:45
                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                        Def 1st Appearance - CV: TESLA MOTORS, INC. - Transaction 7653772 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 12-24-2019:09:06:45
                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                          Def/Answer - Prty/Appear: ELON MUSK - Transaction 7653772 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 12-24-2019:09:06:45
                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                            Notice of Appearance: CRANE POMERANTZ & DAVID BARNEY FOR TESLA MOTORS INC., AND ELON MUSK - Transaction 7653772 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 12-24-2019:09:06:45
                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                              Payment Receipted: A Payment of $320.00 was made on receipt DCDC650160
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                Proof of Electronic Service: Transaction 7602988 - Approved By: NOREVIEW : 11-22-2019:08:41:33
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Demand for Jury: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL BY PLAINTIFF - Transaction 7602379 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 11-22-2019:08:40:35
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                    First Day Jury Fees Deposit: Transaction 7602379 - Approved By: SACORDAG : 11-22-2019:08:40:35
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Summons Issued
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Payment Receipted: A Payment of $260.00 was made on receipt DCDC648630.
                                                                                                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Complaint - Civil: Complaint - Transaction 7562628 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 10-30-2019:08:38:52
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Initial Appear. Fee Disclosure: Transaction 7562628 - Approved By: CSULEZIC : 10-30-2019:08:38:52

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 945 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?