Jane Doe v. Tesla, Inc., A Delaware Coporation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, Case No. 19STCV37665

Tags
Last Updated August 12, 2020 at 8:43 PM DT (9.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Doe, Jane, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Appell Barry M..
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Inc. A Delaware Coporation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Johnsonhartwell Cheryl Lynn
Type Other Employment Complaint Case (General Jurisdiction)
Status Pending
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 Order
re Court's Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration hearing held on 8/18/20
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 Certificate of Mailing for
    (Court Order) of 08/11/2020
      Blank 5 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 Minute Order
      Court Order
        Blank 4 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: 8/5/2020 reply
        IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION
          Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/30/2020, Entered: 7/30/2020 Opposition
          PLAINTIFF?S OPPOSITION TO PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND MOTION TO STAY LITIGATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATIONS OF PLAINTIFF JANE DOE AND BARRY M. APPELL
            Blank 2 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Motion to compel arbitration
              Blank 1 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Proof Of Personal Service

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 270 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?