Ava R-1 School District v. Juul Labs, Inic.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Missouri Western District Court, Case No. 6:19-cv-03391-DPR
Magistrate Judge David P Rush, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 4, 2019 at 1:37 AM ST (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ava R-1 School District, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wagstaff & Cartmell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Phillip Cartmell +1 816 701 1100 +1 816 531 2372 tcartmell@wagstaffcartmell.net
v.
JUUL Labs, Inc. JUUL Labs, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Juul Labs, Inic."
Office Springfield
Filed 10/31/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Douglas
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CONSENT DUE
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: 11/1/2019 MDL Notification
MDL Notification - Notice of potential tag along case for MDL 2913 with copy of complaint and docket sheet sent to MDL Panel. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix) (Keller, Jeanne)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT
    NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 11/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Keller, Jeanne)
      LREF
      Blank  Summons issued
      SUMMONS ISSUED as to Juul Labs, Inc.. (Woods, Gloria)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Complaint
        COMPLAINT against Juul Labs, Inic. filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of Ava R-1 School District. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6564911. Service due by 1/29/2020 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Cartmell, Thomas)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 5 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?