District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

Trump v. Vance, Jr.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 19-3204

Tags
Last Updated November 4, 2019 at 10:41 AM ST (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Vance, Jr., Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., Cyrus R., Defendant - Appellee
Officially listed as "Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., In His Official Capacity As District Attorney Of The Country Of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia J. Bailey
Space Christopher Conroy +1 212 335 3743
Space Carey R. Dunne +1 212 335 9216
Space James H. Graham +1 212 335 4015
Space Solomon Shinerock +1 212 335 9567
Space Allen J. Vickey +1 212 335 9297
Space Sarah Walsh +1 212 335 4378
Mazars USA, LLP Mazars USA, LLP, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry D. Bernstein +1 212 885 5511
Space Inbal Paz Garrity +1 212 885 5000
Space Nicholas Robert Tambone +1 212 885 5120
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Plaintiff - Appellant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William S. Consovoy +1 703 243 9423
Space Alan S. Futerfas +1 212 684 8400 +1 212 684 5259 asfuterfas@futerfaslaw.com
Space Marc Lee Mukasey +1 212 466 6400 marc.mukasey@mfsllp.com
Space Cameron Thomas Norris +1 865 257 0859 cam@consovoymccarthy.com
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark R. Freeman +1 202 514 5714 +1 202 514 9405 mark.freeman2@usdoj.gov
Space Gerard J. Sinzdak +1 202 514 0718
Nature of Suit 3950 - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Case Type Civil
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=19-cv-8694
Lower Court Case https://ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?caseNumber=19-cv-8694
  Entries (88) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 00207211963 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None ?
CERTIFIED OPINION, dated 11/04/2019, to SDNY (NEW YORK CITY), ISSUED.[2696841] [19-3204]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207211925 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: None ?
    OPINION, affirming in part and vacating in part the judgment of the district court and remanding the case, by RAK, DC, CFD, FILED.[2696827] [19-3204]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: None ?
      CASE, before RAK, DC, CFD, HEARD.[2686616] [19-3204]
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207183963 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None ?
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207180820 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None ?
          LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., requesting permission for each of the attoneys listed for the Appellee to bring a cell phone into the courthouse, RECEIVED. Service date 10/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2684983] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/21/2019 by DGB]--[Edited 10/21/2019 by DGB]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207179805 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None ?
            LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, withdrawing the motion for stay RECEIVED. Service date 10/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2684589] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/21/2019 by DGB]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207179406 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None ?
              LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., stating that the parties have reached an agreement on the motion for stay, RECEIVED. Service date 10/21/2019 by CM/ECF.[2684431] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/21/2019 by DGB]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207178000 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/21/2019 by CM/ECF. [2683896] [19-3204]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: None ?
                  CURED DEFECTIVE TO STAY THE SUBPOENA [116], [128], on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED.[2683825] [19-3204]
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207177632 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                    MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/18/2019 by CM/ECF. [2683727] [19-3204]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207176620 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                      MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [74] filed by Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. [2683333][124] [19-3204]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207174031 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                        REPLY BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/17/2019 by CM/ECF. [2682356] [19-3204]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207172793 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                          DEFECTIVE DOCUMENTS, motion to stay the subpoena and motion to stay the mandate, [91], [92], on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED.[2681889] [19-3204]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207171109 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                            NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/16/2019 by CM/ECF. [2681261] [19-3204]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207170874 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                              REVISED ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2681152] [19-3204]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207170236 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                                LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., requesting the argument time allotted for Appellee Mazars USA LLP, RECEIVED. Service date 10/16/2019 by CM/ECF.[2680930] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/16/2019 by DGB]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207170224 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: None ?
                                  ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. Solomon Shinerock, Esq. for Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/16/2019 by CM/ECF. [2680926] [19-3204]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                    SEALED PAPERS, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., RECEIVED.[2679940] [19-3204]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207167382 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                      MEMORANDUM BRIEF, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2679830] [19-3204]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207166472 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                        LETTER, on behalf of Appellee Mazars USA, LLP, stating that they take no position and do not request oral argument, RECEIVED. Service date 10/15/2019 by CM/ECF.[2679497] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/15/2019 by DGB]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207166443 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                          ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Jerry D. Bernstein, Esq. for Appellee Mazars USA, LLP, FILED. Service date 10/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2679487] [19-3204]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207166431 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Mazars USA, LLP, FILED. Service date 10/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2679484] [19-3204]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              MOTION, to stay mandate, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2679208] [19-3204]
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/15/2019 by CM/ECF. [2679203] [19-3204]
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207164938 Filed: 10/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2678915] [19-3204]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207164935 Filed: 10/12/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                    ORAL ARGUMENT STATEMENT LR 34.1 (a), on behalf of filer Attorney Mr. William S. Consovoy for Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/12/2019 by CM/ECF. [2678914] [19-3204]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207164623 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                      AMICUS BRIEF, on behalf of Amicus Curiae United States Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 10/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2678811] [19-3204]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207164543 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                        BRIEF, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2678780] [19-3204]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207164526 Filed: 10/11/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                          JOINT APPENDIX, volume 1 of 1, (pp. 1-199), on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/11/2019 by CM/ECF.[2678776] [19-3204]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                            ATTORNEY, Alan S. Futerfas for Donald J. Trump, in case 19-3204 , [75], ADDED.[2677774] [19-3204]
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                              CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [72], [75], on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED.[2677773] [19-3204]
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207161778 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/10/2019 by CM/ECF. [2677758] [19-3204]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207161775 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                  MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/10/2019 by email.[2677757] [19-3204]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207161427 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/10/2019 by CM/ECF. [2677637] [19-3204]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207161171 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                      DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of additional counsel, [68], on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED.[2677532] [19-3204]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/10/2019 by CM/ECF. [2677270] [19-3204]
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207159816 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING DATE ACKNOWLEDGMENT, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/10/2019 by CM/ECF. [2677050] [19-3204]
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                            ATTORNEY, Marc Lee Mukasey for Donald J. Trump, in case 19-3204 , [64], ADDED.[2676622] [19-3204]
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                              CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [58], [63], [64], on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED.[2676615] [19-3204]
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207158396 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/09/2019 by CM/ECF. [2676524] [19-3204]
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207158186 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                  DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, Notice of additional counsel, [60], on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED.[2676437] [19-3204]
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                    CURED DEFECTIVE NOTICE OF ADDITIONAL COUNSEL [57], [59], on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED.[2676432] [19-3204]
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207157393 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                      MOTION ORDER, granting motion for admission pro hac vice [32] filed by Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. [2676128][61] [19-3204]
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2676120] [19-3204]
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207157358 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2676116] [19-3204]
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207157025 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                            DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of additional counsel, [56], on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED.[2675972] [19-3204]
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207156955 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, notice of additional counsel, [54], on behalf of Appellant, Donald J. Trump, FILED.[2675889] [19-3204]
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2675758] [19-3204]
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207156108 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2675659] [19-3204]
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2675656] [19-3204]
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207156068 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2675642] [19-3204]
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                        ATTORNEY, Nicholas Robert Tambone for Appellee Mazars USA, LLP, in case 19-3204, [47], ADDED.[2675611] [19-3204]
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207155417 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                          ARGUMENT NOTICE, to attorneys/parties, TRANSMITTED.[2675379] [19-3204]
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                            CASE CALENDARING, for argument on 10/23/2019, A Panel, SET.[2675378] [19-3204]
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207154718 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mazars USA, LLP, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2675127] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207154681 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Mazars USA, LLP, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF.[2675115] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY, Jerry D. Bernstein for Appellee Mazars USA, LLP, in case 19-3204, [40], ADDED.[2675072] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY, Jerry D. Bernstein for Mazars USA, LLP, in case 19-3204 , [40], ADDED.[2675067] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                      CASE CALENDARING, for the week of 10/21/2019, PANEL A, PROPOSED.[2675046] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207154031 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Mazars USA, LLP, FILED. Service date 10/08/2019 by CM/ECF. [2674869] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207154488 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                          MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite, [14] consideration for stay pending appeal and the merits of the appeal. Appellant's brief is due on 10/11/2019 at 5:00pm. The United States Department of Justice's amicus brief in support of Appellant is due at the same time. Appellees' briefs are due on 10/15/2019 at 5:00pm. Appellant's reply brief is due on 10/17/2019 at 5:00pm. Argument will be scheduled as early as the week of 10/21/2019. The temporary administrative stay remains in effect until argument is completed, by RJL, FILED.[2675026] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/09/2019 by DGB]
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207153492 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                            MOTION ORDER, granting motion to expedite, [14] consideration for stay pending appeal and the merits of the appeal. Appellant's brief is due on 10/11/2019 at 5:00pm. The United States Department of Justice's amicus brief in support of Appellant is due at the same time. Appellees' briefs are due on 10/15/2019 at 5:00pm. Appellant's reply brief is due on 10/17/2019 at 5:00pm. Argument will be scheduled as early as the week of 10/21/2019. The temporary administrative stay remains in effect until argument is completed, by RJL, FILED. [2674671][38] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/08/2019 by EM]
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY, James H. Graham for Cyrus R. Vance Jr., in case 19-3204 , [34], ADDED.[2674304] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207152374 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2674258] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207152242 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                  MOTION, for admission pro hac vice, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674210] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207152061 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674145] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207152039 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2674136] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207151998 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                        LETTER, on behalf of Amicus Curiae United States Department of Justice, requesting a date of October 11, 2019 to file a brief in support of the appellant, RECEIVED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674120] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/07/2019 by DGB]
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207151959 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2674105] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207151885 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                            LETTER, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, requesting briefing dates, RECEIVED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF.[2674079] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/07/2019 by DGB]
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY, Carey R. Dunne for Cyrus R. Vance Jr., in case 19-3204 , [20], ADDED.[2674003] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY, Mark R. Freeman for United States Department of Justice, in case 19-3204 , [19], ADDED.[2673999] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207151671 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673998] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207151635 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, the United States Department of Justice, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673983] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/07/2019 by DGB]
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                      NEW PARTY, Amicus Curiae United States Department of Justice, ADDED.[2673948] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207151441 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS AMICUS COUNSEL, on behalf of, the United States Department of Justice , FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673912] [19-3204]--[Edited 10/07/2019 by DGB]
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                          CURED DEFECTIVE MOTION TO EXPEDITE BRIEFING SCHEDULE [13], [14], on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED.[2673890] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207151365 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION, to expedite motion, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673883] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207151002 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                              DEFECTIVE DOCUMENT, motion to expedite briefing, [11], on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED.[2673754] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION, to expedite motion, on behalf of Appellee Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by CM/ECF. [2673743] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207150807 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                  IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a temporary administrative stay is granted pending expedited review by a panel of the Court. A scheduling order will issue in the ordinary course. [8], by RJL, FILED. [2673680][10] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207150784 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION, to stay, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. Service date 10/07/2019 by email.[2673670] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY, Solomon Shinerock for Cyrus R. Vance Jr., in case 19-3204 , [1], ADDED.[2673661] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY, Cameron Thomas Norris for Donald J. Trump, in case 19-3204 , [1], ADDED.[2673616] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207150574 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[2673591] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                            PAYMENT OF DOCKETING FEE, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, district court receipt # ANYSDC-17724879, FILED.[2673590] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207150545 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                              DISTRICT COURT ORDER, dated 10/07/2019, RECEIVED.[2673578] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00207150531 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Donald J. Trump, FILED. [2673574] [19-3204]
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?