USA v. Abouammo et al
Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:19-mj-71824-MRGD-1

Tags
Last Updated April 9, 2021 at 10:13 PM EDT (7.8 months ago) SpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo USA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin Kingsley +1 415 436 6937 benjamin.kingsley@usdoj.gov
Space Colin Christopher Sampson +1 415 436 7020 +1 415 436 7009 colin.sampson@usdoj.gov
Ahmad Abouammo (1)
Office San Francisco
Filed 11/5/2019
County San Francisco
Terminated 11/19/2019
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Complaint
Citation
Offense Level 4
18951 and 181519 Acting as Agent of Foreign Government Without Notice of Attorney General and Destruction, Alteration, or Falsification of Records in Federal Investigations
Defendant Custody Status Custody Other Jurisdiction
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
Transcript of Proceedings as to Ahmad Abouammo held on November 19, 2019, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter Belle Ball, CSR, CRR, RDR, telephone number (415)373-2529, belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/27/2020. (ballbb15S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
    *** DISREGARD - FILED IN ERROR (REFILED UNDER 19-cr-621-EMC) *** Transcript of Proceedings as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah held on 11/12/19, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court ReporterRuth Levine Ekhaus, RDR, FCRR, CSR No. 12219, telephone number (415)336-5223/ruth_ekhaus@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (Related documents(s) [13], [14]) (rreS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2019) Modified on 12/17/2019 (rjdS, COURT STAFF).
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
      TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/12/2019 before Judge William Alsup for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus (rjdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Transcript OrderCourt Filing
        TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11-12-19 before Judge William Alsup by USA for Court Reporter Ruth Ekhaus (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Defendant Merged
          Case Merged as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah MERGED to Criminal Case No. CR 19-621 EMC (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2019)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Declaration in Support
            Declaration of Jodi Linker in Support of [11] Memorandum in Opposition by Ahmad Abouammo as to Ahmad Abouammo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Linker, Jodi) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Memorandum in opposition
              Memorandum in Opposition by Ahmad Abouammo Defendant's Opposition to United States' Motion to Revoke Release Order (Linker, Jodi) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 10 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/14/2019 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Detention Hearing as to Ahmad Abouammo held on 11/12/2019. Government is ordered to make appropriate arrangements for defendant to be present at next hearing. Pretrial Officer is directed to look into the possibility of a halfway house for defendant. Further Detention Hearing set for 11/19/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (Total Time in Court: 27 minutes.) Court Reporter: Ruth Levine Ekhaus. Plaintiff Attorney: Colin Sampson, Halie Hoffman. Defendant Attorney: Jodi Linker (special appearance). Pretrial Officer: Denise Mancia. Defendant Present: No. Defendant in Custody: Yes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER SETTING BRIEFING AND HEARING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR REVOCATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ORDER. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/12/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER [6] PENDING RULING ON MOTION FOR REVOCATION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE ORDER OF RELEASE ON BOND CONDITIONS as to Ahmad Abouammo. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/8/2019. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
                      APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by USA as to Ahmad Abouammo Appeal taken from case Paula L. McCandlis, Western District of Washington. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1-5)(Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
                        LREF
                        Blank  set/reset hearings
                        Set/Reset Hearing as to Defendant Ahmad Abouammo re [7] Order: Detention Hearing set for 11/12/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor before Judge William Alsup. (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 warrant returned executed
                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 11/5/2019 as to Ahmad Abouammo. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Colin Christopher Sampson appearing for USA. Benjamin Kingsley appearing for the USA. (Sampson, Colin) (Filed on 11/7/2019)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 11/6/2019. (jlgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2019)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Order to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                Order to Seal Case as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 11/5/19. (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Application
                                  APPLICATION to seal case as to Ahmad Abouammo, Ahmed Almutairi, Ali Alzabarah (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT as to Ahmad Abouammo (1), Ahmed Almutairi (2), Ali Alzabarah (3). (lskS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2019) (jlgS, COURT STAFF).
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?