MEDLIN v. SIEMENS INFORMATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:00-cv-05776-JWB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo STEVEN MEDLIN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space HOWARD A. BACHMAN +1 732 937 4450
v.
Siemens Information and Communication Networks, Inc. Siemens Information and Communication Networks, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "SIEMENS INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATIONS NETWORKS, INC."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
Office Newark
Filed 11/22/2000
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Monmouth
Terminated 11/28/2001
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case :00- -00000[L-4205-00]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BB, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 Terminated Case
Case closed (mn)
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 11/26/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER, dismissing action w/out costs. ( signed by Chief Judge John W. Bissell )n/m (mn)
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/26/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
      AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER setting Dispositive Motion for summary judgment due on or before 12/1/01; Any final pretrial order will await disposition of that motion ( signed by Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke ) n/m (DD)
        LREF
        Blank 9 Filed: 1/31/2001, Entered: 2/1/2001 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER setting Discovery cutoff 9/1/01 ; Status conference 11:00 9/25/01 ; Settlement conference 11:00 9/25/01 ; etc. ( signed by Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke ) n/m (DD)
          LREF
          Blank 8 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/30/2001 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER, for ALAN D. BERKOWITZ to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke ) n/m (DD)
            LREF
            Blank 7 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Certification
            CERTIFICATION of Alan D. Berkowitz on behalf of SIEMENS INFORMATION Re: admission pro hac vice (bl)
              LREF
              Blank 6 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/25/2001 Certification
              CERTIFICATION of Matthew V. DelDuca on behalf of SIEMENS INFORMATION Re:admission pro hac vicer (bl)
                LREF
                Blank 5 Filed: 12/15/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000, Terminated: 11/28/2001 Answer
                ANSWER to Complaint by SIEMENS INFORMATION; w/cert. of serv. (DD)
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/12/2000, Entered: 12/13/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER, setting scheduling conference for 10:00 1/30/01 ( signed by Mag. Judge G. D. Haneke ) (DR)
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 11/29/2000, Entered: 11/29/2000 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                    APPLICATION by SIEMENS INFORMATION and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 12/15/00 for SIEMENS INFORMATION (DD)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge G. DONALD HANEKE (dr)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: 11/28/2000 Notice of Removal
                        NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SIEMENS INFORMATION from Superior C ourt of Monmouth County w/copies of Cmp w/ Jury demand, Summons, Certf of Service filed. FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 292876 (dr)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 54 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?