Thurman-Silva v. Tesla Motors, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-00683-LRH-WGC
District Judge Larry R. Hicks, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 10, 2020 at 3:27 PM DT (8.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Thurman-Silva, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Nevada Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William J Geddes +1 775 684 4606 +1 775 684 4601 will@TheGeddesLawFirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by thegeddeslawfirm.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristen R. Geddes +1 775 853 9455 +1 775 853 6899 Kristen@TheGeddesLawFirm.com
v.
No Logo Employbridge Southwest, LLC , Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors, Inc."
No Logo Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/4/2020, Entered: 5/4/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                ORDER granting ECF No. [27] Stipulation. Thussenkrupp Materials NA, Inc's Reply to the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. [11]) is due by May 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: 5/1/2020, Terminated: 5/4/2020 stipulation
                  STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Order for an Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (First Request) re [26] Response, [11] Motion to Dismiss, by Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 response
                    RESPONSE to [11] Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Robert Thurman-Silva. Replies due by 5/4/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1-3, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits 4, A, B, C, # (3) Exhibit Exhibits 5-7) (Geddes, Kristen)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Certificate of Interested Parties
                      CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Employbridge Southwest, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Staffing Solutions Southwest, Inc for Employbridge Southwest, LLC added. (Lane, Dora)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting ECF No. [20] Stipulation. Plaintiff's Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. [11]) is due by Monday, April 27, 2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: 4/21/2020 Notice: Attorney Action Required
                          NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to [22] Certificate of Interested Parties. Attorney Dora Lane advised to refile your certificate of interested parties. Page 1 of document [22] states that there is a parent company and corporate affiliates, i.e. Staffing Solutions Southwest, Inc. The certificate of interested party entry has a clear warning in the entry stating: "Please Note: you must add ALL Corporate Parents and/or Corporate Affiliates to the case. Failing to add all interested parties listed on the certificate will result in a notice from the court." Furthermore, LR 7.1-1 (a), in regards to certificate of interested parties, states in part: "These representations are made to enable judges of the Court to evaluate possible disqualifications or recusal. Therefore it is requested that you properly refile your certificate of interested parties. (no image attached) (WJ) Modified on 4/22/2020 COMPLIED [25] (WJ).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Certificate of Interested Parties
                            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Employbridge Southwest, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lane, Dora)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020 Answer to amended complaint
                              ANSWER to [2] Amended Complaint, filed by Employbridge Southwest, LLC.(Lane, Dora)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/20/2020, Entered: 4/20/2020, Terminated: 4/21/2020 stipulation
                                STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to File Response re [11] Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Robert Thurman-Silva. (Geddes, Kristen)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/15/2020, Entered: 4/15/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting nunc pro tunc ECF No. [16] Stipulation : Response to ECF No. Re: [11] Motion to Dismiss due by 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: 4/14/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                    ORDER granting ECF No. [17] Stipulation. Employbridge Southwest, LLC's (DBA Prologistix) Answer to the First Amended Complaint (ECF No. [2]) is due by April 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: 4/13/2020, Terminated: 4/14/2020 stipulation
                                      Fourth STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) to Respond to re [2] Amended Complaint, by Defendant Employbridge Southwest, LLC. (Lane, Dora)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: 4/13/2020, Terminated: 4/15/2020 stipulation
                                        First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Response re [11] Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Robert Thurman-Silva. (Geddes, Kristen)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: 4/13/2020 Notice of change of address
                                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Kristen R. Geddes. (Geddes, Kristen)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 Certificate of Interested Parties
                                            CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Tesla Motors, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Salmonson, Dana)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 Answer
                                              ANSWER to Complaint First Amended Complaint filed by Tesla Motors, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc..(Martin, Anthony)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 Answer to amended complaint
                                                ANSWER to [2] Amended Complaint, Defendant thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Tesla Motors, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/14/2020.(Salmonson, Dana) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: 3/30/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss [2] Amended Complaint, by Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. Responses due by 4/13/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Declaration of Dana B. Salmonson, # (2) Exhibit A-1 Notice of Right to Sue 550-2018-00854, # (3) Exhibit A-2 Notice of Right to Sue 550-2018-00856, # (4) Exhibit A-3 Letter dated 11.15.19 re Amended Charge) (Salmonson, Dana)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER approving ECF No. [9] Stipulation re ECF No. [2] First Amended Complaint. Tesla Motors Inc, Thyssenkrupp Materials NA Inc, and Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA Inc answers due 3/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: 3/19/2020, Terminated: 3/20/2020 stipulation
                                                      Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) Stipulation and Order for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Third Request) re [8] Order on Stipulation,,, [7] Stipulation, by Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting ECF No. [7] Stipulation. Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., and Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc. have up to and including March 19, 2020 in which to respond to the First Amended Complaint (ECF No. [2]). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/11/2020, Terminated: 3/11/2020 stipulation
                                                          Second STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) Stipulation and Order for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Second Request) re [6] Order on Stipulation,,, [5] Stipulation, by Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER granting ECF No. [5] Stipulation to Extend Time re ECF No. [1] Complaint. Thyssenkrupp and Tesla's answer/response due by 3/12/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020, Terminated: 2/12/2020 stipulation
                                                              STIPULATION Stipulation and Order for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (First Request) re [2] Amended Complaint, by Defendants Tesla Motors, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Materials NA, Inc., Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain Services NA, Inc.. (Salmonson, Dana)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 summons returned executed
                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Robert Thurman-Silva re [3] Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit) (Geddes, Kristen)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Summons issued
                                                                  SUMMONSES ISSUED as to All Defendants re ECF No. [2] Amended Complaint. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Summons, # (3) Summons) (KR)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: 1/8/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                    First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Robert Thurman-Silva. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 4/7/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Summons Def Prologistix, # (2) Summons Def Tesla, # (3) Summons Def Thyssenkrupp Materials, # (4) Summons Def Thyssenkrupp Supply Chain) (Geddes, Kristen)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5772453) by Robert Thurman-Silva. Proof of service due by 2/10/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Geddes, Kristen) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
                                                                      Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for ENE. (WJ)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
                                                                        Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry for ENE. (WJ)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
                                                                          Case randomly assigned to District Judge Larry R. Hicks and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 92 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?