Marks v. Tesla Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, Case No. 37-2019-00059839-CU-CO-CTL

Tags
Last Updated November 15, 2019 at 4:22 PM ST (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marks, John L, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Td Auto Finance Llc, Defendant
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 11 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None
Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/07/2020 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.
    Blank 10 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Court Filing
    Case reassigned from Judge Wohlfeil, Joel R. to Kenneth Medel effective 11/14/2019
      Blank 9 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None
      Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil was vacated.
        Blank 8 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
        Affidavit - Other (of Venue) filed by Marks, John L.
          Blank 7 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
          Original Summons filed by Marks, John L.
            Blank 6 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
            E-filing transaction partially accepted.
              Blank 5 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
              Case initiation form printed.
                Blank 4 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None
                Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/24/2020 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.
                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                  Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.
                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                    Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Marks, John L. Refers to: Tesla Inc; TD Auto Finance LLC
                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None
                      Complaint filed by Marks, John L. Refers to: Tesla Inc; TD Auto Finance LLC

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 361 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?