In Re Application of: iFinex Inc.
Federal Court Proceeding California Central District Court, Case No. 8:19-mc-00021-UA-KES
District Judge Unassigned, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 15, 2021 at 3:59 PM ST (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rondell Clyde Monroe, Respondent
No Logo Application of iFinex Inc., In Re
No Logo iFinex Inc., Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher J. Beal +1 858 638 1400 cbeal@dmalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by mjllaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Jason Lee +1 949 551 1575 +1 214 800 5107 michael@mjllaw.com
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Subpoena (AO 88) Issued
SUBPOENA IN A CIVIL CASE issued as to Rondell "Rhon" Clyde Monroe. (sbou)
    LREF
    Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Notice of Lodging
    NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held, [4] (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Subpoena)(Lee, Michael)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html formCourt Filing
        NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
          LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 3 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?