Price v. Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-07595

Tags
Last Updated March 4, 2020 at 2:35 PM ST (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jackie Price, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conor John Dale +1 415 394 9400 +1 415 394 9401 conor.dale@jacksonlewis.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conor John Dale +1 415 394 9400 +1 415 394 9401 conor.dale@jacksonlewis.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 11/18/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case RG19038815[County of Alameda Superior Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ProSe
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Receipt
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Remark
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Remand
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Appear by Telephone
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/21/2019, Entered: None Request For Judicial Notice
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Order Reassigning Case
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Remand
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Declaration in Support
                                          Declaration of Charissa Sebesta in Support of [1] Notice of Removal, filed byCeva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors. (Related document(s)[1]) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Declaration in Support
                                            Declaration of Karen Lubrano in Support of [1] Notice of Removal, filed byCeva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[1]) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                              Civil Cover Sheet by Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors . (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 notice of removal
                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California (Diversity Jurisdiction) from County of Alameda Superior Court. Their case number is RG19038815. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-13902107). Filed byTesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors, Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/18/2019)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?