U C Berkeley v. Ibrahim
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19002088

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 19, 2019 at 8:07 PM EST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
UC Berkeley UC Berkeley, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ibrahim, Jason, Defendant
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Appeal of Parking Ticket
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None ?
Appeal of Parking Ticket Granted (1 Page)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: None ?
    Parking Appeals Commenced and Completed (2 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2019, Entered: None ?
      Proof of Service - Parking Appeal Filed (1 Page)
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None ?
        Parking Appeals 03/05/2019 02:00 PM D- 511 (1 Page)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: None ?
          Appeal of Parking Ticket Filed (2 Pages)
            Request RequestSpace

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 4 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?