General Motors LLC et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-13429-PDB-DRG
District Judge Paul D Borman, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 18, 2020 at 9:22 AM DT (7.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "General Motors Company"
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey K Lamb +1 313 465 7404 jlamb@honigman.com
General Motors LLC General Motors LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Honigman Miller Schwartz & Cohn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey K Lamb +1 313 465 7404 jlamb@honigman.com
v.
No Logo Alphons Iacobelli, Defendant
FCA US LLC FCA US LLC, Defendant
No Logo Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, NV, Defendant
No Logo Jerome Durden, Defendant
No Logo Michael Brown, Defendant
Office Detroit
Filed 11/20/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Wayne
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (76) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Notice - Other
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service of Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit*
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal - 6th Circuit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/10/2020, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/8/2020, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/8/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Requiring Responsive Pleading*
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Requiring Responsive Pleading*
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Judgment*
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/7/2020, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Appeal Order/Opinion/Judgment
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Appear*
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/26/2020, Entered: None Appear*
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: None Appearance
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/15/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Hearing on Motion*
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/6/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/17/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: None Supplemental Brief
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion - Free
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Withdrawal of Attorney
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/16/2020, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Joinder/Concurrence
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Motion - Free
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None Extend Time to - Free
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Extend Time to - Free
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: None Extend Time to - Free
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Extend Time to - Free
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: None Appearance
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
                                                                                                                                                    STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors LLC (Lamb, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations
                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by General Motors Company (Lamb, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7494511 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Eastern District of Michigan, 17-cr-20406-PDB-RSW, Judge Paul D. Borman] (Lamb, Jeffrey)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 103 times.

                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?