USA v. Li
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cr-00760-VSB

Tags
Last Updated September 2, 2020 at 9:35 AM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Andrew Hartman +1 212 637 2357 +1 212 637 2527 scott.hartman@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Arditi Naftalis +1 212 637 2310 +1 212 637 2527 joshua.naftalis@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Yanliang Li, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Yanliang Li (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/22/2019
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO VIOLATE THE FOREIGN CORRUPT PRACTICES ACT
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1621.F
Offense Level 4
181621.F PERJURY GENERALLY
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1519.F
Offense Level 4
181519.F DESTRUCTION, ALTERATION OR FALSIFICATION OF RECORDS IN FEDERAL INVESTIGATIONS
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/14/19)(jm)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
      Attorney update in case as to Yanliang Li, Hongwei Yang. Attorney Joshua Arditi Naftalis,Scott Andrew Hartman for USA added. (jm)
        LREF
        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
        Case as to Yanliang Li, Hongwei Yang ASSIGNED to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge (jm)
          LREF
          Blank  Case Designated ECF.
          Case Designated ECF as to Yanliang Li, Hongwei Yang. (jm)
            LREF
            Blank  Indictment Unsealed
            INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Yanliang Li, Hongwei Yang. (jm)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: 10/25/2019 Sealed document
              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Sealed document
                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Indictment (Sealed)
                  SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1. (jm) Modified on 11/20/2019 (jm).
                    LREF

                    Space Space

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 153 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?