USA v. Ralston
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cr-00774-JMF

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 9, 2021 at 4:14 PM DT (1.1 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jessica K. Feinstein +1 212 637 1946 jessica.feinstein@usdoj.gov
Space Olga I Zverovich +1 914 993 1927 olga.zverovich@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Roger Ralston, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Neil Katz +1 609 734 4380 peter@pkatzlegal.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Roger Ralston (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/29/2019
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349.F MAIL AND WIRE FRAUD CONSPIRACY
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341.F MAIL FRAUD
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343.F WIRE FRAUD
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956-4999.F MONEY LAUNDERING CONSPIRACY
Count 5-6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956-4999.F MONEY LAUNDERING
Count 7
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1957-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181957-4999.F MONEY LAUNDERING
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (98) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/9/2021, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 97 Filed: 6/7/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/30/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Letter
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/29/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Letter
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None Letter Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/24/2021, Entered: 3/24/2021 Court Filing
                ORDER granting 76 unopposed LETTER MOTION re: Permission to Travel as Modification of Bail Conditions for Roger Ralston. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/24/2021) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: None Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                    SUPPLEMENTAL LETTER by Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz dated March 23, 2021 re: Supplemental Response to Judge Furman's Request Regarding the April 5, 2021 Conference (Katz, Peter) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz, Esq. dated March 23, 2021 re: Permission to Travel as Modification of Bail Conditions for Roger Ralston. Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Katz, Peter) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: 3/23/2021 LetterCourt Filing
                        JOINT LETTER by Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz dated March 23, 2021 re: Judge Furman's March 22, 2021 Order Requesting a Joint Response (Katz, Peter)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/22/2021, Entered: 3/22/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER as to Roger Ralston: There is a proceeding in this matter scheduled for April 5, 2021. Counsel are directed to confer and, within two business days of this Order, submit a joint letter indicating their views on (1) whether the proceeding should be held in person or remotely; and (2) whether, if permitted under the Constitution, the Federal Rules, and the CARES Act, the Defendant consents to a remote proceeding and/or to waiving his/her appearance altogether. SEE ORDER. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/22/2021) (ab)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                              ORDER as to Roger Ralston, Christopher Wright, Steven Hooper for the limited unsealing of the indictment and warrants. (Filed under seal on 11/14/19). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 11/14/19)(jm)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 indictment
                                  (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Roger Ralston (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s, 5s-6s, 7s, Christopher Wright (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5-6, 7, Steven Hooper (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5-6, 7. (jm) (Filed under seal on 10/29/19)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/25/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER as to Roger Ralston, Christopher Wright, Steven Hooper unsealing the s(1) superseding indictment. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/29/21)(jm)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT on [67] LETTER MOTION Bail Modification/Travel Request as to Roger Ralston: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Doc. #67. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/13/20201) (ab)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: 1/13/2021, Terminated: 1/13/2021 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz dated 1/13/21 re: Bail Modification/Travel Request . Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Katz, Peter)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: 1/6/2021 Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: 1/5/2021 letterCourt Filing
                                              JOINT LETTER by Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz dated January 5, 2021 re: Joint Response to the Court's January 4, 2021 Letter (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Peter)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: 1/4/2021 OrderCourt Filing
                                                ORDER as to Roger Ralston: There is a proceeding in this matter scheduled for January 19, 2021. Counsel are directed to confer and, within two business days of this Order, submit a joint letter indicating their views on whether the proceeding should be held or if it should be adjourned (and, if so, for how long). (See ORDER.) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/4/2021) (ab)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document 63 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER as to Roger Ralston: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/29/2020) (ab)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                      JOINT LETTER by USA as to Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from USA dated October 6, 2020 re: Joint Response to the Court's October 5 Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Speedy Trial Act Order)(Zverovich, Olga)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER as to Roger Ralston. There is a proceeding in this matter scheduled for October 19, 2020. Counsel are directed to confer and, within two business days of this Order, submit a joint letter indicating their views on whether the proceeding should be held or if it should be adjourned (and, if so, for how long). If either party believes that the proceeding should be held, counsel should explain why and indicate their views on (1) whether the proceeding should be held in person or remotely; and (2) whether, if permitted Court under the Constitution, the Federal Rules, and the CARES Act, the Defendant consents to a remote proceeding and/or to waiving his/her appearance altogether. If the Defendant is detained, counsel should identify the facility in which the Defendant is held and their USMS number; if the Defendant is not detained, counsel should indicate whether the Defendant would be capable of participating in a remote proceeding. Counsel is advised that, for the foreseeable future, some facilities (including the Metropolitan Correctional Center and the Metropolitan Detention Center) may require that any inmate appearing in court be quarantined for 14 days upon returning from their appearance. After reviewing the parties' joint letter, the Court will issue an order indicating whether the proceeding will be held and, if so, how; and addressing any other relevant deadlines and information. If a proceeding is held, it may have to be at a different time. To that end, counsel should indicate in their joint letter dates and times during the week of the currently scheduled proceeding that they would be available for a proceeding, whether in person or remote. In the event of a remote proceeding, counsel should review and comply with the Court's Emergency Individual Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-jesse-m-furman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 10/5/2020)(jbo)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Roger Ralston on [58] LETTER by Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz, Esq. dated July 28, 2020 re: Advising the Court of Pretrial Services' Position regarding the Electronic Monitoring Condition of Mr. Ralston's Release. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. In contrast to the application in April, Defendant has made a showing that the GPS condition may inhibit him from obtaining necessary medical care. In light of that, the COVID-19 pandemic, Pretrial's lack of objection, and the other conditions of release, the Court concludes that the GPS monitoring can be removed. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/28/2020) (lnl)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                            LETTER by Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz, Esq. dated July 28, 2020 re: Advising the Court of Pretrial Services' Position regarding the Electronic Monitoring Condition of Mr. Ralston's Release (Katz, Peter)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020 Order on Motion to DirectCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER denying [45] Motion to Direct Disclosure and Discovery as to Roger Ralston (1). The motion is denied for the reasons stated on the record during the videoconference held earlier today. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/27/2020) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Pretrial Conference as to Roger Ralston held via video/teleconference on 7/27/2020. Defendant present (out on bail) with attorney Peter Katz. AUSA Olga Zverovich present. Court reporter present. -- [45] Motion to Direct Disclosure and Discovery denied. The Court reserves decision on the Defendant's application for modification of bail. The next Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 4:00 PM. Time is excluded in the interests of justice from 7/27/2020 until 10/19/2020. (ab)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Pretrial Conference as to Roger Ralston held via video/teleconference on 7/27/2020. Defendant present (out on bail) with attorney Peter Katz. AUSA Olga Zverovich present. Court reporter present. -- [45] Motion to Direct Disclosure and Discovery denied. The Court reserves decision on the Defendant's application for modification of bail. The next Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 4:00 PM. Time is excluded in the interests of justice from 7/27/2020 until 10/19/2020. (ab)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: 7/24/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER as to Roger Ralston: The conference scheduled for July 27, 2020, at 2:15 p.m. is hereby scheduled to occur as a video/teleconference using the Skype for Business platform. To optimize the quality of the video feed, only the Court, the Defendant, defense counsel, and counsel for the Government will appear by video for the proceeding; all others will participate by telephone. Due to the limited capacity of the Skype system, only one counsel per party may participate. Co-counsel, members of the press, and the public may access the audio feed of the conference by calling 917-933-2166 and using access code 817736008. In advance of the conference, Chambers will email those participating by video a link to be pasted into their browser. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/24/2020) (ab)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Roger Ralston on re: [54] JOINT LETTER by Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz, Esq. dated July 17, 2020 re: Response to Judge Furman's July 15th Inquiry. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall appear remotely for a conference on July 27, 2020, at 2:15 p.m. The Court will issue an order in the coming days that provides further information on accessing the conference. (Telephone Conference set for 7/27/2020 at 02:15 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/17/2020) (ap)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: 7/17/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                        JOINT LETTER by Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz, Esq. dated July 17, 2020 re: Response to Judge Furman's July 15th Inquiry (Katz, Peter)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER terminating [52] LETTER MOTION as to Roger Ralston (1): Per the Court's prior Order, the parties shall submit a joint letter by tomorrow. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/16/2020) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/16/2020, Entered: 7/16/2020, Terminated: 7/16/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                            AMENDED LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz, Esq. dated July 16, 2020 re: [49] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz dated July 15, 2020 re: [48] Order, re: Joint Request for Adjournment of Motion Schedule and Status Conference ., [50] Order on Letter Motion,,, [48] Order, re: AMENDED Joint Request for Adjournment of Motion Schedule and Status Conference . Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Katz, Peter)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Roger Ralston re [45] FIRST MOTION to Direct Disclosure and Discovery.. (Zverovich, Olga)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER denying [49] LETTER MOTION seeking an adjournment of the pretrial conference as to Roger Ralston (1). The Court concludes that the conference (which is scheduled for July 29, 2020, not July 27, 2020) should be held given, among other things, the pending motion and counsel's indication that the Government plans to supplement its disclosures. Assuming the Defendant consents, the Court is prepared to hold the conference remotely using Skype for Business. Counsel shall confer and, no later than Friday, July 17, 2020, submit a joint letter (1) indicating whether the Defendant consents to proceeding remotely; (2) identifying dates and times during the week of July 27, 2020, that all parties would be available for a conference; (3) indicating whether counsel and the Defendant could participate using Skype for Business; and (4) if not, proposing alternative platforms. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/15/2020) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/15/2020, Entered: 7/15/2020, Terminated: 7/15/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz dated July 15, 2020 re: [48] Order, re: Joint Request for Adjournment of Motion Schedule and Status Conference . Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Katz, Peter)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: 7/13/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER as to Roger Ralston: In light of the circumstances surrounding COVID-19, the Court is unable to hold the upcoming conference in this case in person. Counsel are directed to confer and, within two business days of this Order, submit a joint letter indicating their views on whether a conference is necessary or if it should be adjourned (and, if so, for how long). (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/13/2020) (ab)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Roger Ralston re [45] FIRST MOTION to Direct Disclosure and Discovery.. (Katz, Peter)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020 Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                        AFFIRMATION of Peter Katz in Support as to Roger Ralston re [45] FIRST MOTION to Direct Disclosure and Discovery.. (Katz, Peter)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: 7/2/2020, Terminated: 7/27/2020 Motion to Direct
                                                                                          FIRST MOTION to Direct Disclosure and Discovery. Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Katz, Peter)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/1/2020, Entered: 7/1/2020, Terminated: 7/1/2020 Motion to Direct
                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION to Direct Disclosure and Discovery. Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Law, # (2) Motion Affirmation)(Katz, Peter) Modified on 7/1/2020 (ka).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error
                                                                                              ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR as to Roger Ralston: Notice to Attorney Katz, Peter to RE-FILE Document [44] FIRST MOTION to Direct Disclosure and Discovery. ERROR(S): Filing Error of Attachment #1-2. Supporting Memorandum & Affirmations must be filed individually. Event code located under Replies, Opposition and Supporting documents.***NOTE: Separate docket entry for each. (ka)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Roger Ralston (1) granting [42] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz dated June 16, 2020 re: Travel Request for Roger Ralston. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Doc. #42. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/16/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020, Terminated: 6/17/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz dated June 16, 2020 re: Travel Request for Roger Ralston. Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Katz, Peter)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: 6/1/2020 Order on motion for extension of time
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: 5/29/2020, Terminated: 5/29/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                      JOINT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Joint Letter by Defendant and Government dated May 29, 2020 re: [38] Order,,, re: Request for Adjournment of Motion Schedule and Status Conference . Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Katz, Peter)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: 5/29/2020, Terminated: 6/1/2020 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions and to Adjourn Status Conference. Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Katz, Peter) Modified on 5/29/2020 (ka).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                          NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Roger Ralston: Notice to Attorney Katz, Peter to RE-FILE Document [39] JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions and to Adjourn Status Conference. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/27/2020, Entered: 5/27/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER as to Roger Ralston: In light of the circumstances surrounding COVID-19, the Court is unable to hold the upcoming conference in this case in person. Counsel are directed to confer and, within two business days of this Order, submit a joint letter indicating their views on whether a conference is necessary or if it should be adjourned (and, if so, for how long). Given that it may be difficult to hold a conference (even by telephone or video) for some time, the parties are encouraged to address in their letter any issues that would have been addressed at a conference, including but not limited to discovery, motions, trial date, and exclusion of time under the Speedy Trial Act. If appropriate, the parties may submit a proposed order for the Court's consideration. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/27/2020)(See ORDER as further set forth) (lnl)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 37 Filed: 5/8/2020, Entered: 5/8/2020 Sealed document
                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT held in Chambers. (ab)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020 Bill of particulars
                                                                                                                BILL OF PARTICULARS by USA as to Roger Ralston . (Feinstein, Jessica)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [33] LETTER MOTION seeking modification of bail as to Roger Ralston (1). Because the Defendant fails to identify information "that was not known to the movant at the time of the hearing and that has a material bearing on the issue whether there are conditions of release that will reasonably assure the appearance of such person as required," 18 U.S.C. Section 3142(f), the motion is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/23/2020) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: 4/23/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Jessica Feinstein dated April 23, 2020 re: Opposition to Ralston's Request for Bail Modification Document filed by USA. (Feinstein, Jessica)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: 4/22/2020, Terminated: 4/23/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz, Esq. dated April 22, 2020 re: Application for Modification of Conditions of Release . Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Katz, Peter)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Pretrial Conference as to Roger Ralston held on 2/27/2020. Defendant present (out on bail) with attorney Peter Katz. AUSA Olga Zverovich and Jessica Feinstein present. Miguel Valencia (IRS) present. Court reporter present. -- Motions due by 6/1/2020. Opposition due by 6/15/2020. Replies due by 6/22/2020. The next Pretrial Conference is scheduled for 6/8/2020 at 3:30 PM. Time is excluded in the interests of justice from 2/27/2020 until 6/8/2020. (ab)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: 2/13/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Roger Ralston on [31] CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defense Motions: Application GRANTED. Counsel is reminded requests of this nature should be made by letter motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 2/13/2020) (ab)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Roger Ralston: Notice to Attorney Katz, Peter to RE-FILE Document [31] CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defense Motions. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020, Terminated: 2/12/2020 motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defense Motions. Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Katz, Peter) Modified on 2/13/2020 (ka).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [29] LETTER MOTION seeking temporary modification of bail as to Roger Ralston (1). Future applications will be denied unless they include the views of both the Government and Pretrial Services. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/22/2020) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020, Terminated: 1/22/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Peter Katz, Esq. dated January 21, 2020 re: Travel Request for Roger Ralston. Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Katz, Peter)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Roger Ralston on re: [27] LETTER by USA as to Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Olga Zverovich dated December 31, 2019 re: Request for Adjournment of Discovery Deadline. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 1/2/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/31/2019, Entered: 12/31/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Roger Ralston addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Olga Zverovich dated December 31, 2019 re: Request for Adjournment of Discovery Deadline Document filed by USA. (Feinstein, Jessica)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Roger Ralston. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/25/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Roger Ralston re: Conference held on 11/25/19 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Roger Ralston...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/13/2019)(lnl)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019, Terminated: 12/13/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman re: Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Roger Ralston. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Zverovich, Olga)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Roger Ralston: Eric Richard Nitz and Sara Ellen Margolis of MoloLamken LLP withdraw as counsel for Defendant Roger Ralston in this action. All pleadings, notices of hearing, and other filings in this matter should be served upon Peter Neil Katz. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Doc. #[21]. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/10/2019) (ab)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019, Terminated: 12/10/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Eric R. Nitz dated December 10, 2019 re: Substitution of Counsel . Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Stipulation)(Nitz, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Note to Attorney to Re-File Document - Non-ECF Document Error
                                                                                                                                                    ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Nitz, Eric as to Roger Ralston: to E-MAIL Dcument Document No. [20] Stipulation and [Proposed] Order. This document is not filed via ECF. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019, Terminated: 12/9/2019 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Eric R. Nitz, Sara E. Margolis, New Attorney: Peter Katz . Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Eric Nitz, # (2) Affidavit of Sara Margolis, # (3) Exhibit Certificate of Service)(Nitz, Eric) Modified on 12/10/2019 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Peter Neil Katz appearing for Roger Ralston. Appearance Type: Retained. (Katz, Peter)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Roger Ralston. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 11/25/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Roger Ralston re: Conference held on 11/25/19 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/30/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [14] Motion for Eric Richard Nitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Roger Ralston (1). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/2/2019) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019, Terminated: 12/2/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Eric Richard Nitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Eric R. Nitz, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Exhibit DC Bar Certificate of Good Standing, # (4) Exhibit Virginia Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Nitz, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [12] LETTER MOTION seeking temporary modification of bail as to Roger Ralston (1). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 12/2/2019) (Text Only Order) (Furman, Jesse)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [14] MOTION for Eric Richard Nitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019, Terminated: 12/2/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Roger Ralston dated November 27, 2019 re: Request to Travel . Document filed by Roger Ralston. (Margolis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sara Ellen Margolis appearing for Roger Ralston. Appearance Type: Retained. (Margolis, Sara)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Initial Appearance/Arraignment as to Roger Ralston held on 12/6/2019. AUSA Olga Zverovich present. Def.'s counsel Sara Margolis & Eric Nitz present. Defendant arraigned; pleads not guilty. (See BAIL DISPOSITION as set forth) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 bond
                                                                                                                                                                            Appearance Bond Entered as to Roger Ralston in amount of $500,000.00. Agreed conditions of release; $500,000 PRB; 1 FRP (Defendant's wife); Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SD Florida; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; Location monitoring with GPS; Defendant to pay all of part of cost of location monitoring, as determined by Pretrial Services; Defendant to continue or seek employment; Defendant not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon; Defendant to be released on own signature; No possession or use of control substances unless prescribed by a licensed medical professional; No contact with any victims, witnesses or co-conspirators. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions attached. Defendant Released.] (bw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/2/2020: # (1) Amended Appearance Bond) (jw).
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Plea entered by Roger Ralston (1) Count 1,2,3,4,5-6,7 Not Guilty. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Olga I Zverovich appearing for USA. (Zverovich, Olga)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER as to Roger Ralston: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for an arraignment and pretrial conference in this matter on November 25, 2019 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 1105 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Centre Street, New York, New York. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 11/21/2019) (ab)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/20/19)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                      Case as to Roger Ralston ASSIGNED to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                        INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Roger Ralston. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Designated ECF as to Roger Ralston. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Roger Ralston addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from AUSA Olga Zverovich dated 11/18/19 re: Accordingly, the Government respectfully requests that the Court issue an order unsealing Indictment and the arrest warrant for Ralston as of 9:30 am on Tuesday, November 19, 2019...ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 11/18/19)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Sealed document
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mhe)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5-6, 7. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 202 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?