Jackson v. Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:19-cv-07657-LHK
District Judge Lucy H. Koh, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 6, 2021 at 12:33 AM ST (4.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Byron Jackson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Benjamin Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Na'il Benjamin +1 415 633 8833 nbenjamin@benjaminlawgroup.com
Space Allyssa Briana Villanueva +1 510 897 9967 +1 510 439 2632 allyssa@benjaminlawgroup.com
v.
No Logo Ceva Logistics, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conor John Dale +1 415 394 9400 +1 415 394 9401 conor.dale@jacksonlewis.com
Space Fraser Angus McAlpine +1 415 394 9400 +1 415 394 9401 fraser.mcalpine@jacksonlewis.com
No Logo Randstad Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kiran Singh Lopez +1 415 732 1102 +1 415 397 8549 klopez@seyfarth.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conor John Dale +1 415 394 9400 +1 415 394 9401 conor.dale@jacksonlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lindsay Stevens Fitch +1 916 448 0159 +1 916 288 6305 lfitch@seyfarth.com
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tesla Motors"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conor John Dale +1 415 394 9400 +1 415 394 9401 conor.dale@jacksonlewis.com
Space Fraser Angus McAlpine +1 415 394 9400 +1 415 394 9401 fraser.mcalpine@jacksonlewis.com
Office San Jose
Filed 11/20/2019
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case 19CV356275[County of Santa Clara Superior Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ADRMOP
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/6/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/5/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/31/2020, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: 11/17/2020 order on motion for judgment on the pleadingsCourt Filing
          Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [36] Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings with leave to amend.(lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/11/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  set deadlines/hearings
              ***Set Deadlines/Hearings per [48] Order: Further Case Management Conference CONTINUED from 9/30/2020 to 12/16/2020 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 12/9/2020. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2020)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/24/2020, Entered: 9/24/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                  Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh granting [47] Stipulation to Continue September 30, 2020 Case Management Conference. (lhklc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2020)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: 9/23/2020, Terminated: 9/24/2020 stipulation
                    STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re [45] Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone,,, TO CONTINUE SEPTEMBER 30, 2020 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Randstad Inc.. (Lopez, Kiran) (Filed on 9/23/2020)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 46 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 terminate hearings
                      **CLERK'S NOTICE** VACATING September 10, 2020 Hearing on [36] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Matter to be determined on the papers without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2020)
                        LREF
                        Blank 45 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: 6/22/2020 Order on Motion to Appear by TelephoneCourt Filing
                        Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Finding as Moot [39] Motion to Appear by Telephone; Finding as Moot [40] Motion to Appear by Telephone. The Case Management Conference has been continued to September 30, 2020 per [44] Case Management Order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: 6/22/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                          Case Management Order. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 06/22/2020. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  set deadlines/hearings
                            ***Set/Reset Hearings per [44] Case Management Order:Further Case Management Conference set for September 30, 2020 at 2:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Hearing on Dispositive Motions set for July 29, 2021 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Final Pretrial Conference set for September 24, 2021 at 1:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Jury Trial (4 day estimate) set for November 1, 2021 at 9:00 AM each day in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                              Order Proposing Case Schedule. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 06/18/2020. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020 Joint Case Management Statement
                                JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT OF ALL PARTIES filed by Randstad Inc.. (Lopez, Kiran) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/18/2020, Entered: 6/18/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                  Order to File Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 06/18/2020. (lhklc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2020)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020, Terminated: 6/22/2020 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                    MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Ceva Logistics, Tesla Motors. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/17/2020, Entered: 6/17/2020, Terminated: 6/22/2020 Motion to Appear by Telephone
                                      MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Randstad Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Lopez, Kiran) (Filed on 6/17/2020)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                        REPLY (re [36] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings w/Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) Reply In Support of Tesla's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 5/28/2020)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/21/2020, Entered: 5/21/2020 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [36] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings w/Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof ) filed byByron Jackson. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proposed Order)(Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 5/21/2020)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/7/2020, Entered: 5/7/2020, Terminated: 11/17/2020 motion for judgment on the pleadingsCourt Filing
                                            MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings w/Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Ceva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. Motion Hearing set for 9/10/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 5/21/2020. Replies due by 5/28/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Dale, Conor) (Filed on 5/7/2020)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: 4/24/2020 order on motion to remandCourt Filing
                                              Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying [20] Motion to Remand.(lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2020)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 34 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: 3/20/2020 terminate hearings
                                                **CLERK'S NOTICE** VACATING April 23, 2020 Hearing on [20] MOTION to Remand. Matter to be determined on the papers without oral argument. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2020)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: 3/19/2020 Clerks Notice
                                                  **CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE** Pursuant to this notice, the Initial Case Management Conference is CONTINUED from March 25, 2020 to June 24, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California before the Hon. Lucy H. Koh. A Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior to the new CMC date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2020)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: 3/18/2020 Joint Case Management Statement
                                                    JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Byron Jackson. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 3/18/2020)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: 3/6/2020 Order on StipulationCourt Filing
                                                      Order by Judge Lucy H. Koh Denying [30] Stipulation to Continue the March 25, 2020 Case Management Conference.(lhklc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2020)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020, Terminated: 3/6/2020 stipulation
                                                        STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Initial Case Management Conference filed by Ceva Logistics. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 3/3/2020)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: 2/27/2020 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                          ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 2/27/2020)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: 12/27/2019 Reply to Opposition/Response
                                                            REPLY (re [20] MOTION to Remand ) filed byByron Jackson. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 12/27/2019)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Request For Judicial Notice
                                                              Request for Judicial Notice re [21] Opposition/Response to Motion, In Support of Defendants Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. and Tesla, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s)[21]) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                Declaration of Christine Woo in Support of [21] Opposition/Response to Motion, to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s)[21]) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                  Declaration of Karen Lubrano in Support of [21] Opposition/Response to Motion, to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s)[21]) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                    Declaration of Kiran S. Lopez in Support of [21] Opposition/Response to Motion, to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s)[21]) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                      Declaration of Charles Grayson in Support of [21] Opposition/Response to Motion, to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Related document(s)[21]) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                        Declaration of Doug Evans In Support of Defendants Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. and Tesla, Inc.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Opposition/Response to Motion
                                                                          OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re [20] MOTION to Remand ) Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 12/20/2019)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019, Terminated: 4/24/2020 Motion to remandCourt Filing
                                                                            MOTION to Remand filed by Byron Jackson. Motion Hearing set for 4/23/2020 01:30 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge Lucy H. Koh. Responses due by 12/20/2019. Replies due by 12/27/2019. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Clerks Notice
                                                                              **CLERK'S NOTICE FOLLOWING CASE REASSIGNMENT TO THE HONORABLE LUCY H. KOH** Following the case reassignment to the Honorable Lucy H. Koh, an Initial Case Management Conference is set for March 25, 2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 4th floor, in San Jose, California. The Joint Case Management Statement is due 7 days prior. See Civil L.R. 16-9 and Civil L.R. 16-10(a). The parties shall familiarize themselves with the Scheduling Notes and Standing Orders for the Hon. Lucy H. Koh: http://cand.uscourts.gov/lhk. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(kedS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Lucy H. Koh for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 12/6/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                    CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Byron Jackson.. (Benjamin, Na'il) (Filed on 12/5/2019)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                      CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Randstad Inc... (Lopez, Kiran) (Filed on 12/3/2019)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                        CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Randstad Inc... (Lopez, Kiran) (Filed on 12/2/2019)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ceva Logistics, Tesla Motors re [1] Notice of Removal, Proof of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal to Adverse Party and State Court (McAlpine, Fraser) (Filed on 11/26/2019)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                                            CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 12/5/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cfeS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2019)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ceva Logistics, Tesla Motors re [7] Order Reassigning Case,, Case Assigned/Reassigned, (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                Civil Cover Sheet by Ceva Logistics, Tesla Motors Amended Civil Cover Sheet. (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Clerks Notice
                                                                                                  CLERK'S NOTICE. Counsel to file and amended civil cover sheet to indicate San Jose Venue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Clerical error: Wrong venue. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen for all further proceedings. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 11/22/19. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/22/2019 (as, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                                      Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 3/12/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/19/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors re [2] Civil Cover Sheet, [4] Declaration in Support, [1] Notice of Removal, [3] Declaration in Support, (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Case assigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                            Declaration in Support of [1] Notice of Removal, to the United States District Court for the Northern District of California filed byCeva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors. (Related document(s)[1]) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Declaration in Support
                                                                                                              Declaration of Karen Lubrano in Support of [1] Notice of Removal, filed byCeva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Related document(s)[1]) (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                Civil Cover Sheet by Ceva Logistics U.S., Inc. erroneously sued as Ceva Logistics, Tesla, Inc. erroneously sued as Tesla Motors . (Dale, Conor) (Filed on 11/20/2019)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Answer
                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) byCeva Logistics, Randstad Inc., Tesla Motors. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2019) Modified on 11/22/2019 (cv, COURT STAFF).
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 68 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?