Young et al v. IFINEX Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:19-cv-01902-JLR
District Judge James L. Robart, presiding

Tags
Last Updated February 15, 2021 at 5:02 PM ST (4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Adam Kurtz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger M Townsend +1 206 652 8660 +1 206 652 8290 rtownsend@bjtlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony E Maneiro(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice) +1 212 371 6600 amaneiro@kmllp.com
Space David E Kovel +1 212 317 2300 +1 212 751 2540 dkovel@kmllp.com
Space Karen M. Lerner +1 212 371 6600 klerner@kmllp.com
No Logo ERIC YOUNG, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony E Maneiro(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice) +1 212 371 6600 amaneiro@kmllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Breskin Johnson & Townsend PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger M Townsend +1 206 652 8660 +1 206 652 8290 rtownsend@bjtlegal.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirby McInerney LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David E Kovel +1 212 317 2300 +1 212 751 2540 dkovel@kmllp.com
Space Karen M. Lerner +1 212 371 6600 klerner@kmllp.com
v.
No Logo BFXNA Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 425 707 5364 +1 425 706 4112 jjennison@perkinscoie.com
No Logo BFXWW Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 425 707 5364 +1 425 706 4112 jjennison@perkinscoie.com
No Logo DigFinex Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 425 707 5364 +1 425 706 4112 jjennison@perkinscoie.com
No Logo iFinex Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 425 707 5364 +1 425 706 4112 jjennison@perkinscoie.com
No Logo John Does 1-50, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 425 707 5364 +1 425 706 4112 jjennison@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Tether Holdings Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 425 707 5364 +1 425 706 4112 jjennison@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Tether International Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 425 707 5364 +1 425 706 4112 jjennison@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Tether Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 425 707 5364 +1 425 706 4112 jjennison@perkinscoie.com
No Logo Tether Operations Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder +1 425 707 5364 +1 425 706 4112 jjennison@perkinscoie.com
Office Seattle
Filed 11/22/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County XX US, Outside District
Terminated 1/7/2020
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,JURYDEMAND
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - case
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of case by Plaintiffs Adam Kurtz, Eric Young (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Townsend, Roger)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank  terminated case
    ***Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) Civil Case Terminated re Plaintiffs' [13] Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (case) (TH)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 Notice of appearance
        NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Judith B Jennison on behalf of Defendants BFXNA Inc, BFXWW Inc, DigFinex Inc, John Does 1-50, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, iFinex Inc. (Jennison, Judith)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: 1/2/2020 stipulation
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: 12/30/2019 stipulation
            [See [10]] STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Transfer Venue by parties (Townsend, Roger) Modified on 1/3/2020 (MW).
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 8 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
              ORDER re [5] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Anthony E Maneiro for Adam Kurtz and Eric Young, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                ORDER re [4] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Karen M Lerner for Adam Kurtz and Eric Young, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                  ORDER re [3] Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney David E Kovel for Adam Kurtz and Eric Young, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019, Terminated: 11/25/2019 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Anthony E. Maneiro FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Adam Kurtz, Eric Young (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6024898 (Townsend, Roger)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019, Terminated: 11/25/2019 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Karen M. Lerner FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Adam Kurtz, Eric Young (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6024893 (Townsend, Roger)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019, Terminated: 11/25/2019 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY David E. Kovel FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Adam Kurtz, Eric Young (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6024883 (Townsend, Roger)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Summons issued
                          Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants BFXNA Inc, BFXWW Inc, DigFinex Inc, Tether Holdings Limited, Tether International Limited, Tether Limited, Tether Operations Limited, and iFinex Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Summons, # (2) Summons, # (3) Summons, # (4) Summons, # (5) Summons, # (6) Summons, # (7) Summons)(GT)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                            Judge James L. Robart added. (GT)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-6023018) Attorney Roger M Townsend added to party Adam Kurtz(pty:pla), Attorney Roger M Townsend added to party Eric Young(pty:pla), filed by Adam Kurtz, Eric Young. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons BFXNA, # (3) Summons BFXWW, # (4) Summons DigFinex, # (5) Summons iFinex, # (6) Summons Tether Holdings, # (7) Summons Tether International, # (8) Summons Tether Limited, # (9) Summons Tether Operations)(Townsend, Roger)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?