Securities and Exchange Commission v. Mimedx Group, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-10927-NRB
District Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 20, 2021 at 3:01 PM DT (2.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen C. McKenna +1 303 844 1000 +1 303 844 1068 mckennas@sec.gov
Space Mark Lander Williams +1 303 844 1000 +1 303 297 3529 williamsml@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Michael J. Senken, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon L Barbour +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 SBarbour@cohengresser.com
Space Sri Kuehnlenz +1 212 707 7274 +1 212 957 4514 skuehnlenz@cohengresser.com
Space Nathaniel P.T. Read +1 212 957 7600 NRead@CohenGresser.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen & Gresser LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark S. Cohen +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 mcohen@cohengresser.com
Space Christian R. Everdell +1 212 637 2200 ceverdell@cohengresser.com
Space Scott Douglas Thomson +1 212 957 7600 +1 212 957 4514 Sthomson@cohengresser.com
Space Joanna Ka Wai Chan +1 212 707 7272 +1 212 957 4514 jchan@cohengresser.com
MiMedx Group Inc. MiMedx Group Inc., Defendant
Petit, Parker H. Petit, Parker H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Parker H. Petit"
Unknown Role, Logility, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Bach +1 212 257 4897 +1 212 202 6417 jbach@shapiroarato.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric Brendan Bruce +1 202 777 4500 eric.bruce@freshfields.com
Space Altin Herbert Sila +1 212 277 4000 altin.sila@freshfields.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kobre & Kim - Miami

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Amanda Nicole Tuminelli +1 212 488 1200 amanda.tuminelli@kobrekim.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kobre & Kim LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew I. Menchel +1 212 488 1208 +1 212 488 1208 matthew.menchel@kobrekim.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shapiro Arato & Isserles LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Jonathan O'Neill +1 212 479 6724 +1 212 202 6417 doneill@shapiroarato.com
No Logo Taylor, William C., Defendant
Officially listed as "William C. Taylor"

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Anthony Burck +1 202 682 7002 +1 202 857 0940 williamburck@quinnemanuel.com
Space Michael Barry Carlinsky +1 212 849 7000 +1 212 849 7100 michaelcarlinsky@quinnemanuel.com
Space Michael E. Liftik +1 202 538 8000 michaelliftik@quinnemanuel.com
Space Michael Thomas Packard +1 617 712 7118 michaelpackard@quinnemanuel.com
Space William Weinreb +1 617 712 7100 billweinreb@quinnemanuel.com
United States of America United States of America, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Andrew Hartman +1 212 637 2357 +1 212 637 2527 scott.hartman@usdoj.gov
Space Edward Arthur Imperatore +1 212 637 2327 +1 212 637 2387 edward.imperatore@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Marc Tracer +1 212 637 1087 +1 212 637 2443 daniel.tracer@usdoj.gov
Office Foley Square
Filed 11/26/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition
County Albany
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/20/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/29/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/26/2021, Entered: 4/26/2021 Motion to withdraw as attorney
          MOTION for Matthew I. Menchel and Amanda N. Tuminelli to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service).(Menchel, Matthew)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/19/2021, Entered: 4/19/2021 Motion to withdraw as attorney
              MOTION for Eric B. Bruce and Altin H. Sila to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service).(Bruce, Eric)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Notice of appearance
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Jonathan O'Neill on behalf of Parker H. Petit..(O'Neill, Daniel)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/21/2021, Entered: None Letter
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/13/2021, Entered: 4/13/2021 Notice of appearance
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Bach on behalf of Parker H. Petit..(Bach, Jonathan)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/1/2021, Entered: None Memo Endorsement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/27/2020 letterCourt Filing
                          LETTER: addressed to Stephen C. McKenna, Mark L. Williams, Nathaniel P. T. Read, Christian R. Everdell and Joanna Chan from Naomi Reice Buchwald, United States District Judge dated 12/23/2020 re: The Court is in receipt of the parties' letter of December 18, 2020 (ECF No. 68) and has considered Mr. Senken's request to file his motions to dismiss and to transfer, as well as letters underlying that request (ECF No. 49; ECF No. 50). Given that the related criminal case is not fully resolved at the district court level, the Court has concluded that it would be advisable to postpone consideration of the proposed motions until judgment is entered in the criminal case. (ama)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/18/2020, Entered: 12/18/2020 Status report
                              STATUS REPORT. (Joint Status Report) Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(McKenna, Stephen)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/20/2021, Entered: None Letter
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: 5/26/2020 protective orderCourt Filing
                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER:...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 5/22/2020) (js)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/15/2020, Terminated: 5/22/2020 Motion for ConferenceCourt Filing
                                      JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference Related to the Entry of a Protective Order addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Mark L. Williams dated May 15, 2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Proposed Protective Order).(Williams, Mark)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: 5/1/2020 Notice of appearance
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Douglas Thomson on behalf of Michael J. Senken..(Thomson, Scott)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that discovery in this action is stayed in its entirety with the following specific exceptions, which may proceed during the pendency of the Criminal Case, subject to the terms set forth herein: a. Document discovery from the SEC may proceed during the pendency of the Criminal Case, except that the production of the following categories of documents shall be stayed: 1. Communications, written or oral, with the Government and/or other law enforcement agencies; 2. Communications, written or oral, with counsel for MiMedx Group, Inc. or its audit committee, including any factual presentations; g. The parties agree that, in the event that the trial in the Criminal Case set to begin on July 7, 2020: (i) is adjourned for at least 90 days, or (ii) results in a mistrial, they will revisit in good faith the terms of the agreed stay, with Defendant Michael Senken reserving his right to seek relief from the Court. as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 4/1/2020) (ks) Modified on 4/1/2020 (ks).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                              PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Tracer, Daniel)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Marc Tracer on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Tracer, Daniel)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda Nicole Tuminelli on behalf of Parker H. Petit..(Tuminelli, Amanda)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/31/2020, Entered: 3/31/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew I. Menchel on behalf of Parker H. Petit..(Menchel, Matthew)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER: ORDERED that discovery in this action is stayed in its entirety with the following specific exceptions, which may proceed during the pendency of the Criminal Case, subject to the exceptions set forth herein: (a) Party document discovery may proceed during the pendency of the Criminal Case, except that the production of the following categories of documents shall be stayed: 1. Communications, written or oral, with the Government and/or other law enforcement agencies; 2. Communications, written or oral, with counsel for MiMedx Group, Inc. or its audit committee, including any factual presentations; 3. Documents obtained by the SEC from the Government and/or other law enforcement agencies; 4. Transcripts of testimony and notes of or memoranda describing interviews with; written statements made or adopted in the course of an interview by; or correspondence concerning interviews of any person whom the Government designates to the SEC as an individual who may be called as a witness in the Criminal Action; and 5. Disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(1)(A)(i). (b) Except as set forth above, the defendants are authorized to seek only the following discovery, subject to Government pre-approval as outlined below: as set forth herein. The parties agree that, in the event that the trial in the Criminal Case set to begin on July 7, 2020: (a) is adjourned for at least 90 days, or (b) results in a mistrial, they will revisit in good faith the terms of the agreed stay, with defendant Michael Senken reserving his right to seek relief from the Court. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 3/11/2020) (ama)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                        PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Imperatore, Edward)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [51] MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by Michael J. Senken..(Cohen, Mark)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                            DECLARATION of Nathaniel P. T. Read in Opposition re: [51] MOTION to Stay .. Document filed by Michael J. Senken. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C).(Cohen, Mark)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Mark S. Cohen dated March 3, 2020 re: Opposition to Motion for Stay of Discovery. Document filed by Michael J. Senken..(Cohen, Mark)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: [51] MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by William C. Taylor..(Burck, William)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William A. Burck dated March 3, 2020 re: Opposition to Motion for Stay of Discovery. Document filed by William C. Taylor..(Burck, William)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: [51] MOTION to Stay . . Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA..(Hartman, Scott)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: 2/18/2020, Terminated: 3/11/2020 Motion To Stay
                                                                      MOTION to Stay . Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order).(Hartman, Scott)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Stephen C. McKenna dated February 12, 2020 re: SEC's Response to Defendant Michael Senken's February 7, 2020 Letter. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(McKenna, Stephen)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/7/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Mark S. Cohen dated February 7, 2020 re: Pre-Motion Letter in Advance of Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer Venue. Document filed by Michael J. Senken..(Cohen, Mark)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: 2/5/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER: By letter, dated January 26, 2020, the United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York sought leave to move to intervene and to stay all discovery (with certain limited exceptions) until the conclusion of the parallel criminal case, United States v. Petit et al., 19 Cr. 850 (JSR). The Government's motion to intervene i s granted. The Government is also granted leave to move for a stay. That motion should be made promptly. In addition, a temporary stay of discovery is imposed in this case at least until the resolution of Government's motion. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 2/05/2020) (ama)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: 2/4/2020 Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Report
                                                                              RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission..(McKenna, Stephen)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: 1/30/2020 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR GREGORY A. KASPER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION granting [42] Motion to Withdraw. This matter comes to the Court on the United States Securities and Exchange Commission's Unopposed Motion for Gregory A. Kasper to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Securities and Exchange Commission. Having reviewed the Unopposed Motion and finding the relief sought is appropriate, the Motion is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 1/29/2020) (cf)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Eric B. Bruce dated January 29, 2020 re: response to letter filed by the U.S. Attorney's Office. Document filed by Parker H. Petit.(Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from William A. Burck dated January 29, 2020 re: Response to [Dkt. 32] Pre-Motion Letter in Advance of Motion to Intervene and Stay Discovery. Document filed by William C. Taylor.(Burck, William)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Mark S. Cohen dated January 29, 2020 re: Response to [32] Letter from AUSAs Edward Imperatore, Scott Hartman, and Daniel Tracer dated 1/26/2020 re: Pre-motion Letter in Advance of Motion to Intervene and Stay Discovery. Document filed by Michael J. Senken.(Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: 1/29/2020, Terminated: 1/30/2020 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw Gregory A. Kasper as Counsel for the Securities and Exchange Commission (Unopposed). Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Kasper, Gregory)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                          ANSWER to [1] Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by William C. Taylor.(Liftik, Michael)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon L Barbour on behalf of Michael J. Senken. (Barbour, Sharon)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sri Kuehnlenz on behalf of Michael J. Senken. (Kuehnlenz, Sri)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joanna Ka Wai Chan on behalf of Michael J. Senken. (Chan, Joanna)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian R. Everdell on behalf of Michael J. Senken. (Everdell, Christian)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Nathaniel P. T. Read on behalf of Michael J. Senken. (Read, Nathaniel)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Stewart Cohen on behalf of Michael J. Senken. (Cohen, Mark)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/26/2020, Entered: 1/26/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Arthur Imperatore on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Imperatore, Edward)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/26/2020, Entered: 1/26/2020 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott Andrew Hartman on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hartman, Scott)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/26/2020, Entered: 1/26/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from AUSAs Edward Imperatore, Scott Hartman, and Daniel Tracer dated 1/26/2020 re: Premotion Letter in Advance of Motion to Intervene and Stay Discovery. Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Hartman, Scott)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Answer to Complaint
                                                                                                              ANSWER to [1] Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Parker H. Petit.(Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [29] Motion for Michael Liftik to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Michael Liftik for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned action is granted. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/17/19) (yv)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019, Terminated: 12/18/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                  MOTION for Michael Liftik to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18296498. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William C. Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael Liftik, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing - MA, # (4) Certificate of Good Standing - DC, # (5) Certificate of Good Standing - CA)(Liftik, Michael)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                    >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [29] MOTION for Michael Liftik to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18296498. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael J. Senken waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (McKenna, Stephen)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [24] Motion for Mark L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/11/2019) (va)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting [21] Motion for William D. Weinreb to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/09/2019) (ama)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting [22] Motion for Michael T. Packard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/09/2019) (ama)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019, Terminated: 12/11/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                              MOTION for Mark L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Mark L. Williams, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing - Mark L. Williams, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Williams, Mark)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [24] MOTION for Mark L. Williams to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Parker H. Petit waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (McKenna, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019, Terminated: 12/10/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Michael T. Packard to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18230760. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William C. Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael T. Packard, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts)(Packard, Michael)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019, Terminated: 12/10/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for William D. Weinreb to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18230092. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William C. Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of William D. Weinreb, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts)(Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Barry Carlinsky on behalf of William C. Taylor. (Carlinsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Anthony Burck on behalf of William C. Taylor. (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [22] MOTION for Michael T. Packard to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18230760. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [21] MOTION for William D. Weinreb to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18230092. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 judgment
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. William C. Taylor waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/27/2020. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (McKenna, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Related Case Statement
                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Stephen C McKenna. Document No. [16] Statement of Relatedness. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to Rule 13(2)(c) of the SDNY Division of Business Rules, criminal cases are not treated as related to civil cases. (db)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Statement of Relatedness
                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Stephen McKenna re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cr-00850-JSR. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(McKenna, Stephen) Modified on 12/4/2019 (db). As per Chambers ecf_error email correspondence forwarded at 12/4/2019 @ 3:22pm and originally received on 12/4/2019 @ 10:25am.
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC: granting [7] Motion for Stephen C. McKenna to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 12/2/2019) (js)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Altin Herbert Sila on behalf of Parker H. Petit. (Sila, Altin)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Brendan Bruce on behalf of Parker H. Petit. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019, Terminated: 12/4/2019 ~Motion for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b)
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) as to Defendant MiMedx Group, Inc.. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Consent of Defendant MiMedx Group, LLC, # (2) Text of Proposed Order)(Kasper, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael J. Senken. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to William C. Taylor. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Parker H. Petit. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Summons issued
                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mimedx Group, Inc.. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                      Case Designated ECF. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Case Designation
                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
                                                                                                                                                                          CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
                                                                                                                                                                            ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gregory Alan Kasper. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019, Terminated: 12/2/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Stephen C. McKenna to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Stephen C. McKenna, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(McKenna, Stephen)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael J. Senken, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kasper, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                  REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to William C. Taylor, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kasper, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Parker H. Petit, re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kasper, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Request for Issuance of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                      REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MiMedx Group, Inc., re: [1] Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Kasper, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                        CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kasper, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Mimedx Group, Inc., Parker H. Petit, Michael J. Senken, William C. Taylor. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Kasper, Gregory)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [7] MOTION for Stephen C. McKenna to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 350 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?