COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES v. BARR et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-03557

Tags
Last Updated August 31, 2021 at 12:28 AM DT (3.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States House of Representatives, Committee On Oversight & Government Reform United States House of Representatives, Committee On Oversight & Government Reform, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States House of Representatives

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas N. Letter +1 202 225 9700 douglas.letter@mail.house.gov
v.
Ross, Wilbur L. Jr. Ross, Wilbur L. Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "WILBUR L. ROSS, JR."
Officer/Director, News Communications, Inc.
Officer/Director, Penn Treaty American Corp
Officer/Director, Wl Ross & Co LLC
Officer/Director, Wlr Recovery Fund II LLC
Officer/Director, Wlr Recovery Fund III Lp
Officer/Director, Wlr Recovery Fund II Lp
Officer/Director, Agc Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, WL Ross Group, L.P.
Officer/Director, El Vedado, LLC
Officer/Director, Wlr Recovery Fund Iv, LP
Officer/Director, Wlr Iv Parallel Esc Lp
Officer/Director, Wlr Ago Co-invest L.p.
Officer/Director, Greenbrier Companies Inc
Officer/Director, Sun Bancorp Inc /nj/
Officer/Director, Wlr Recovery Fund Lp
Officer/Director, Wlr Recovery Associates LLC
Officer/Director, WLR SBI AcquisitionCo, LLC
Officer/Director, Bankunited, Inc.
Officer/Director, AIR LEASE Corp
Officer/Director, Wlr Select Associates Llc
Officer/Director, Mineral Development Inc
Officer/Director, Ocwen Financial Corp
Officer/Director, WL Ross Holding Corp.
Officer/Director, WLR CB AcquisitionCo LLC
Officer/Director, Cascade Bancorp
Officer/Director, Qureshi Nadim Z
Officer/Director, Toy Stephen J.
Officer/Director, Ross Holding Co LLC
Officer/Director, Taronis Fuels, Inc.
Barr, William P. Barr, William P., Defendant
Officially listed as "WILLIAM P. BARR"
Officer/Director, BELL ATLANTIC CORP
Officer/Director, AOL Time Warner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Dominion Resources Inc /va/
Office Washington, DC
Filed 11/26/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331 Enforcement of Administrative Subpoena
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/31/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/12/2021, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/2/2021, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/23/2021, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/19/2021, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/12/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/12/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/20/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Status Report
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Transcript
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2020, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Hold in Abeyance
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2019, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Complaint
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against WILLIAM P. BARR, WILBUR L. ROSS, JR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6594605) filed by COMMITTEE ON OVERSIGHT AND REFORM, UNITED STATES HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits A-I, # (2) Exhibit Exhibits J-L, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit M, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit N-Z, # (5) Exhibit Exhibits AA-ZZ, # (6) Exhibit Exhibits AAA-HHH, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit III-Pt 1, # (8) Exhibit Exhibit III-Pt 2, # (9) Exhibit Exhibits JJJ-ZZZ, # (10) Exhibit Exhibits AAAA-ZZZZ, # (11) Exhibit Exhibits AAAAA-HHHHH, # (12) Summons to William P. Barr, # (13) Summons to Wilbur Ross, Jr., # (14) Civil Cover Sheet)(Letter, Douglas)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?