USA v. Petit et al
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cr-00850-JSR

Tags
Last Updated February 17, 2021 at 2:05 PM ST (8.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Andrew Hartman +1 212 637 2357 +1 212 637 2527 scott.hartman@usdoj.gov
Space Edward Arthur Imperatore +1 212 637 2327 +1 212 637 2387 edward.imperatore@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Marc Tracer +1 212 637 1087 +1 212 637 2443 daniel.tracer@usdoj.gov
v.
Petit, Parker H. Petit, Parker H., Defendant
Officially listed as "Parker H. Petit"
Officer/Director, Matria Healthcare, Inc.
Officer/Director, Logility, Inc.
Officer/Director, Intelligent Systems Corp

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Parker H. Petit (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 11/25/2019
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT SECURITIES FRAUD, TO MAKE FALSE FILINGS WITH THE SEC, AND TO IMPROPERLY INFLUENCE THE CONDUCT OF AUDITS
Count 2
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78J.F
Offense Level 4
1578J.F SECURITIES FRAUD
Defendant Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (209) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021 Letter - Sentencing
Sentencing Letter by Parker H. Petit addressed to Hon. Jed S. Rakoff from Parker H. Petit dated 2/16/2021 re: Supplemental letters in support of sentencing. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Menchel, Matthew)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021 Sentencing Submission
SENTENCING SUBMISSION by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Minkin report), # (2) Exhibit B (Minkin exhibits), # (3) Exhibit C (Minkin CV), # (4) Exhibit D (Petit money judgment), # (5) Exhibit E (Taylor money judgment))(Imperatore, Edward)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021 Sentencing Submission
    SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Parker H. Petit. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix A, # (2) Appendix B, # (3) Appendix C)(Bruce, Eric)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/16/2021, Entered: 2/16/2021 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: Defendant William Taylor is hereby permitted to file under seal his sentencing memorandum in this matter and exhibits thereto. Further, he shall electronically file a redacted version of those materials. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/16/2021) (lnl)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Status Conference
        Minute Entry - A phone conference was held February 12, 2021 before Judge Rakoff without recording or transcription. Present for the Government was AUSA Scott Hartman; for defendant Taylor was Michael Packard; and for defendant Petit was Jennifer Loeb (jw)
          LREF
          Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Parker H. Petit: Sentencing set for 2/23/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (lnl)
            LREF
            Blank  Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
            MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK as to Parker H. Petit: The sentencing for defendant Petit, set for February 23, 2021 at 4:00 p.m., will proceed via videoconference. The public can dial-in through the following access information: Dial in: +1 (917) 933-2166; Conference ID: 176672031. (lnl)
              LREF
              Blank  Status Conference
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 2/10/2021 with transcription or recording. Present for the Government were AUSAs Edward Imperatore and Daniel Tracer; for defendant Taylor were Bill Weinreb and Michael Packard; for defendant Petit were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, and Matthew Menchel. (jw)
                LREF
                Blank  Pretrial Conference
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Pretrial Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 2/5/2021. A phone conference was held 2-5-21 without transcription or recording. Present for defendant Taylor was William Weinreb and Michael Packard; for defendant Petit, Eric Bruce, Matthew Menchel, and Jennifer Loeb; and for the Government, AUSAs Scott Hartman and Edward Imperatore. Court's decision: The sentencing for defendant Taylor, scheduled for February 24, 2021 at 4:00 p.m., will proceed in person in Courtroom 14B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse. (Sentencing set for 2/24/2021 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff) (lnl)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: 1/29/2021 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support as to William Taylor re: [125] MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial . . (Weinreb, William)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [125] MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial .. [123] MOTION for Acquittal (Hartman, Scott)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                      Jury Note 8 as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                        Jury Note 7 as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                          Jury Note 6A as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                            Jury Note 6 as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                              Jury Note 5 as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                                Jury Note 4A as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                                  Jury Note 4 as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                                    Jury Note 3A as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                                      Jury Note 3 as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                                        Jury Note 2 as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: 1/22/2021 Jury Notes
                                          Jury Note 1 as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (lnl)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [125] MOTION for Acquittal . MOTION for New Trial .. (Weinreb, William)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Motion for Acquittal
                                              MOTION for Acquittal ., MOTION for New Trial . Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 memorandum in support of motion
                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by Parker H. Petit re [123] MOTION for Acquittal (Notice of Motion).. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: 1/8/2021 Motion for Acquittal
                                                  MOTION for Acquittal (Notice of Motion). Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/23/2020, Entered: 12/23/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER by Parker H. Petit addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff, from Eric B. Bruce/Jennifer B. Loeb dated 11/10/2020 re: Defense counsel writes regarding evidence and jury. (ap)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 12/2/2020 jury verdict
                                                      JURY VERDICT as to Parker H. Petit (1) Guilty on Count 2 and William Taylor (2) Guilty on Count 1. Parker H. Petit (1) Not Guilty on Count 1 and William Taylor (2) Not Guilty on Count 2. (ap)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                        Set/Reset Hearings as to William Taylor: Sentencing set for 2/24/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (ap)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                          Set/Reset Hearings as to Parker H. Petit: Sentencing set for 2/23/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (ap)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                                                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor:Any defense motions due 1-8-2021, Govt motions due 1/22/2021, Replies 1/29/2021. Motions due by 1/22/2021. Replies due by 1/29/2021. (ap)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank  Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report
                                                              Oral Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 11/19/2020) (ap)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/19/2020. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/17,18, 19/20. The jury continues to deliberate. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. On November 19, 2020, the jury returns a verdict (attached). PSI refs to Prob. SENS for Petit 2/23/2021 at 4:00pm. SENS for Taylor 2/24/2021 at 4:00pm. Any defense motions due 1-8-2021, Govt motions due 1/22/2021, Replies 1/29/2021. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/18/2020. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/17,18, 19/20. The jury continues to deliberate. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/17/2020. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/17,18, 19/20. The jury continues to deliberate. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: 1/22/2021 Remark
                                                                      THE COURT'S INSTRUCTIONS OF LAW TO THE JURY as to USA v. Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (bw)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/16/2020. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/16/20. Evidence was entered. Charge by the Court, exceptions to the charge. The jury retires to deliberate. The trial is continued to November 17, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/15/2020, Entered: 11/15/2020 proposed jury instructions
                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by William Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Proposed Amendments to Instructions, # (2) Exhibit B - Proposed Verdict Form)(Koffmann, Daniel)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/13/2020. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/9, 10, 11 12, 13/2020. Judge Jed S. Rakoff, evidence was entered. It is continued to November 16, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michae Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/12/2020. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/9, 10, 11 12, 13/2020. Judge Jed S. Rakoff, evidence was entered. It is continued to November 16, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michae Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/11/2020. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/9, 10, 11 12, 13/2020. Judge Jed S. Rakoff, evidence was entered. It is continued to November 16, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michae Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/10/2020. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/9, 10, 11 12, 13/2020. Judge Jed S. Rakoff, evidence was entered. It is continued to November 16, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michae Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/9/2020. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/9, 10, 11 12, 13/2020. Judge Jed S. Rakoff, evidence was entered. It is continued to November 16, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michae Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/6/2020. Judge Jed S. Rakoff Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/09/2020, trial continues, evidence was entered. It is continued to November 10, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michae Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/6/2020. Judge Jed S. Rakoff Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/06/2020, trial continues, evidence was entered. It is continued to November 9, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/5/2020. Judge Jed S. Rakoff Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/05/2020, trial continues, evidence was entered. It is continued to November 6, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporters Rebecca Forman and Michael McDaniel) (ap)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/4/2020. Judge Jed S. Rakoff Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 11/04/2020, trial continues, evidence was entered. It is continued to November 5, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rebecca Forman and Alena Lynch) (ap)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: Jury Trial set for 11/5/2020 at 09:45 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (ap)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. The jury trial has been adjourned for today, November 4, 2020 and will reconvene at 9:45a.m. tomorrow, November 5, 2020. (ap)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER by William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Michael Packard dated 11/3/2020 re: to preview certain exhibits we may seek to introduce during the cross-examination. (jbo)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/3/2020, Entered: 11/20/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                    LETTER by Parker H. Petit addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Eric B. Bruce dated 11/3/2020 re: For the foregoing reasons, Mr. Petit respectfully requests that Your Honor consider and admit these exhibits based on the applicable hearsay exceptions under the Rules of Evidence and for impeachment purposes, where indicated. (jbo)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/1/2020, Entered: 11/1/2020 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re admission of previously offered Defense exhibits. Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 10/30/2020. On October 30, 2020 trial continues, evidence was entered. It is continued to the next business day, November 2 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rose Prater and Sam Mauro) (jw)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/23/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: Conference held on 10/23/2020 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2021. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 10/29/2020. On October 29, 2020 trial continues, evidence was entered. It is continued to the next day, October 30, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Taylor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rose Prater and Sam Mauro) (jw)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 10/28/2020. On October 28, 2020 trial continues, evidence was entered. It is continued to the next day, October 29, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rose Prater and Sam Mauro) (lnl)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Jury Trial as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 10/27/2020. On October 27, 2020 the trial continues, evidence was entered. It is continued to the next day, October 28, 2020. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rose Prater and Sam Mauro) (lnl)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/27/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: The defense in the above-captioned case is hereby permitted to bring in approximately 20 boxes of documents in connection with the trial commencing today. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/26/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting [109] Motion for Kathleen Marini to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William Taylor (2). (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/23/2020) (lnl)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Voir Dire
                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Voir Dire held on 10/26/2020 as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. On October 26, 2020 Judge Rakoff picked a jury for a criminal trial. Evidence was entered. It is continued to the next day, October 27, 2020. Duration 5 hours. Present for the government were AUSA's Daniel Tracer, Edward Imperatore, and Scott Hartman. Present for defendant #1, Peter Petit, were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Alktin Sila, Sarah Carauna from Freshfields and Matthew Menchel, and Amanda Tuminelli from Kobre and Kim. For deft #2, William Tayor: William Weinreb, William Burck, Daniel Koffman, Michael Carlinsky, Michael Packard from Quinn Emanuel. (Court Reporter Rose Prater and Sam Mauro) (ap)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/23/2020, Entered: 10/23/2020 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: [99] MOTION in Limine to preclude misleading summary witness testimony.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: GX-742 (MMDX_00514328))(Hartman, Scott)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [110] MOTION to Quash the government's Rule 17(c) subpoena duces tecum to defendants expert witness, Jason Flemmons.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 motion to quash
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash the government's Rule 17(c) subpoena duces tecum to defendants expert witness, Jason Flemmons. Document filed by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020, Terminated: 10/26/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                MOTION for Kathleen Marini to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-22268090. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William Taylor as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Kathleen Marini in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order)(Marini, Kathleen)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: [90] SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Concerning "Related Party Transactions".. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Tracer, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [106] MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence relating to the identities of investors in MiMedx.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to exclude evidence relating to the identities of investors in MiMedx. Document filed by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/22/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. The in-court jury trial commencing 9:30am on October 26, 2020 will also have a dial in connection to which the public may dial in and listen:888-363-4735 (USA toll free); 215-446-3657 (International caller paid); access code 1086415) (jw)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [109] MOTION for Kathleen Marini to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-22268090. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank  Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. A jury trial will be held before Judge Rakoff starting October 26, 2020 at 9:30 in courtroom 26B of the 500 Pearl Street courthouse. The public may listen in by dialing 888-363-4735 (USA toll free); 215-446-3657 (International caller paid); access code 1086415. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: This judge is not necessarily opposed to many of these requests and will endeavor to accommodate them where possible. However, most of them violate the Southern District of New York's social distancing protocols promulgated by the Court as a whole, after careful study of what was best required to assure juror health. Accordingly, for now, the Court denies requests (1) - (6) and (8) without prejudice to reconsideration as the trial progresses. The one request that is not violative of the aforementioned protocols, request (7), is hereby granted. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/21/2020) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. The defendants' motion to adjourn the trial borders on the frivolous and is hereby denied. The trial will commence at 9:45 a.m. on October 26, 2020 in Courtroom 26B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close docket entry 74. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/21/2020) (See ORDER set forth) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 Proposed Voir Dire Questions
                                                                                                                                                      Proposed Voir Dire Questions by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 Proposed Examination of Jurors
                                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED EXAMINATION OF JURORS by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Tracer, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                          Set/Reset Hearings as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: Telephone Conference set for 10/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. A tele-conference is scheduled for Friday October 23, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. The public may dial in to listen at 888-363-4735 toll free USA, 215-446-3657 international caller paid, access code 1086415. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [99] MOTION in Limine to preclude misleading summary witness testimony.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine to preclude misleading summary witness testimony. Document filed by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                  Request To Charge by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Tuminelli, Amanda)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Parker H. Petit as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [71] MOTION in Limine to preclude expert testimony.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 Request to Charge
                                                                                                                                                                      Request To Charge by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Imperatore, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by William Taylor as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [72] MOTION in Limine to (1) admit prior act evidence to establish defendant Parker Petits knowledge of accounting/revenue recognition rules and intent as to the crimes charged in the Indictment; (2) preclude improper good acts evidence, (3) to preclude. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/19/2020, Entered: 10/19/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor as to William Taylor re: [74] MOTION to Continue Trial. / In Opposition to [86]. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: A jury trial will be held on October 26, 2020 at 9:30 in courtroom 26B of 500 Pearl. Street. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/18/2020, Entered: 10/18/2020 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Parker H. Petit as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: [80] JOINT MOTION to Compel Clarification of Prior Witness Statements. . (Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/17/2020, Entered: 10/17/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Parker H. Petit re [90] SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Concerning "Related Party Transactions".. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/17/2020, Entered: 10/17/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence or Argument Concerning "Related Party Transactions". Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/17/2020, Entered: 10/17/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [80] JOINT MOTION to Compel Clarification of Prior Witness Statements.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Imperatore, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sarah Caruana appearing for Parker H. Petit. Appearance Type: Retained. (Caruana, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [51] MOTION in Limine (Notice of Motion in Limine)., [65] MOTION in Limine #7: to exclude evidence of civil litigation involving Mr. Taylor., [59] MOTION in Limine #4: to preclude the government from eliciting disguised expert testimony from certain witnesses., [61] MOTION in Limine #5: to exclude evidence regarding Mr. Taylor's termination from MiMedx., [55] MOTION in Limine #2: to exclude evidence of MiMedxs financial restatements., [70] MOTION in Limine joining in Defendant Parker H. Petit's motions in limine, Dkt. No. [52]., [67] MOTION in Limine #8: to exclude Mr. Taylor's memorandum on revenue recognition unless the government establishes certain prerequisites., [69] MOTION in Limine #9: to require the government to prove the prerequisites for admission of certain alleged coconspirator statements outside the presence of the jury and prior to admitting them into evidence., [63] MOTION in Limine #6: to exclude certain prejudicial terms., [53] MOTION in Limine #1: to exclude evidence relating to the MiMedx Audit Committees investigation and findings in 2018 and 2019., [57] MOTION in Limine #3: to exclude evidence relating to AvKARE.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Imperatore, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/15/2020, Entered: 10/15/2020 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: [74] MOTION to Continue Trial.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A: August 19, 2020 Email from Defense Counsel, # (2) Exhibit B: September 21, 2020 Email from Defense Counsel)(Hartman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. I hereby authorize Courtroom Connect, a Southern District of New York contracted vendor, to provide the parties in the United States v. Parker H. Petit and William Taylor, 19-cr-00850 (JSR) with internet connectivity, including permission to bring external internet router to the Court, as well as Remote Real Time transcript feed that can be viewed by Court authorized individuals outside of the courthouse for the duration of the proceedings set to begin on October 26, 2020. Courtroom Connect can proceed to make arrangements with the District Executive Office of the Court. The approved attorneys and staff on the case may bring in the necessary electronic devices to connect to the Courtroom Connect Service (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/14/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. It is hereby ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned US v. Parker H. Petit and William Taylor for case #19 cr 850 for the dates 10/26/20 - 12/18/20 (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/14/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. It is hereby ORDERED that the following attorney(s) are authorized to bring the Personal Electronic Device(s) and/or the General Purpose Computing Device(s) (collectively, "Devices") listed below into the Courthouse for use in a proceeding or trial in the action captioned United States v. Parker H. Petit & William Taylor on case 19 cr 850 the dates for which such authorization is provided is 10/26/20 - 12/18/20. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/14/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. I hereby authorize the defendants in the above-captioned matter to use the equipment listed below to supplement the existing technology in the courtroom for the duration of the trial proceedings set to begin on October 26, 2020. Defendants can proceed to make arrangements with the District Executive Office of the Court and William Jarrett of the Courtroom Technology department regarding installation (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 10/14/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: 10/14/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Parker H. Petit as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [80] JOINT MOTION to Compel Clarification of Prior Witness Statements.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: 10/13/2020, Terminated: 10/19/2020 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MOTION to Compel Clarification of Prior Witness Statements. Document filed by Parker H. Petit as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Pretrial Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 10/13/2020. A phone conference was held on October 13, 2020. Present for the Government were Danial Tracer and Edward Imperatore, AUSA's. For defendant Petit was William Weinreb and Michael Packard; and for defendant Taylor were Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, Matthew Menchel, and Altin Sila. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/11/2020, Entered: 10/11/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to preclude certain evidence and argument. Document filed by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Imperatore, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: 10/9/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/5/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: 10/9/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: Conference held on 10/5/20 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rebecca Forman, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/30/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2021. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: 10/9/2020 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Daniel Koffmann in Support as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: [74] MOTION to Continue Trial.. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: 10/9/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [74] MOTION to Continue Trial.. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/9/2020, Entered: 10/9/2020, Terminated: 10/21/2020 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue Trial. Document filed by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/6/2020, Entered: 10/6/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [69] MOTION in Limine #9: to require the government to prove the prerequisites for admission of certain alleged coconspirator statements outside the presence of the jury and prior to admitting them into evidence.. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to (1) admit prior act evidence to establish defendant Parker Petits knowledge of accounting/revenue recognition rules and intent as to the crimes charged in the Indictment; (2) preclude improper good acts evidence, (3) to preclude irrelevant post-conspiracy conduct, (4) to require the defendants to make a factual proffer to support any presence of counsel defense, and (5) to preclude argument or questioning regarding accounting advice that the defendants received, absent a proffered basis. Document filed by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit)(Hartman, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine to preclude expert testimony. Document filed by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (expert notice))(Imperatore, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION in Limine joining in Defendant Parker H. Petit's motions in limine, Dkt. No. [52]. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine #9: to require the government to prove the prerequisites for admission of certain alleged coconspirator statements outside the presence of the jury and prior to admitting them into evidence. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [67] MOTION in Limine #8: to exclude Mr. Taylor's memorandum on revenue recognition unless the government establishes certain prerequisites.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine #8: to exclude Mr. Taylor's memorandum on revenue recognition unless the government establishes certain prerequisites. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [65] MOTION in Limine #7: to exclude evidence of civil litigation involving Mr. Taylor.. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine #7: to exclude evidence of civil litigation involving Mr. Taylor. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [63] MOTION in Limine #6: to exclude certain prejudicial terms.. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine #6: to exclude certain prejudicial terms. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [61] MOTION in Limine #5: to exclude evidence regarding Mr. Taylor's termination from MiMedx.. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine #5: to exclude evidence regarding Mr. Taylor's termination from MiMedx. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [59] MOTION in Limine #4: to preclude the government from eliciting disguised expert testimony from certain witnesses.. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine #4: to preclude the government from eliciting disguised expert testimony from certain witnesses. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [57] MOTION in Limine #3: to exclude evidence relating to AvKARE.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine #3: to exclude evidence relating to AvKARE. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [55] MOTION in Limine #2: to exclude evidence of MiMedxs financial restatements.. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION in Limine #2: to exclude evidence of MiMedxs financial restatements. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by William Taylor re [53] MOTION in Limine #1: to exclude evidence relating to the MiMedx Audit Committees investigation and findings in 2018 and 2019.. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine #1: to exclude evidence relating to the MiMedx Audit Committees investigation and findings in 2018 and 2019. Document filed by William Taylor. (Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Parker H. Petit re [51] MOTION in Limine (Notice of Motion in Limine).. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/5/2020, Entered: 10/5/2020 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine (Notice of Motion in Limine). Document filed by Parker H. Petit. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Pretrial Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 10/5/2020. On October 5, 2020 a telephonic PTC was held before Judge Rakoff. Present were a court reporter, Counsel for defendant Petit Eric Bruce, Amanda Tuminelli, and Jennifer Loeb, Counsel for defendant Taylor William Weinreb and William Burke, Counsel for the government, AUSA's Edward Imperator, Scott Hartman, and Daniel Tracer. Court's Ruling: Any and all defense motions must be submitted by 10-9-2020, Government responses 10-15-2020, all replies by 10-19-2020. (Motions due by 10/9/2020. Responses due by 10/15/2020. Replies due by 10/19/2020.) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 10/2/2020.A phone PTC was held before Judge Rakoff without recording or transcription on October 2, 2020. Appearances: For deft Taylor was William Weinreb, for deft Petit was Eric Bruce, and for the Government was Scott Hartman, AUSA. Court's decision: A telephonic PTC is scheduled for October 5, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. The public may dial in: USA Toll-Free: (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. (Pretrial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: 9/25/2020 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Edward Imperatore, Scott Hartman and Daniel Tracer dated 9/25/2020 re: The Government and counsel for defendants Parker H. Petit and William Taylor jointly and respectfully write to propose an agreed-upon schedule governing pretrial matters in the above-captioned case. See Proposed Schedule Order...ENDORSEMENT... Approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 9/25/20)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 9/25/2020. A telephonic conference was held before Judge Rakoff on September 25,2020 without transcription or recording. Present for the Government was Scot Hartman, AUSA, present for defendant Petit was Altin Sila; present for Defendant Taylor was Michael Packard. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Pretrial Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 9/25/2020. A phone conference was held before Judge Rakoff on September 25, 2020. PRESENT: For Petit: Eric Bruce, Jennifer Loeb, and Matthew Menchel. For Taylor: William Weinreb, Michael Packard, and Daniel Kaufman. For the Government: Scott Hartman, Edward Imperatore, and Daniel Tracer, AUSA's. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Pretrial Conference as to Parker H. Petit held on 9/1/2020. A telephone conference was held 9-1-2020, before Judge Rakoff without recording or transcription. Present were counsel for both sides. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel Rickert Koffmann appearing for William Taylor. Appearance Type: Retained. (Koffmann, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/21/2020, Entered: 8/21/2020 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Edward Imperatore, Scott Hartman, Daniel Tracer dated 8/20/2020 re: The Government writes to request the Court exclude time. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/21/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/18/2020, Entered: 8/18/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO ADMIT COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/18/2020) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor to RE-FILE Document No. [46] MOTION for Jennifer B. Loeb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petit Parker. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21190557. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/17/2020, Entered: 8/17/2020, Terminated: 8/18/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jennifer B. Loeb to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Petit Parker. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-21190557. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Parker H. Petit as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-Declaration of Jennifer B. Loeb, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Text of Proposed Order)(Loeb, Jennifer) Modified on 8/18/2020 (bcu). Modified on 8/18/2020 (bcu).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Pretrial Conference as to Parker H. Petit held on 8/14/2020. A telephonic conference was held on August 14,2020 before Judge Rakoff. Present were counsel for both sides. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: 8/12/2020 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 8/12/2020 without transcription or recording. Counsel for all sides were present. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:Telephonic Conference as to Parker H. Petit held on 8/12/2020 without transcription or recording. Counsel for all sides were present (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/3/2020, Entered: 8/4/2020 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...(Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 8/3/2020)(lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit held on 7/15/2020. A phone application was held before Judge Rakoff on July 15, 2020 without transcription or recording. Present were counsel for both sides. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Drew Turner Johnson Skinner appearing for USA. (Skinner, Drew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. Court's Decision: Time is excluded in the interest of justice pursuant to Section 3161 of Title 18 until October 5, 2020. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 5/7/2020. A Telephonic Conference was held before Judge Rakoff on May 7, 2020. Counsel for Mr. Petit, Mr. Taylor, and the Government were present. Memo: "Due to the ongoing pandemic, jury trial for this case, previously scheduled to start on July 7, 2020 at 9:30 a.m., will instead start on October 5, 2020, at 9:30 a.m." (Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amanda Nicole Tuminelli appearing for Parker H. Petit. Appearance Type: Retained. (Tuminelli, Amanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: 3/12/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew I. Menchel appearing for Parker H. Petit. Appearance Type: Retained. (Menchel, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: 2/12/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing Further Redacted Version of Exhibit J(R) in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Discovery and Set Disclosure Deadlines as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: [38] Notice (Other),. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit J(R2), # (2) Certificate of Service)(Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 2/12/2020. A telephone conference (without audio/transcript) was held in the above captioned case. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: 2/11/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Parker H. Petit (1), William Taylor (2): defendants' motion to propound these interrogatories or take other discovery is hereby denied. Nor will the Court entertain any revised interrogatories or any other attempt to salvage defendants' motion, which the Court now perceives as wholly lacking in merit. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the entry bearing docket number 23. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/10/2020) (See ORDER as set forth) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Redacted Versions of Defendants' Joint Motion to Compel Discovery and Set Disclosure Deadlines and Supporting Exhibits J, M, and Q as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: [34] Order,,. (Attachments: # (1) Redacted Memorandum of Law, # (2) Exhibit J(R), # (3) Exhibit M(R), # (4) Exhibit Q(R), # (5) Certificate of Service)(Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Eric B. Bruce et al., dated 1/30/2020, re: Counsel writes to submit for the Court's consideration the enclosed proposed interrogatories to the Government and the Securities and Exchange Commission (SEC). (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Edward Imperatore, dated 2/4/2020, re: The Government respectfully submits this letter to oppose allowing the defendants to propound interrogatories to the Securities and Exchange Commission (the "SEC") and this Office ("the Government") regarding interactions with the audit committee of the board of directors of MiMedx Group, Inc. ("MiMedx") (the "Audit Committee").' Document filed by USA. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/10/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Stephen C. McKenna, dated 2/4/2020, re: The United States Securities and Exchange Commission ("SEC") submits this letter in response to Defendants' January 30, 2020 letter responding to this Court's January 23, 2020 Order regarding the submission of interrogatories to the Government and the SEC in the criminal matter United States v. Parker H Petit& William Taylor, 19 Cr. 85. Document filed by United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: 2/10/2020 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: MiMedx's letter motion with respect to what would qualify as fact work product is denied, whereas its motion with respect to opinion work product is granted. Accordingly, after careful review the exhibits, the Court directs defendants to redact the following parts of Exhibits J, M, and Q from the public docket, strike any references thereto in their motion to compel discovery, and refile the relevant documents by no later than February 10, 2020, at 5:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 2/6/2020) (***SEE ORDER AS FURTHER SET FORTH***)(lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 1/23/2020 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/3/2020, Entered: 2/3/2020 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: Conference held on 1/23/2020 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/5/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER by William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from William D. Weinreb, Michael T. Packard, dated 1/23/2020, re: Counsel writes: Undersigned counsel respectfully submits this letter on behalf of Defendant William Taylor, who is n LETTER by William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from William D. Weinreb, Michael T. Packard, dated 1/23/2020, re: Counsel writes: Undersigned counsel respectfully submits this letter on behalf of Defendant William Taylor, who is not present in the courtroom today. I hereby represent that I have discussed with Mr. Taylor his right to personally attend today's status conference and that Mr. Taylor has waived his right to personally attend these proceedings. Document fiot present in the courtroom today. I hereby represent that I have discussed with Mr. Taylor his right to personally attend today's status conference and that Mr. Taylor has waived his right to personally attend these proceedings. Document filed by William Taylor. (lnl) (Main Document 31 replaced on 2/11/2020) (lnl).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER by Parker H. Petit addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Eric B. Bruce, Altin H. Sila, dated 1/23/2020, re: Counsel writes: Undersigned counsel respectfully submits this letter on behalf of Defendant Parker H. Petit, who is not present in the courtroom today. I hereby represent that I have discussed with Mr. Petit his right to personally attend today's status conference and that Mr. Petit has waived his right to personally attend today's proceedings. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from David M. Rody, dated 1/29/2020, re: Counsel writes on behalf of MiMedx Group, Inc. in response to the January 27, 2020 letter submitted to the Court on behalf of Defendants Parker H. Petit and William Taylor ("Defendants' Letter") (ECF #26). (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: 1/31/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from David M. Rody, dated 1/23/2020, re: Counsel writes on behalf of MiMedx Group, Inc. to request that your Honor grant their request to quash Exhibit J (ECF #24-10), Exhibit M (ECF #24-13), and Exhibit Q (ECF# 24-17), and any reference to these documents in Defendants' Motion to Compel, and have these materials removed from the public docket. Counsel further requests that the Court order Defendants, the SEC, and the Department of Justice to return or destroy all copies of the documents referenced above in their possession in whatever format. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: 1/28/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff, from Attorneys for both parties dated 1/27/2020 re: Defense counsel writes to request that the Court deny request for order. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 1/28/2020. A telephone conference (without audio/transcript) was held in the above captioned case. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 1/28/2020. A telephone conference (without audio/transcript) was held in the above captioned case. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor: Notice to Attorney Weinreb, William to RE-FILE Document [26] Response. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: 1/27/2020 response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - JOINT RESPONSE by Parker H. Petit, William Taylor to 1/23/20 Letter from MiMedx. (Weinreb, William) Modified on 1/28/2020 (ka).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 1/23/2020. A telephone conference (without audio/transcript) was held in the above captioned case (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Pretrial Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 1/23/2020. Defts' interrogatories by 1-30-2020, SEC & Gov't to respond to wording of said interrogatories by 2-4-2020. Defts' bail continued. Deft #1, Petit, on phone, counsel in courtroom - Eric Bruce & Altin Sila, Deft #2, Taylor on phone, counsel in courtroom: William Weinreb & Michael Packard, Govt present by Scott Hartman & Edward Imperatore, AUSA's; Court reporter present. ARG heard on defts' motion at 23 on the docket. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certificate of Service of [23] JOINT MOTION to Compel (Notice of Motion)., [24] Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by Parker H. Petit as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor.. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 memorandum in support of motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support by Parker H. Petit as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re [23] JOINT MOTION to Compel (Notice of Motion).. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E, # (6) Exhibit F, # (7) Exhibit G, # (8) Exhibit H, # (9) Exhibit I, # (10) Exhibit J, # (11) Exhibit K, # (12) Exhibit L, # (13) Exhibit M, # (14) Exhibit N, # (15) Exhibit O, # (16) Exhibit P, # (17) Exhibit Q, # (18) Exhibit R, # (19) Exhibit S, # (20) Exhibit T, # (21) Exhibit U, # (22) Exhibit V)(Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020, Terminated: 2/11/2020 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JOINT MOTION to Compel (Notice of Motion). Document filed by Parker H. Petit as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 1/21/2020. A telephone conference (without audio/transcript) was held in the above captioned case. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference (without audio/transcript) as to Parker H. Petit held on 1/17/2020. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit held on 1/16/2020 (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit held on 12/12/2019 (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/4/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor re: Conference held on 12/4/19 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/13/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to William Taylor addressed to Judge Jed S. Rakoff from Edward Imperatore, Scott Hartman, Daniel Tracer dated 12/3/2019 re: The Government writes to request a conference to address potential conflict of interest Document filed by USA. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/4/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 1/2/2020 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEARANCE BOND Entered as to Parker H. Petit: $1 MILLION PRB, SECURED BY REAL PROPERTY WITH SUFFICIENT EQUITY TO SECURE THE FULL BOND AMOUNT; 1 FRP; TRAVEL RESTRICTED CONTINENTAL U.S; SURRENDER ALL TRAVEL DOCUMENTS AND MAKE NO NEW APPLICATIONS; PRETRIAL SUPERVISION AS DIRECTED BY PTS; DEFT NOT TO POSSESS FIREARMS/DESTRUCTIVE DEVICES/OTHER WEAPONS; DEFT TO BE RELEASED ON OWN SIGNATURE; REMAINING CONDITIONS TO BE MET BY 12/12/19; DEFT TO BE SUPERVISED IN NDGA; ABSENT THE ADVANCE WRITTEN APPROVAL OF THE GOVERNMENT, DEFT SHALL HAVE NO CONTACT (DIRECT OR INDIRECT), OUTSIDE OF THE PRESENCE OF COUNSEL, WITH (A) CURRENT OR FORMER MIMEDX EMPLOYEES (B) CURRENT OR FORMER EMPLOYEES/REPRESENTATIVES OF MIMEDX DISTRIBUTORS OR AUDITORS; (C) CURRENT OR FORMER MIMEDX COUNSEL; EXCEPT FOR INADVERTENT/NON-SUBSTANTIVE SOCIAL CONTACT; DEF. SHALL HAVE NO SUBSTANTIVE DISCUSSION CONCERNING THIS CASE, OUTSIDE OF THE PRESENCE OF COUNSEL, WITH HIS CO-DEFT; DEFT SHALL HAVE NO SUBSTANTIVE DISCUSSION CONCERNING THIS CASE, OUTSIDE OF THE PRESENCE OF COUNSEL, WITH HIS CHILDREN OR WITH TODD CAMPBELL. (Advice of Penalties and Sanctions attached.) (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appearance Bond as to William Taylor (jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to William Taylor held on 12/4/2019. Defendant present with retained counsel Bill Weinreb. AUSA Edward Imperatore present for the government. Voluntary arrest. BAIL DISPOSITION: AGREED CONDITIONS OF RELEASE; $500,000 PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE BOND; TO BE COSIGNED BY ONE FINANCIALLY RESPONSIBLE PERSON; TRAVEL RESTRICTED TO THE CONTINENTAL U.S.; SURRENDER TRAVEL DOCUMENTS AND NO NEW APPLICATIONS; PRETRIAL SUPERVISION AS DIRECTED BY PRETRIAL SERVICES; DEFT TO BE RELEASED ON OWN SIGNATURE; REMAINING CONDITIONS TO BE MET BY 12/12/19; *Defendant to be supervised in N.D.Ga.; *Absent the advance written approval of the government, defendant shall have no contact (direct or indirect), outside of the presence of counsel, with (a) current or former MiMedx employees (b) current or former employees/representatives of MiMedx distributors or auditors; (c) current or former MiMedx counsel; except for inadvertent/ nonsubstantive social contact. *Defendant shall have no substantive discussion concerning this case, outside of the presence of counsel, with his co-def. *Defendant shall have no no contact, outside the presence of counsel, with defendant Petit's children or with Todd Campbell. Conference before District Judge on 12/4/19. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to Parker H. Petit held on 12/4/2019. Defendant present with retained counsel Eric Bruce. AUSA Edward Imperatore present for the government. BAIL DISPOSITION: AGREED CONDITIONS OF RELEASE; $1 MILLION PRB, SECURED BY REAL PROPERTY WITH SUFFICIENT EQUITY TO SECURE THE FULL BOND AMOUNT; 1 FRP; TRAVEL RESTRICTED CONTINENTAL U.S; SURRENDER ALL TRAVEL DOCUMENTS AND MAKE NO NEW APPLICATIONS; PRETRIAL SUPERVISION AS DIRECTED BY PTS; DEFT NOT TO POSSESS FIREARMS/DESTRUCTIVE DEVICES/OTHER WEAPONS; DEFT TO BE RELEASED ON OWN SIGNATURE; REMAINING CONDITIONS TO BE MET BY 12/12/19; DEFT TO BE SUPERVISED IN NDGA; ABSENT THE ADVANCE WRITTEN APPROVAL OF THE GOVERNMENT, DEFT SHALL HAVE NO CONTACT (DIRECT OR INDIRECT), OUTSIDE OF THE PRESENCE OF COUNSEL, WITH (A) CURRENT OR FORMER MIMEDX EMPLOYEES (B) CURRENT OR FORMER EMPLOYEES/REPRESENTATIVES OF MIMEDX DISTRIBUTORS OR AUDITORS; (C) CURRENT OR FORMER MIMEDX COUNSEL; EXPCEPT FOR INADVERTENT/NONSUBSTANTIVE SOCIAL CONTACT; DEF. SHALL HAVE NO SUBSTANTIVE DICUSSION CONCERNING THIS CASE, OUTSIDE OF THE PRESENCE OF COUNSEL, WITH HIS CO-DEFT; DEFT SHALL HAVE NO SUBSTANTIVE DISCUSSION CONCERNING THIS CASE, OUTSIDE OF THE PRESENCE OF COUNSEL, WITH HIS CHILDREN OR WITH TODD CAMPBELL. Conference before District Judge on 12/4/19. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER FORADMISSION PRO HAC VICE as to William Taylor (2) on [7] Motion for William D. Weinreb to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/4/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Order on Motion to appear pro hac viceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE as to William Taylor (2)on [8] MOTION for Michael T. Packard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/4/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Plea Entered
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Plea entered by Parker H. Petit (1) Count 1,2 and William Taylor (2) Count 1,2 Not Guilty. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Arraignment as to Parker H. Petit (1) Count 1,2 and William Taylor (2) Count 1,2 held on 12/4/2019. Defendant #1, Petit, present w/attorney Eric Bruce. Defendant #2, Taylor, present w/attorney William Burck. Government present by Edward Imperatore, AUSA. Court reporter present. Discovery to close 12-18-2019, Motions due 1-22-2020, next appearance 1-23-2020 at 2:00pm, TDS 7-7-2020. TIME EXCLUDED in the interest of justice, pursuant to Section 3161 of Title 18. Defendants' bail continued. (jbo); Modified on 1/22/2020 (bw).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor held on 12/4/201. A telephone conference (without audio/transcript) was held in the above captioned case. (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor from the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia. (jm) (Main Document 12 replaced on 12/4/2019) (jm).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [7] MOTION for William D. Weinreb to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18186049. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., [8] MOTION for Michael T. Packard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18186853. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eric Brendan Bruce appearing for Parker H. Petit. Appearance Type: Retained. (Bruce, Eric)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Altin Herbert Sila appearing for Parker H. Petit. Appearance Type: Retained. (Sila, Altin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE [11] Notice of Appearance) - NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Eric Brendan Bruce appearing for Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. Appearance Type: Retained. (Bruce, Eric) Modified on 12/5/2019 (db).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019, Terminated: 12/4/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Michael T. Packard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18186853. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael T. Packard, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts)(Packard, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019, Terminated: 12/4/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for William D. Weinreb to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18186049. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William Taylor. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of William D. Weinreb, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts)(Weinreb, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael Barry Carlinsky appearing for William Taylor. Appearance Type: Retained. (Carlinsky, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Anthony Burck appearing for William Taylor. Appearance Type: Retained. (Burck, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order to Unseal Indictment as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 11/26/19)(jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Arrest of Parker H. Petit, William Taylor in the United States District Court - Northern District of Georgia. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Indictment Unsealed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Designated ECF as to Parker H. Petit, William Taylor. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/27/2019 indictment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED INDICTMENT FILED as to Parker H. Petit (1) count(s) 1, 2, William Taylor (2) count(s) 1, 2. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 324 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?