AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION et al v. AZAR
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-03619

Tags
Last Updated February 25, 2021 at 3:30 PM ST (7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Hospital Association, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Margaret Cook +1 202 637 6684 +1 202 637 5910 susan.cook@hoganlovells.com
Space Kyle M Druding +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 kyle.druding@hoganlovells.com
Space Catherine E. Stetson +1 202 637 5491 +1 202 637 5910 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Association Of American Medical Colleges, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Margaret Cook +1 202 637 6684 +1 202 637 5910 susan.cook@hoganlovells.com
Space Kyle M Druding +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 kyle.druding@hoganlovells.com
Space Catherine E. Stetson +1 202 637 5491 +1 202 637 5910 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
No Logo BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Margaret Cook +1 202 637 6684 +1 202 637 5910 susan.cook@hoganlovells.com
Space Kyle M Druding +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 kyle.druding@hoganlovells.com
Space Catherine E. Stetson +1 202 637 5491 +1 202 637 5910 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Federation Of American Hospitals, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Margaret Cook +1 202 637 6684 +1 202 637 5910 susan.cook@hoganlovells.com
Space Kyle M Druding +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 kyle.druding@hoganlovells.com
Space Catherine E. Stetson +1 202 637 5491 +1 202 637 5910 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
No Logo MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Margaret Cook +1 202 637 6684 +1 202 637 5910 susan.cook@hoganlovells.com
Space Kyle M Druding +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 kyle.druding@hoganlovells.com
Space Catherine E. Stetson +1 202 637 5491 +1 202 637 5910 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
No Logo NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Margaret Cook +1 202 637 6684 +1 202 637 5910 susan.cook@hoganlovells.com
Space Kyle M Druding +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 kyle.druding@hoganlovells.com
Space Catherine E. Stetson +1 202 637 5491 +1 202 637 5910 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
No Logo PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan Lovells US LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Margaret Cook +1 202 637 6684 +1 202 637 5910 susan.cook@hoganlovells.com
Space Kyle M Druding +1 202 637 5600 +1 202 637 5910 kyle.druding@hoganlovells.com
Space Catherine E. Stetson +1 202 637 5491 +1 202 637 5910 cate.stetson@hoganlovells.com
v.
Azar, II, Alex Michael Azar, II, Alex Michael, Defendant
Officially listed as "ALEX M. AZAR, II"
Office Washington, DC
Filed 12/4/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 899 - Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County 11001
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/25/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/23/2020, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/7/2020, Entered: None Joint Appendix
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/4/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Amicus Brief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/14/2019, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Mitchell Druding on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Druding, Kyle)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Margaret Cook on behalf of AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER (Cook, Susan)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                  LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                    LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                      LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                        LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                          LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                            LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION (Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Complaint
                                                                              COMPLAINT against ALEX M. AZAR, II ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6613217) filed by PROVIDENCE HEALTH SYSTEM - SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA d/b/a PROVIDENCE HOLY CROSS MEDICAL CENTER, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN HOSPITALS, BOTHWELL REGIONAL HEALTH CENTER, ASSOCIATION OF AMERICAN MEDICAL COLLEGES, AMERICAN HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHILDREN'S HOSPITALS, MEMORIAL COMMUNITY HOSPITAL AND HEALTH SYSTEM. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Summons, # (3) Summons, # (4) Summons)(Stetson, Catherine)
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?