Waymo LLC v. Shenzhen Waydoo Intelligence Technologyco., Ltd.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 88257835-EXT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 3, 2020 at 8:02 AM ST (1.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Shenzhen Waydoo Intelligence Technologyco., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shenzhen Waydoo Int; Shenzhen Waydoo Int
Waymo LLC Waymo LLC, Potential Opposer

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fabricio Vayra And Craig Beaker
Type Extension of Time
Date in Location 7/11/2019
Status Code 1
Location Code 845
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None N
Terminated
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 10/14/2019, Entered: None T
    Ext Granted
      LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 10/14/2019, Entered: None T
      Final 60-day Request To Ext Time To Oppose
        LREF
        Blank 2 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: None T
        Ext Granted
          LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: None T
          First 90-day Request To Ext Time To Oppose
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 5 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?