Johnson Controls Security Solutions v. Tesla, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV359800

Tags

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Last Updated May 17, 2021 at 11:28 PM DT (4.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Johnson Controls Security Solutions, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jeffrey S Flashman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Flashman, Jeffrey S +1 310 277 5005
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Case Type Breach of Contract/Warranty Unlimited (06)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 12 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Request Dismissal
entire without prejudice by atty Flashman
    Legal Document 11 Filed: 7/21/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
    re: Request for Dismissal - Document must be e-filed
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Default Not Entered
      Item 6(b)(2) must list the defaulted party's name (it is okay to list their agent, but please make sure the party's name is also listed as it appears on the complaint for completeness).
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: None Notice
        Notice of Continued CMC/Hearing
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Default Not Entered
          #6b2 must match the name on the complaint
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Statement: Case Management Conference
            Case Management Statement
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Notice
              Notice of Case Management Conference
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Returned/Undeliverable Mail
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/2/2020, Entered: None Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                    Summons
                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 670 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?