CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE v. NATL. HIGHWAY TRAF.
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:92-cv-01151-GAG
District Judge Gerhard A. Gesell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 10, 2019 at 3:07 PM EST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Center For Auto Safety, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The George Washington University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan B. Morrison +1 202 994 7120 abmorrison@law.gwu.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Reinherz Quitma Wolfson +1 202 663 6390 +1 202 663 6363 paul.wolfson@wilmerhale.com
v.
National Highway Traffic Safety Administration National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth Ann Pugh +1 202 514 3178
Office Washington, DC
Filed 5/15/1992
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County 11001
Terminated 1/8/1993
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags CLOSED,TYPE-I
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 3/18/1994, Entered: 4/21/1994 USCA order
COPY of Order filed in USCA dated 3/17/94, on appeal [19-1] , dismissing appeal . USCA # 93-5045 (mbd)
    LREF
    Blank  USCA Case Number
    USCA # 93-5045 assigned for appeal [19-1] by CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE (ks)
      LREF
      Blank  Appeal Record Sent to USCA
      TRANSMITTED PRELIMINARY RECORD on appeal [19-1] by CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE to U.S. Court of Appeals (ks)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 2/17/1993, Entered: 2/18/1993 Notice of appeal
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE from order [18-1] entered on: 1/11/93; $5.00 filing fee and $100.00 docketing fee paid to U.S. Treasury; Copies mailed to Robert A. Van Kirk (ks) Modified on 02/18/1993
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 1/8/1993, Entered: 1/11/1993 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER by Judge Gerhard A. Gesell : denying motion for summary judgment [11-1] by CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE, granting motion for summary judgment [7-1] by NATL. HIGHWAY TRAF. (N) (ks)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 1/8/1993, Entered: 1/11/1993 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM by Judge Gerhard A. Gesell (N) (ks)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 12/23/1992, Entered: 12/28/1992 Reply to opposition to Motion
              REPLY by plaintiff CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE to response to motion for summary judgment [11-1] by CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE. Declarations (2) (ajr)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 12/12/1992, Entered: 12/14/1992 Memorandum in opposition
                RESPONSE by defendant NATL. HIGHWAY TRAF. in opposition to motion for summary judgment [11-1] by CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE (ks)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 12/12/1992, Entered: 12/14/1992 Reply to opposition to Motion
                  REPLY by defendant NATL. HIGHWAY TRAF. to response to motion for summary judgment [7-1] by NATL. HIGHWAY TRAF.; Attachments; Exhibits (4) (ks)
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 12/3/1992, Entered: 12/3/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Gerhard A. Gesell: setting forth the new and final schedule is as follows: defendant's response to plaintiff's cross motion for summary judgment due 12/11/92 and reply on its motion for summary judgment 12/11/92; plaintiff's reply to its cross motion due 12/23/92 ; the motion papaers are to be served by hand no later than the dates indicated (N) (bm) Modified on 12/03/1992
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 12/3/1992, Entered: 12/3/1992 stipulation
                      STIPULATION altering briefing schedule. (N) (bm)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 11/6/1992, Entered: 11/9/1992 Motion for summary judgment
                        MOTION filed by plaintiff(s) CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE for summary judgment ; Declarations (3); Exhibits (3) (ks)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 10/26/1992, Entered: 10/26/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER by Judge Gerhard A. Gesell: setting forth the new schedule as follows: plaintiff shall file its cross motion due 11/6/92 and response to defendant's motion for summary judgment due 11/6/92; defendant shall filee its response to plaintiff's cross motions due 12/4/92 and reply for summary judgment due 12/4/92; plaintiff's reply to cross motions due 12/11/92 (N) (bm)
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 10/23/1992, Entered: 10/26/1992 stipulation
                            AMENDED STIPULATION regarding altering briefing schedule. (N) (bm)
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 9/29/1992, Entered: 9/30/1992 Answer
                              ANSWER by defendant NATL. HIGHWAY TRAF. to amended complaint (ks)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/22/1992, Entered: 9/23/1992 Motion for summary judgment
                                MOTION filed by defendant NATL. HIGHWAY TRAF. for summary judgment ; Exhibits (9) (ks)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/15/1992, Entered: 9/16/1992 Amended Complaint
                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff(s) CENTER FOR AUTO SAFE (ks)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 9/9/1992, Entered: 9/9/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                    STIPULATED ORDER altering briefing schedule by Judge Gerhard A. Gesell : plaintiff to file amended complaint by 9/15/92; answer due 9/29/92; dispositive motions due 9/22/92 ; response to dispositive motions due 10/28/92 ; reply due one week after response is filed (N) (ks)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 6/26/1992, Entered: 6/29/1992 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Gerhard A. Gesell : defendant's dispositive motions due 9/1/92 ; response to dispositive motions due 9/22/92 ; (N) (ks)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                        STATUS HEARING before Judge Gerhard A. Gesell : motion for summary judgment due 9/1/92 ; response to motion for summary judgment due 9/22/92 reply motion for summary judgment due 9/29/92 ; reporter: Santa Zizzo (ks)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/15/1992, Entered: 6/16/1992 Answer
                                          ANSWER for defendant NATL. HIGHWAY TRAF. , (ks)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                            CALENDARED (ks)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/1/1992, Entered: 6/2/1992 summons returned executed
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon U.S. Attorney personally on 5/18/92; and upon U.S. Attorney General by certified mail on 5/19/92; Attachments (ks)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 5/15/1992, Entered: 5/18/1992 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT filed summons issued (3) (ks)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?