Vernon v. Tesla Energy et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-02356-JAH-RBB
District Judge John A. Houston, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 12, 2021 at 3:47 PM EST (11 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Mark E. Vernon, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo ROE Corporations, Partnerships or Other Business Entities 1-10, Defendant
SolarCity Corporation SolarCity Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Solarcity Corp."
No Logo Tesla Energy, Defendant
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
Office San Diego
Filed 12/10/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $30000
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity Action
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County San Diego
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/17/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Notice and Order of Document Discrepancies
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark E. Vernon. (smd)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ROE Corporations, Partnerships or Other Business Entities 1-10, Solarcity Corp., Tesla Energy, Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., IFP Filed, filed by Mark E. Vernon. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet, # (2) Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2356-JAH-RBB. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Vernon, Mark)(smd)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?