Think Computer Foundation v. Rebecca Fleming et al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Case No. 19CV359896

Tags

Reality Check: Tesla, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 7, 2020 article Reality Check: Tesla, Inc..

Last Updated May 17, 2021 at 11:28 PM DT (4.1 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Foundation Think Computer Foundation, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Michael T. Risher

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Temple Risher +1 415 621 2493 +1 415 255 8437 michael@risherlaw.com
v.
No Logo Fleming, Rebecca, Respondent
No Logo Superior Court of California, County of Santa Clara, Respondent
Case Type Other Petition (Not Spec) Unlimited (43)
Case Status Active
Case Location Civil
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS
Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/6/2020, Entered: None Request Dismissal
    Request for Dismissal
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
      re: stipulation to extend time to file responsive pleadings pending anticipated dismissal - extended to 6-26-20 - signed by Judge Manoukian
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None stipulation
        Fourth Stipulation to Further Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings (Pending Anticipated Dismissal)
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/14/2020, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
          to extend time to file responsive pleading - GRANTED until 4-24-20 by Judge Manoukian *see order for details*
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/26/2020, Entered: None stipulation
            Third Stipulation to Further Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/6/2020, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
              re: extension of tme to file response - GRANTED. Defs shall have up to and including March 26, 2020 to file pleadings - signed by Judge Manoukian
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None stipulation
                Second Stipulation to Further Extend Time to File Responsive Pleadings
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order
                  Re: Extending Time To File Responsive Pleadings
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Notice Entry Of Order
                    Notice of Entry of Order Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: None stipulation
                      Stipulation Extending Time to File Responsive Pleadings
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Clerk Rejection Letter
                        #380318 Stipulation and Order- Government Exempt parties must choose "Waiver" as payment method. Exempt code should be on caption page.
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Summons: Issued/Filed
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Civil Case Cover Sheet
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Petition (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 612 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?