USA v. Doe 2010R03793
Federal Court Proceeding Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:19-dm-00012-AJT

Tags
Last Updated December 11, 2019 at 8:48 PM EST (2.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon D. Kromberg +1 703 299 3700 gordon.kromberg@usdoj.gov
Space Thomas W. Traxler +1 703 299 3700 thomas.traxler@usdoj.gov
v.
Manning, Chelsea Manning, Chelsea, Defendant
Officially listed as "John Doe 2010R03793"

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra Christine Freeman +1 720 593 9004 sandra.c.freeman@protonmail.com

Represented by The Law Office of Christopher Leibig LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Leibig +1 703 683 4310 +1 703 684 9700 chris@chrisleibiglaw.com
John Doe 2010R03793 (2)
Office Alexandria
Filed 5/3/2019
County Fairfax
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: 8/5/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
ORDERED that Chelsea Manning's motion for reconsideration [Doc. 14] be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 08/05/2019. (jlan)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/5/2019, Entered: 8/5/2019 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
    ORDERED that Chelsea Manning be, and she hereby is declared, in civil contempt of court for refusing to testify before the Grand Jury, as ordered; and it is further ORDERED that Chelsea Manning be REMANDED to the custody of the Attorney General until such time as she purges herself of contempt or for the life of the grand jury, but in no event longer than a term of 18 months, with credit for time served in the prior grand jury matter in which she was confined (see order for further details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 08/05/2019. (jlan)
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Sealed document
      Sealed Letter. (dest, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019 Reply to Response
        REPLY TO RESPONSE to by John Doe 2010R03793 re [21] Response in Opposition, [24] Notice (Other) (Leibig, Christopher)
          LREF
          Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019 Notice - other
          NOTICE Intent to Reply to Government's Motion by John Doe 2010R03793 re [21] Response in Opposition, (Leibig, Christopher)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 Sealed document
            Ex Parte Sealed Document. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(dest )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 Redacted Document
              Redacted version of [4] Memorandum,, Exparte, filed by USA (Traxler, Thomas)
                LREF
                Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 Response In Opposition
                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to John Doe 2010R03793 re [14] First Letter Motion to Reconsider (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit M)(Traxler, Thomas)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 Order on Sealed Motion +Court Filing
                ORDER granting [19] Sealed Motion as to John Doe 2010R03793 (2). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/13/2019. (rban, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019, Terminated: 6/13/2019 ~~SEALED Motion
                  Sealed Motion to Unseal by USA as to John Doe 2010R03793. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(dest, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Excerpt of Unsealed Proceedings held on May 16, 2019, before Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Court reporter/transcriber Julie Goodwin, Telephone number 571-970-3191. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/11/2019.(egal, julie)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Sealed documentCourt Filing
                      Sealed Transcript of Proceeding before District Judge Trenga 5/16/2019. (rban, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/12/2019, Entered: 6/12/2019 order on motion for leave to fileCourt Filing
                        ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that prose movant David Andrew Christenson's Motion for Leave to File Motion to Intervene [Doc. 15] be, and the same hereby is, DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that since movant is not a party to these proceedings, no additional submissions from the movant shall be docketed in this case as to John Doe 2010R03793 (2). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/12/2019. (dest, ) (copy mailed to pro se movant)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/5/2019, Entered: 6/6/2019 motion for leave to file
                          MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Intervene by David Andrew Christenson as to John Doe 2010R03793. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment- 1, # (2) Attachment- 2, # (3) Attachment- 3, # (4) Attachment- 4, # (5) Attachment- 5, # (6) Attachment- 6, # (7) Letter)(dest, )
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/31/2019, Entered: 5/31/2019, Terminated: 8/5/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                            First Letter Motion to Reconsider by John Doe 2010R03793. (Attachments: # (1) Letter Letter to Judge Trenga)(Leibig, Christopher)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019, Terminated: 8/5/2019 Letter Motion
                              First Letter Motion Statement of Motion by John Doe 2010R03793. (Leibig, Christopher)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                Memorandum by USA as to John Doe 2010R03793 Regarding Calculation of 18-Month Limit on Imprisonment (Traxler, Thomas)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/29/2019, Entered: 5/29/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Thomas W. Traxler appearing for USA. (Traxler, Thomas)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Exparte
                                    EX PARTE Memorandum by USA as to John Doe 2010R03793 (dest, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDERED that Chelsea Manning be, and she hereby is declared, in civil contempt of court for refusing to testify before the Grand Jury, as ordered; that Chelsea Manning be REMANDED to the custody of the Attorney General until such time as she purges herself of contempt or for the life of the grand jury, but in no event longer than 18 months; that if Chelsea Manning does not purge herself of contempt within 30 days of this Order, she shall incur a conditional fine of $500 per day until such time as she purges herself of contempt and if she fails to purge herself within 60 days after the date of the issuance of this Order, a conditional fine of $1,000 per day until such time as she purges herself of contempt or for the life of the grand jury. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/16/2019. (rban, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 Contempt HearingCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga: Hearing as to Grand Jury Case No. 10-GJ-3793 held on 5/16/2019. Chelsea Manning's Motions to Quash - Argued and Denied. Show Cause hearing held as to why the witness should not be held in contempt. Argument heard. The Court finds that Ms. Manning is unable to show just cause why she should not be required to testify before the Grand Jury and finds her in contempt of court. Courtroom open for the sanction phase of the hearing. Argument heard. Ms. Manning committed to the custody of the US Attorney General until such time as she purges herself of contempt, or the for the life of the grand jury, not to exceed 18 months. If she does not purge herself of contempt in 30 days, she is to pay a daily fine of $500.00, and after 60 days a daily fine of $1000.00. Counsel to file briefs within 14 days regarding whether the time she has served on the previous contempt order applies to the eighteen month term in this contempt proceeding. Witness remanded. (Court Reporter: J. Egal)(tarm) (# (1) Documents Rec'd in open court) (tarm)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/17/2019 motion to quash
                                          MOTION to Quash by John Doe 2010R03793. (kbar, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 response
                                            RESPONSE in Opposition to Chelsea Manning's Motions to Quash for Disclosure of Electronic Surveillance by USA as to John Doe 2010R03793 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(aott)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Case Unsealed
                                              Case unsealed as to John Doe 2010R03793 (rban, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 MEMORANDUM
                                                Bench Memorandum by USA as to John Doe 2010R03793 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A- Part 1, # (2) Exhibit A-Part 2, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D-Part 1, # (6) Exhibit D-Part 2, # (7) Exhibit E, # (8) Exhibit F, # (9) Exhibit G, # (10) Exhibit H, # (11) Exhibit I, # (12) Exhibit J, # (13) Exhibit K, # (14) Exhibit L, # (15) Exhibit M, # (16) Exhibit N, # (17) Exhibit O)(aott, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                ORDER granting [1] APPLICATION for Compulsion Order as to John Doe 2010R03793 (2). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/3/2019. (dest, )
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/3/2019, Entered: 5/8/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                  APPLICATION for Compulsion Order by USA as to John Doe 2010R03793. (dest, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?