USA v. Parnas
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cr-00725-JPO

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2020 at 10:07 PM EST (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebekah Allen Donaleski +1 212 637 2423 +1 212 637 2443 Rebekah.Donaleski@usdoj.gov
Space Nicolas Tyler Landsman-Roos +1 212 637 2421 nicolas.roos@usdoj.gov
Space Douglas Samuel Zolkind +1 914 993 1928 +1 914 993 1980 douglas.zolkind@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Parnas Lev, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lev Parnas"
Officer/Director, Dairene International

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward B MacMahon Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward B. MacMahon +1 540 687 3902 +1 540 687 6366 ebmjr@macmahon-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Joseph A Bondy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Lev Parnas (1)
Office Foley Square
Filed 10/9/2019
County NewYork
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1001.F
Offense Level 4
181001.F STATEMENTS OR ENTRIES GENERALLY (FALSE STATEMENTS)
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1519.F
Offense Level 4
181519.F DESTRUCTION, ALTERATION OR FALSIFICATION OF RECORDS IN FEDERAL INVESTIGATIONS (FALSIFICATIONS OF RECORDS)
Count 4
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371.F CONSPIRACY TO DEFRAUD THE UNITED STATES
Defendant Custody Status Released
Flag ECF
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Lev Parnas (1) granting [71] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 15, 2019 re: Modification of terms of pre-trial release, to allow Lev Parnas to travel with his counsel to the New York Offices of CNN, to tape an interview with Anderson Cooper (unopposed). ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/15/2020) (ap)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: 1/15/2020, Terminated: 1/15/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 15, 2019 re: Modification of terms of pre-trial release, to allow Lev Parnas to travel with his counsel to the New York Offices of CNN, to tape an interview with Anderson Cooper (unopposed) . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: 1/14/2020 Motion to appear pro hac vice
      MOTION for Jeffrey E. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Correia. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Jeffrey)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank  Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
        >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. [70] MOTION for Jeffrey E. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice Corrected. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
          MEMO ENDORSED granting [68] LETTER MOTION (Date Corrected) Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a Samsung phone, iPad and iPhone, to the US House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump (unopposed). as to Lev Parnas (1)...ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Defendant Lev Parnas may produce the materials referenced herein to the United States House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/13/20) (jbo)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: 1/13/2020, Terminated: 1/13/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy dated January 3, 2020 re: (Date Corrected) Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a Samsung phone, iPad and iPhone, to the US House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump (unopposed). Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Event Type Error
              NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Lev Parnas: Notice to Attorney Bondy, Joseph to RE-FILE Document [66] MOTION to Amend/Correct. Date-Corrected LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 11, 2020 re: Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/11/2020, Entered: 1/11/2020 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Stephanie Renee Schuman appearing for Lev Parnas. Appearance Type: Retained. (Schuman, Stephanie)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/11/2020, Entered: 1/11/2020, Terminated: 1/11/2020 motion to amend/correctCourt Filing
                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Amend/Correct. Date-Corrected, LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 11, 2020 re: Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a Samsung phone, iPad and iPhone, to the US House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump (unopposed). Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph) Modified on 1/13/2020 (ka).
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/11/2020, Entered: 1/11/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated January 11, 2019 re: Modification of the Protective Order to allow production of materials extracted from certain of Mr. Parnas' electronic devices, including a Samsung phone, an iPad and an iPhone, to the US House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump (unopposed). Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/9/2020, Entered: 1/9/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gerald B. Lefcourt dated 1/9/2020 re: [45] LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gerald B. Lefcourt dated 12/12/19 re: surveillance ., [61] Letter REPLY. Document filed by Andrey Kukushkin. (Lefcourt, Gerald)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                        MEMO ENDORSED as to Andrey Kukushkin re: [62] Letter Requesting Deadline of January 9, 2020 For Defense Reply...ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/7/20)(jbo)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/7/2020, Entered: 1/7/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                          LETTER by Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gerald B. Lefcourt dated 1/7/2020 re: Requesting Deadline of January 9, 2020 For Defense Reply (Lefcourt, Gerald)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank  ***Set/Reset Deadlines
                            Set/Reset Deadlines as to Andrey Kukushkin: Replies due by 1/9/2020. (jbo)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 LetterCourt Filing
                              LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated January 3, 2020 re: Kukushkin Surveillance Motion Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 Order on Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                MEMO ENDORSED granting [58] LETTER MOTION Unopposed Modification of the Protective Order Governing Discovery, to allow production of materials seized from Mr. Parnas's home and the contents of his iPhone 11 to the United States House of Representatives' Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump as to Lev Parnas (1)...ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Defendant Lev Parnas may produce the materials referenced herein to the United States House of Representatives Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/3/20) (jbo)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: 1/3/2020 Order on Motion to withdraw as attorneyCourt Filing
                                  ORDER as to Lev Parnas (1). On December 24, 2019, Attorney Edward B. MacMahon, Jr., counsel of record for Defendant Lev Parnas, moved to withdraw from this case. (Dkt. No. 57.) That request is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Mr. MacMahon from the case and close the motion at Docket Number 57. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 1/3/20) (jbo)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: 12/30/2019, Terminated: 1/3/2020 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 30, 2019 re: Unopposed Modification of the Protective Order Governing Discovery, to allow production of materials seized from Mr. Parnas's home and the contents of his iPhone 11 to the United States House of Representatives' Permanent Select Committee on Intelligence, in connection with the impeachment inquiry of President Donald J. Trump . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: 12/24/2019, Terminated: 1/3/2020 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                      MOTION for Edward B. MacMahon, Jr. to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Attachments: # (1) Affirmation of Counsel)(MacMahon, Edward)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                        LETTER by Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 20, 2019 re: Submission of Redacted Exhibits from Bail Review Hearing of December 17, 2019 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit SunTrust Banking Records (Redacted), # (2) Exhibit Chase Bank Records (Redacted), # (3) Exhibit E-Mail Correspondence (Redacted), # (4) Exhibit Accountant Letter (Redacted))(Bondy, Joseph)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Joseph A. Bondy dated 12/20/2019 re: Counsel writes regarding redacted items. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Defendant's counsel is directed to file on ECF the exhibits with the proposed redactions. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/20/2019) (ap)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019, Terminated: 12/20/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jeffrey E. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18333271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by David Correia. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Jeffrey Marcus, # (2) Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order)(Marcus, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/20/2019 (bcu).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Lev Parnas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Oral Argument proceeding held on 12/17/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: 12/20/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas re: Oral Argument held on 12/17/19 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/10/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/19/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                  >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice as to David Correia to RE-FILE Document No. [54] MOTION for Jeffrey E. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18333271. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 Memo EndorsementCourt Filing
                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Andrey Kukushkin on re: [48] LETTER by USA as to Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated December 18, 2019 re: Response Deadline. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So ordered. (Responses due by 1/3/2020) (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/19/2019) (ap)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/19/2019, Entered: 12/19/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                      LETTER by Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gerald B. Lefcourt dated 12/19/19 re: providing decision of United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit in U.S. v. Hasbajrami, Dkt. No. 15-2684-L; 17-2669-CON (Attachments: # (1) Second Circuit Decision)(Lefcourt, Gerald)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                        LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated December 18, 2019 re: Bail Hearing Exhibits Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: 12/18/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                          LETTER by USA as to Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated December 18, 2019 re: Response Deadline Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank  Bond Hearing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Bond Hearing as to Lev Parnas held on 12/17/2019. Defendant Lev Parnas present with attorney Joseph Bondy and Stephanie Schuman; AUSA Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas Roos and Douglas Zolkind present; Court Reporter present. Bail Review Hearing Held: Bail conditions to continue as previously set. Bail Continued. (See transcript for complete details.) (jbo)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Reply to Response to motionCourt Filing
                                                              LETTER REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 16, 2019 re [41] FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 4, 2019 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release .. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                NOTICE AS TO LEV PARNAS: THE DECEMBER 17, 2019 BAIL REVIEW HEARING WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 12B OF THE DANIEL PATRICK MOYNIHAN UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 500 PEARL STREET, NEW YORK NEW YORK, 10007. (bh)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER as to Lev Parnas. A bail review hearing for Defendant Lev Parnas will be held on December 17, 2019, at 12:15 p.m. in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. In anticipation of that hearing, counsel for Defendant Lev Parnas is directed to file a response to the Government's letter dated December 11, 2019, on or before December 16, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 12/12/19)(jbo)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/12/2019, Entered: 12/12/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gerald B. Lefcourt dated 12/12/19 re: surveillance . Document filed by Andrey Kukushkin. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - 2019-11-26 to government re surveillance, # (2) Exhibit B - 2019-12-01 Kukushkin Response Letter, # (3) Exhibit C - 2005-12-23 letter and transcript)(Lefcourt, Gerald)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank  set/reset deadlines/hearings
                                                                      Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Lev Parnas: Responses due by 12/16/2019. Bond Hearing set for 12/17/2019 at 12:15 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (jbo)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                        LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated December 11, 2019 re: Opposition to Parnas Bail Modification Request Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Lev Parnas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 12/2/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: 12/10/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas re: Conference held on 12/2/19 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Moore, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                              FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated December 4, 2019 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release . Document filed by Lev Parnas. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Pretrial Conference as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin held on 12/2/2019. Defendant Lev Parnas present with attorney Edward MacMahon and Joseph Bondy; defendant Igor Fruman not present, attorney Todd Blanche present; defendant David Correia not present, attorney William Harrington present; defendant Andrey Kukushkin not present, attorney Gerald Lefcourt and Faith Friedman present. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas Landsman Roos and Douglas Zolkind present. Court Reporter present. Pretrial conference held: Next conference scheduled for 2/3/2020. Time is excluded to 2/3/2020. Bail continued as to each defendant. (See transcript for complete details.) (jbo) Modified on 12/3/2019 (jw).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Pretrial Conference
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Pretrial Conference as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin held on 12/2/2019. Defendant Lev Parnas present with attorney Edward MacMahon and Joseph Bondy; defendant Igor Fruman not present, attorney Todd Blanche present; defendant David Correia not present, attorney William Harrington present; defendant Andrey Kukushkin not present, attorney Gerald Lefcourt and Faith Friedman present. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas Landsman Roos and Douglas Zolkind present. Court Reporter present. Pretrial conference held: Next conference scheduled for 2/3/2020. Time is excluded to 2/3/2020. Bail continued as to each defendant. (See transcript for complete details.) (jbo) Modified on 12/3/2019 (jw).
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                                    NOTICE: THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 2, 2019 AT 2:00 PM BEFORE JUDGE OETKEN WILL BE HELD IN COURTROOM 110 OF THE THURGOOD MARSHALL UNITED STATES COURTHOUSE, 40 FOLEY SQUARE, NEW YORK, NEW YORK 10007. (bh)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: 11/22/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Fruman addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Todd Blanche dated 11/22/2019 re: Defense counsel writes to request Defendant be excused from attending conference. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/22/2019) (ap)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address as to Lev Parnas. New Address: The Law Offices of Joseph A. Bondy, 1776 Broadway, Suite 2000, New York, New York, USA 10019, (212) 219-3572. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Igor Fruman. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 11/1/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Igor Fruman re: Hearing held on 11/1/19 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Jennifer Thun, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/9/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER as to Lev Parnas: It is hereby ORDERED that, in light of the writ of attachment, the Clerk of Court shall not release the funds posted by or on behalf of Defendant Parnas in this matter absent further order of this Court.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/13/2019) (lnl)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/13/2019) (lnl)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Faith Alison Friedman appearing for Andrey Kukushkin. Appearance Type: Retained. (Friedman, Faith)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gerald B. Lefcourt appearing for Andrey Kukushkin. Appearance Type: Retained. (Lefcourt, Gerald)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Rebekah Donaleski dated November 12, 2019 re: Proposed Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Donaleski, Rebekah)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER as to Lev Parnas: It is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's bail is modified to include: Surrender firearms and fireann permit to the local authorities, or otherwise directed by Pretrial Services, and provide proof of such. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/7/2019) (lnl) Modified on 11/7/2019 (lnl).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Fruman addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken, from Todd Blanche dated 11/5/2019 re: Defense counsel writes to request two modifications to defendant's bail conditions. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 11/5/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Bond Hearing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken:Bail Modification Hearing as to Igor Fruman held on 11/1/2019. Defendant Igor Fruman not present. Attorney Todd Blanche present; AUSA Rebekah Donaleski, Nicolas Landsman Roos and Douglas Zolkin present; Court Reporter present.Bail Modification Hearing held: The bail conditions previously set are continued without modification. (See transcript for complete details.) (jw)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/31/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER as to Igor Fruman addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Todd Blanche, dated 10/30/2019, re: Defense counsel writes to request a bail modification hearing beforeYour Honor, tentatively scheduled for Friday, November 1, 2019 at 11:15 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: A bail modification hearing is scheduled for November 1, 2019, at 11:15 a.m., in Courtroom 706, 40 Foley Square. Defendant Fruman's presence at the hearing is hereby waived. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/30/2019) (lnl)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 10/17/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/30/2019, Entered: 10/30/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin re: Arraignment held on 10/17/19 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/20/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Igor Fruman: Bail Modification Hearing set for 11/1/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (lnl)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 10/23/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman re: Conference held on 10/23/19 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2020. (McGuirk, Kelly)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 bond
                                                                                                                          Appearance Bond Entered as to (19-Cr-725-02) Igor Fruman in amount of $1,000,000.00. Agreed conditions of release; $1,000,000 Personal Recognizance Bond; To be cosigned by three financially responsible persons; Secured by $100,000 cash or property; $900,000 in property in Sunny Isles Beach, Florida; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Regular pretrial supervision; Home detention; GPS; Defendant to be released on own signature; $100,000 cash to be transferred from EDVA and property is to be posted by November 1, 2019; The bond is to be cosigned by Artur Fruman, Steven Fruman, and a third financially responsible person by November 1, 2019; Defendant is to have no contact with co-defendants outside presence of counsel; Defendant is to be supervised in the Southern District of Florida. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 10/23/2019 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw); (Main Document 24 replaced on 11/13/2019) (bw).
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Initial Appearance as to (19-Cr-725-02) Igor Fruman held on 10/23/2019. Date of Arrest: 10/9/2019. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski & Nicolas Roos. Defense Counsel: Todd Blanche (Retained). BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $1,000,000 PRB; 3 FRP; Secured by $100,000 cash/property: $900,000 in property in Sunny Isles Beach, Florida; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/Southern District of Florida; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Regular pretrial supervision; Home detention; GPS; Defendant to be released on own signature; $100,000 in cash to be transferred from EDVA and property is to be posted by November 1, 2019. The bond is to be cosigned by Artur Fruman, Steven Fruman, and a third financially responsible person by November 1, 2019. Defendant is to have no contact with co-defendants outside presence of counsel. Defendant is to be supervised in the Southern District of Florida. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 12/2/2019 at 2 pm. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 12/2/2019. (bw)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 bond
                                                                                                                              Appearance Bond Entered as to (19-Cr-725-01) Lev Parnas in amount of $1,000,000.00. Agreed conditions of release; $1,000,000 Personal Recognizance Bond; To be cosigned by two financially responsible persons; Secured by $200,000 cash or property; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL; Travel to EDVA and DDC only for legal visits approved by PTS; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Regular pretrial supervision; Home detention; GPS; Defendant to be released on own signature; $200,000 cash to be transferred from EDVA by November 1, 2019; The bond is to be cosigned by Aaron Parnas and Svetlana Parnas by November 1, 2019; Defendant is to provide a signed financial affidavit by 10/25/2019; Defendant is to have no contact with co-defendants outside the presence of counsel; Defendant is to be supervised in the Southern District of Florida. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 10/23/2019 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw) (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/31/2019) (dif). (Main Document 22 replaced on 10/31/2019) (dif). (Main Document 22 replaced on 11/6/2019) (bw).
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Initial Appearance as to (19-Cr-725-01) Lev Parnas held on 10/23/2019. Date of Arrest: 10/9/2019. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski & Nicolas Roos. Defense Counsel: Edward MacMahon & Joseph Bondy (Retained). BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $1,000,000 PRB; 2 FRP; Secured by $200,000 cash/property; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL. Travel to EDVA and DDC only for legal visits approved by PTS; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Regular pretrial supervision; Home detention; GPS; Defendant to be released on own signature. $200,000 in cash to be transferred from EDVA by November 1, 2019. The bond is to be cosigned by Aaron Parnas and Svetlana Parnas by November 1, 2019. Defendant is to provide a signed financial affidavit by 10/25/2019. Defendant is to have no contact with co-defendants outside presence of counsel. Defendant is to be supervised in the Southern District of Florida. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. Conference before District Judge on 12/2/2019 at 2 pm. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 12/2/2019. (bw)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to David Correia addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Attorney William J. Harrington dated October 23, 2019 re: I write to request that the Court adjourn Mr. Correia's deadline to obtain a second co-signor from October 24, 2019 to November 6, 2019. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/23/2019)(bw)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019, Terminated: 10/23/2019 Letter MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from William J. Harrington dated October 23, 2019 re: request for adjournment of deadline to obtain a second co-signor . Document filed by David Correia. (Harrington, William)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                      Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Lev Parnas from the United States District Court - Eastern District of Virginia. (jm)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER as to Igor Fruman (2). Time excluded from 10/23/2019 until 12/2/2019. Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (bw)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Arraignment as to Igor Fruman (2) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 10/23/2019. Plea entered by Igor Fruman (2) Count 1,2,3,4 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                            ORAL ORDER as to Lev Parnas (1). Time excluded from 10/23/2019 until 12/2/2019. Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (bw)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Arraignment as to Lev Parnas (1) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 10/23/2019. Plea entered by Lev Parnas (1) Count 1,2,3,4 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Todd Blanche appearing for Igor Fruman. Appearance Type: Retained. (Blanche, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph Aaron Bondy appearing for Lev Parnas. Appearance Type: Retained. (Bondy, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: 10/22/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward Brian MacMahon, Jr appearing for Lev Parnas. Appearance Type: Retained. (MacMahon, Edward)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Douglas Samuel Zolkind appearing for USA. (Zolkind, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 bond
                                                                                                                                                        Appearance Bond Entered as to (19-Cr-725-04) Andrey Kukushkin in amount of $1,000,000.00. Agreed conditions of release; $1,000,000.00 PRB, co-signed by 3 FRP; Secured by $100,000.00 and $900,000 Property in Livermore, California; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/Northern, Central, and Southern Districts of California; Surrender of travel documents (and no new applications); Regular pretrial supervision; Home detention with electronic monitoring; Defendant to be released on own signature, plus the following conditions: Cosigners by 10/24/2019, property posted by 10/31/2019; No contact with co-defendants without counsel; Pretrial supervision in the Northern District of California. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 10/17/2019 attached. Defendant Released.] (bw)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: 10/18/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Initial Appearance as to (19-Cr-725-04) Andrey Kukushkin held on 10/17/2019. AUSA Doneleski & Landsman-Roos. Defense Counsel: Gerald Lefcourt (Retained). Proceeding: Arraignment. Defendant arraigned; pleads Not Guilty. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $1,000,000 PRB; 3 FRP; Secured by $100,000 cash/property: $900,000 Property in Livermore, California. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/Northern, Central and Southern Districts of California; Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Regular pretrial supervision; Home detention; Electronic monitoring. Defendant to be released on own signature, plus the following conditions: Cosigners by 10/24/2019, property posted by 10/31/2019. No contact with co-defendants without counsel. Pretrial Supervision in the Northern District of California. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Conference before District Judge on 12/2/2019 at 2 p.m. Speedy Trial Time excluded under 18 U.S.C. Section 3161(h)(7) until 12/2/2019. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken:Status Conference as to David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin held on 10/17/2019. Defendant David Correia present with attorney William Harrington and Jeffrey Marcus; Defendant Andrey Kukushkin present with attorney Gerald Lefcourt and Faith Friedman; AUSA Rebekah Donaleski and Nicolas Landsman Roos; Court Reporter present. Next pretrial conference scheduled for 12/2/19 at 2:00 pm. Time is excluded to 12/2/19 as to all defendants. Bail continued. (See transcript for complete details.) (Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken) (lnl)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                              ORAL ORDER as to (19-Cr-725-04) Andrey Kukushkin. Time excluded from 10/17/2019 until 12/2/2019. Status Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank  arraignment
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Paul Oetken: Arraignment as to Andrey Kukushkin (4) Count 4 held on 10/17/2019. Plea entered by Andrey Kukushkin (4) Count 4 -- Not Guilty. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 bond
                                                                                                                                                                  Appearance Bond Entered as to (19-Cr-725-03) David Correia in amount of $250,000.00. $250,000.00 PRB, co-signed by 3 financially responsible persons; Travel limited to SDNY/EDNY & SDFL (and D. Mass. with approval of PTS); Surrender of travel documents (and no new applications); Pretrial supervision as directed by PTS; Drug testing/treatment as directed by PTS; Defendant to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by: 2 FRPs by 10/23/2019, and 3rd FRP by 11/6/2019; No contact with co-defendants outside presence of counsel. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions dated 10/16/2019 attached. Defendant Released.] *** BAIL CONDITIONS MODIFIED BY USDJ OETKEN ON 10/23/2019: Adjourned Mr. Correia's deadline to obtain a second co-signor from October 23, 2019 to November 6, 2019. (bw); Modified on 10/23/2019 (bw). (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/23/2019) (bw).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Initial Appearance as to (19-Cr-725-03) David Correia held on 10/16/2019. Date of Arrest: 10/16/2019, Vol. Surr. AUSA Rebekah Donaleski. Defense Counsel Jeffrey Marcus (Retained). Proceeding: Rule 9. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $250,000 PRB; 3 FRP; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL (and D. Mass. with approval of PTS); Surrender travel documents (& no new applications); Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; Drug testing/treatment as directed by PTS; Defendant to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by: 2 FRPs by 10/23/2019 and 3rd FRP by 11/6/2019. No contact with co-defendants outside presence of counsel. ADDITIONAL PROCEEDINGS: Conference before District Judge on 10/17/2019 at 3:30 p.m. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/17/2019 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: William Joseph Harrington appearing for (19-Cr-725-03) David Correia. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin: The arraignment and initial conference as to Defendants Parnas and Fruman is hereby adjourned to Wednesday, October 23, 2019, at 11:30 a.m., and will be held in Courtroom 506 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. The arraignment and initial conference as to Defendants Correia and Kukushkin will take place as previously scheduled on Thursday, October 17, 2019, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/16/2019) (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                          ORAL ORDER as to (19-Cr-725-03) David Correia. Status Conference set for 10/17/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (By Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/16/2019) (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  arrest
                                                                                                                                                                            Arrest of David Correia (3). (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                              Set/Reset Hearings as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman: Arraignment set for 10/23/2019 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings as to David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin: Arraignment set for 10/17/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 318, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (ap)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin ( Arraignment set for 10/17/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken.)It is hereby ORDERED that all parties shall appear for an arraignment and initial conference on Thursday, October 17, 2019, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 318 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/15/2019)(jw)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Order to Unseal IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Order to Unseal Indictment as to Sealed Defendant 1, Sealed Defendant 2, Sealed Defendant 3, Sealed Defendant 4. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/10/19)(jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Arrest - Other District
                                                                                                                                                                                      Arrest of Lev Parnas in the United States District Court - Eastern District of Virginia. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                                                                                                                        Attorney update in case as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. Attorney Rebekah Allen Donaleski,Nicolas Tyler Landsman Roos for USA added. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                                                          Case as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin ASSIGNED to Judge J. Paul Oetken. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Case Designated ECF.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Designated ECF as to Lev Parnas, Igor Fruman, David Correia, Andrey Kukushkin. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/10/2019 Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                                                                                              SEALED INDICTMENT as to Sealed Defendant 1 (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Sealed Defendant 2 (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Sealed Defendant 3 (3) count(s) 4, Sealed Defendant 4 (4) count(s) 4. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?