Raebel et al v. Tesla Motors, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-00742-MMD-WGC
District Judge Miranda M. Du, presiding

Tags
Last Updated April 3, 2020 at 7:40 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Paul Ritchie Wagner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Drendel & Jeanney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel T. Hayward +1 775 335 9999 +1 775 335 9993 danhayward@bdjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by yleelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Youngwoon Jung +1 714 523 2700 +1 714 523 7100 jakejung@yleelaw.com
No Logo Shelley Beth Raebel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bradley Drendel & Jeanney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel T. Hayward +1 775 335 9999 +1 775 335 9993 danhayward@bdjlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by yleelaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Youngwoon Jung +1 714 523 2700 +1 714 523 7100 jakejung@yleelaw.com
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Order
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Order
        LREF
        Blank 5 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Notice for Desig of Local Counsel & VP
        NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jake Y. Jung to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/30/2020. (no image attached) (WJ)
          LREF
          Blank 4 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Standing OrderCourt Filing
          STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Miranda M. Du. Chief Judge Du's Civil Standing Order is posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website and may be accessed directly via this hyperlink: www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Summons issued
            SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tesla, Inc.. (DRM)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank  Assign Judges in Civil Case
              Case randomly assigned to Chief Judge Miranda M. Du and Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (WJ)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Certificate of Interested Parties
                CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Shelley Beth Raebel, Paul Ritchie Wagner. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (jung, Young Woon)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: 12/13/2019 Complaint
                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5811276) by Shelley Beth Raebel, Paul Ritchie Wagner. Proof of service due by 3/12/2020. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet, # (3) Summons)(jung, Young Woon) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 163 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?