The Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. Treasury, Dept of
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-08181-JCS
District Judge Joseph C. Spero, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 3, 2021 at 4:54 PM EDT (7.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Aaron Glantz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Center for Investigative Reporting

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diana Victoria Baranetsky +1 510 809 3160 +1 510 849 6141 vbaranetsky@revealnews.org
No Logo The Center for Investigative Reporting, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by The Center for Investigative Reporting

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diana Victoria Baranetsky +1 510 809 3160 +1 510 849 6141 vbaranetsky@revealnews.org
v.
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Officially listed as "Treasury, Dept of"
Office San Francisco
Filed 12/16/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
Cause Section 05 U.S.C. § 552 Freedom of Information Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Alameda
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/3/2021, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/2/2021, Entered: None Received Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/26/2021, Entered: None Received Document
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/10/2021, Entered: None Received Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/4/2021, Entered: None Received Document
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Reply to Opposition/Response
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/1/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/8/2020, Entered: None Opposition/Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/17/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/11/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/24/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/10/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/13/2020, Entered: None Joint Case Management Statement
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: None Answer
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Stipulation without Proposed Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Certificate/Proof of Service
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/26/2019, Entered: None Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                  CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Case Assigned by IntakeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/31/2019. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Certificate of Interested Entities
                                                                                      Certificate of Interested Entities by Aaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Proposed Summons
                                                                                        Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Complaint
                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Treasury, Dept of ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13985079.). Filed byAaron Glantz, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2019)
                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 82 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?