Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc. et al v. Raffensperger et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-05391-SCJ
District Judge Steve C Jones, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 17, 2019 at 1:27 AM EST (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 812 1960 jachandler@gmail.com
Space Kurt G. Kastorf +1 770 635 0030 kurt.kastorf@gmail.com
Space Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis +1 404 771 2275 beth.tanis@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy H. Ershow +1 212 891 1651 jershow@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KAISER DILLON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman G. Anderson +1 202 640 2850 nanderson@kaiserdillon.com
Space Scott Bernstein +1 202 640 2850 sbernstein@kaiserdillon.com
Space Sarah R. Fink +1 202 640 2850 sfink@kaiserdillon.com
Space Matthew G. Kaiser +1 202 640 2849 +1 202 280 1034 mkaiser@kaiserdillon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAWRENCE & BUNDY LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie J. Bryan +1 404 400 3350 +1 404 609 2504 leslie.bryan@lawrencebundy.com
Space Thomas R. Bundy, III +1 240 786 4998 +1 240 786 4501 thomas.bundy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Maia J. Cogen +1 404 400 3346 maia.cogen@lawrencebundy.com
Space Allegra J. Lawrence +1 404 400 3340 +1 404 853 8806 allegra.lawrence-hardy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Suzanne Smith Williams +1 404 572 2818 suzanne.williams@lawrencebundy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina C. Gupta +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 ngupta@milchev.com
Space Andrew Dewald Herman +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 aherman@milchev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler, Reiff, Young & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dara Lindenbaum +1 202 479 1111 lindenbaum@sandlerreiff.com
No Logo Care in Action, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 812 1960 jachandler@gmail.com
Space Kurt G. Kastorf +1 770 635 0030 kurt.kastorf@gmail.com
Space Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis +1 404 771 2275 beth.tanis@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy H. Ershow +1 212 891 1651 jershow@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KAISER DILLON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman G. Anderson +1 202 640 2850 nanderson@kaiserdillon.com
Space Scott Bernstein +1 202 640 2850 sbernstein@kaiserdillon.com
Space Sarah R. Fink +1 202 640 2850 sfink@kaiserdillon.com
Space Matthew G. Kaiser +1 202 640 2849 +1 202 280 1034 mkaiser@kaiserdillon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAWRENCE & BUNDY LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie J. Bryan +1 404 400 3350 +1 404 609 2504 leslie.bryan@lawrencebundy.com
Space Thomas R. Bundy, III +1 240 786 4998 +1 240 786 4501 thomas.bundy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Maia J. Cogen +1 404 400 3346 maia.cogen@lawrencebundy.com
Space Allegra J. Lawrence +1 404 400 3340 +1 404 853 8806 allegra.lawrence-hardy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Suzanne Smith Williams +1 404 572 2818 suzanne.williams@lawrencebundy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina C. Gupta +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 ngupta@milchev.com
Space Andrew Dewald Herman +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 aherman@milchev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler, Reiff, Young & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dara Lindenbaum +1 202 479 1111 lindenbaum@sandlerreiff.com
No Logo Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman G. Anderson +1 202 640 2850 nanderson@kaiserdillon.com
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 812 1960 jachandler@gmail.com
Space Sarah R. Fink +1 202 640 2850 sfink@kaiserdillon.com
Space Nina C. Gupta +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 ngupta@milchev.com
Space Kurt G. Kastorf +1 770 635 0030 kurt.kastorf@gmail.com
Space Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis +1 404 771 2275 beth.tanis@gmail.com
Space Suzanne Smith Williams +1 404 572 2818 suzanne.williams@lawrencebundy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy H. Ershow +1 212 891 1651 jershow@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KAISER DILLON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Bernstein +1 202 640 2850 sbernstein@kaiserdillon.com
Space Matthew G. Kaiser +1 202 640 2849 +1 202 280 1034 mkaiser@kaiserdillon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAWRENCE & BUNDY LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie J. Bryan +1 404 400 3350 +1 404 609 2504 leslie.bryan@lawrencebundy.com
Space Thomas R. Bundy, III +1 240 786 4998 +1 240 786 4501 thomas.bundy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Maia J. Cogen +1 404 400 3346 maia.cogen@lawrencebundy.com
Space Allegra J. Lawrence +1 404 400 3340 +1 404 853 8806 allegra.lawrence-hardy@lawrencebundy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Dewald Herman +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 aherman@milchev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler, Reiff, Young & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dara Lindenbaum +1 202 479 1111 lindenbaum@sandlerreiff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by tandylegal.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lovita T. Tandy +1 770 274 6179 lovita@tandylegal.com
No Logo Fair Fight Action, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 812 1960 jachandler@gmail.com
Space Kurt G. Kastorf +1 770 635 0030 kurt.kastorf@gmail.com
Space Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis +1 404 771 2275 beth.tanis@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy H. Ershow +1 212 891 1651 jershow@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KAISER DILLON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman G. Anderson +1 202 640 2850 nanderson@kaiserdillon.com
Space Scott Bernstein +1 202 640 2850 sbernstein@kaiserdillon.com
Space Sarah R. Fink +1 202 640 2850 sfink@kaiserdillon.com
Space Matthew G. Kaiser +1 202 640 2849 +1 202 280 1034 mkaiser@kaiserdillon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAWRENCE & BUNDY LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie J. Bryan +1 404 400 3350 +1 404 609 2504 leslie.bryan@lawrencebundy.com
Space Thomas R. Bundy, III +1 240 786 4998 +1 240 786 4501 thomas.bundy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Maia J. Cogen +1 404 400 3346 maia.cogen@lawrencebundy.com
Space Allegra J. Lawrence +1 404 400 3340 +1 404 853 8806 allegra.lawrence-hardy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Suzanne Smith Williams +1 404 572 2818 suzanne.williams@lawrencebundy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina C. Gupta +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 ngupta@milchev.com
Space Andrew Dewald Herman +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 aherman@milchev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler, Reiff, Young & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dara Lindenbaum +1 202 479 1111 lindenbaum@sandlerreiff.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 2110

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Von A. DuBose +1 404 881 4161 dubose@dubosemiller.com
No Logo The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 812 1960 jachandler@gmail.com
Space Kurt G. Kastorf +1 770 635 0030 kurt.kastorf@gmail.com
Space Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis +1 404 771 2275 beth.tanis@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy H. Ershow +1 212 891 1651 jershow@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KAISER DILLON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman G. Anderson +1 202 640 2850 nanderson@kaiserdillon.com
Space Scott Bernstein +1 202 640 2850 sbernstein@kaiserdillon.com
Space Sarah R. Fink +1 202 640 2850 sfink@kaiserdillon.com
Space Matthew G. Kaiser +1 202 640 2849 +1 202 280 1034 mkaiser@kaiserdillon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAWRENCE & BUNDY LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie J. Bryan +1 404 400 3350 +1 404 609 2504 leslie.bryan@lawrencebundy.com
Space Thomas R. Bundy, III +1 240 786 4998 +1 240 786 4501 thomas.bundy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Maia J. Cogen +1 404 400 3346 maia.cogen@lawrencebundy.com
Space Allegra J. Lawrence +1 404 400 3340 +1 404 853 8806 allegra.lawrence-hardy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Suzanne Smith Williams +1 404 572 2818 suzanne.williams@lawrencebundy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina C. Gupta +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 ngupta@milchev.com
Space Andrew Dewald Herman +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 aherman@milchev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler, Reiff, Young & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dara Lindenbaum +1 202 479 1111 lindenbaum@sandlerreiff.com
No Logo Virginia-Highland Church, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John A. Chandler +1 404 812 1960 jachandler@gmail.com
Space Kurt G. Kastorf +1 770 635 0030 kurt.kastorf@gmail.com
Space Elizabeth Vranicar Tanis +1 404 771 2275 beth.tanis@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy H. Ershow +1 212 891 1651 jershow@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by KAISER DILLON, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norman G. Anderson +1 202 640 2850 nanderson@kaiserdillon.com
Space Scott Bernstein +1 202 640 2850 sbernstein@kaiserdillon.com
Space Sarah R. Fink +1 202 640 2850 sfink@kaiserdillon.com
Space Matthew G. Kaiser +1 202 640 2849 +1 202 280 1034 mkaiser@kaiserdillon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by LAWRENCE & BUNDY LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leslie J. Bryan +1 404 400 3350 +1 404 609 2504 leslie.bryan@lawrencebundy.com
Space Thomas R. Bundy, III +1 240 786 4998 +1 240 786 4501 thomas.bundy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Maia J. Cogen +1 404 400 3346 maia.cogen@lawrencebundy.com
Space Allegra J. Lawrence +1 404 400 3340 +1 404 853 8806 allegra.lawrence-hardy@lawrencebundy.com
Space Suzanne Smith Williams +1 404 572 2818 suzanne.williams@lawrencebundy.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nina C. Gupta +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 ngupta@milchev.com
Space Andrew Dewald Herman +1 202 626 5800 +1 202 626 5801 aherman@milchev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sandler, Reiff, Young & Lamb, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dara Lindenbaum +1 202 479 1111 lindenbaum@sandlerreiff.com
v.
No Logo Brad Raffensperger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Francis Jacoutot +1 770 434 6868 +1 770 434 7376 bjacoutot@taylorenglish.com
Space Brian Edward Lake +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 blake@robbinsfirm.com
Space Carey Allen Miller +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 cmiller@robbinsfirm.com
Space Andrew M. Swindle +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 aswindle@robbinsfirm.com
Space Bryan P. Tyson +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 btyson@taylorenglish.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Barrett Belinfante +1 678 701 9381 jbelinfante@robbinsfirm.com
Space Vincent Robert Russo, Jr. +1 404 856 3260 +1 404 856 3250 vrusso@robbinsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor English Duma, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Diane Festin LaRoss +1 404 572 6672 +1 404 572 6999 dlaross@taylorenglish.com
No Logo David J. Worley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Barrett Belinfante +1 678 701 9381 jbelinfante@robbinsfirm.com
Space Brian Edward Lake +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 blake@robbinsfirm.com
Space Carey Allen Miller +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 cmiller@robbinsfirm.com
Space Vincent Robert Russo, Jr. +1 404 856 3260 +1 404 856 3250 vrusso@robbinsfirm.com
Space Andrew M. Swindle +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 aswindle@robbinsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor English Duma, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan P. Tyson +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 btyson@taylorenglish.com
No Logo Rebecca N. Sullivan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Barrett Belinfante +1 678 701 9381 jbelinfante@robbinsfirm.com
Space Brian Edward Lake +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 blake@robbinsfirm.com
Space Carey Allen Miller +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 cmiller@robbinsfirm.com
Space Vincent Robert Russo, Jr. +1 404 856 3260 +1 404 856 3250 vrusso@robbinsfirm.com
Space Andrew M. Swindle +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 aswindle@robbinsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor English Duma, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan P. Tyson +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 btyson@taylorenglish.com
No Logo Seth Harp, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Barrett Belinfante +1 678 701 9381 jbelinfante@robbinsfirm.com
Space Brian Edward Lake +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 blake@robbinsfirm.com
Space Carey Allen Miller +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 cmiller@robbinsfirm.com
Space Vincent Robert Russo, Jr. +1 404 856 3260 +1 404 856 3250 vrusso@robbinsfirm.com
Space Andrew M. Swindle +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 aswindle@robbinsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor English Duma, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan P. Tyson +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 btyson@taylorenglish.com
No Logo State Election Board, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Ross Alloy Belinfante Littlefield, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Barrett Belinfante +1 678 701 9381 jbelinfante@robbinsfirm.com
Space Brian Edward Lake +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 blake@robbinsfirm.com
Space Carey Allen Miller +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 cmiller@robbinsfirm.com
Space Vincent Robert Russo, Jr. +1 404 856 3260 +1 404 856 3250 vrusso@robbinsfirm.com
Space Andrew M. Swindle +1 678 701 9381 +1 404 856 3250 aswindle@robbinsfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taylor English Duma, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan P. Tyson +1 678 347 2200 +1 678 347 2210 btyson@taylorenglish.com
Office Atlanta
Filed 11/27/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County De Kalb
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags 4months,PROTO,SUBMDJ
  Entries (204) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Expert Report
Expert Report of Daniel A. Smith, Ph.D. by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Expert Report
    Expert Report of Kevin J. Kennedy by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Expert Report
      Expert Report of Stephen C. Graves by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Evidentiary HearingCourt Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Hearing held on 12/16/2019. The Court heard arguments on Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. [159]). The Court declined to order that Defendants and (the voter list maintenance vendor) stop the list maintenance process that will conclude tonight. The Court indicated that a hearing on Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction will go forward on Thursday, December 19, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. A detailed order will follow. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(pdw)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
          ORDER - the Court DECLINES to grant an emergency temporary restraining order [159] on the ground that Plaintiffs have not sufficiently established the requisite factor of irreparable injury, as it appears that any voter registration cancellations can be undone at a later date. A hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction [159] will be held on THURSDAY, DECEMBER 19, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. The following expedited briefing schedule shall govern. Defendants shall file a response brief by 5 P.M., DECEMBER 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/16/2019. (pdw)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Certificate of service
            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' First Request for Admission and Related Interrogatory by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Lake, Brian)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
              VACATED PER DOCKET ORDER OF 12/16/19 ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction [159] on THURSDAY, DECEMBER 19, 2019 at 2:00 P.M. The following expedited briefing schedule shall govern. Defendants shall file a response brief by 5 P.M., DECEMBER 17, 2019. In the interim and pursuant to the Court's inherent authority to control the litigation and the conduct of litigants, the Court further ORDERS that Defendants shall maintain the status quo (i.e., no voter purge) in order to allow the Court sufficient time to hold the above-stated hearing and issue a proper ruling. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/16/2019. (pdw) Modified on 12/16/2019 (pdw).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                APPLICATION for Admission of Paul M. Smith Pro Hac Vice. Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019 Notice of filing
                  NOTICE Of Filing Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. re [159] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction IMMEDIATE HEARING REQUESTED Exhibit B (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Part 1, # (2) Exhibit Part 2, # (3) Exhibit Part 3, # (4) Exhibit Part 4, # (5) Exhibit Part 5)(Bryan, Leslie)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/16/2019, Terminated: 12/16/2019 Motion for TRO
                    Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. Added MOTION for Preliminary Injunction on 12/16/2019 (pdw).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Notice of hearing on motion
                      NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: [159] MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2019 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Order
                        DOCKET ORDER re [162] Order Setting Hearing on Motion: the Court's previous [162] Order is hereby VACATED. An amended order will issue shortly. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/16/2019. (pdw)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Return of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                          RETURN of [156] APPLICATION for Admission of Paul M. Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9161870). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
                            LREF
                            Blank  Return of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                            RETURN of [157] APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Diaz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9161906). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: 12/11/2019 Certificate of service
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019, Terminated: 12/13/2019 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                APPLICATION for Admission of Jonathan Diaz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9161906). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: 12/9/2019, Terminated: 12/13/2019 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Paul M. Smith Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-9161870). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: 12/6/2019 Notice - other
                                    NOTICE by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record (Anderson, Kimberly)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: Plaintiffs' request to depose Governor (and former Secretary of State) Brian Kemp is GRANTED as to proposed topics 4, 5, and 8 and DENIED as to proposed topics 1, 2, 3, 6, and 7. Plaintiffs' request to depose Secretary of State Brad Raffensperger is DENIED, with leave to renew (as to topic 3) at a later date. The Court also sua sponte AMENDS its prior scheduling order (Doc. No. [79]) to allow for fact discovery to be extended until January 10, 2020 for the limited purposes of re-deposing Harvey in a 30(b)(6) capacity and deposing Governor Kemp. The Court also sua sponte STAYS the scheduling order's remaining deadlines (with the exception of the December 16, 2019 close of expert discovery) until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/5/2019. (rjs)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/4/2019, Entered: 12/4/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                        ORDER: The Court finds that the notes and minutes of the November 11, 2018 executive session call are protected by attorney-client privilege, and that there was no waiver. As such, Plaintiffs' request for production (Doc. No. [152]) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/4/2019. (rjs)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Notice of filingCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE Of Filing November 26, 2019 Letter to Judge Jones by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Bryan, Leslie)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 12/3/2019, Entered: 12/3/2019 Notice of filing
                                            NOTICE Of Filing by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley Response to Plaintiffs' November 26 Letter (Belinfante, Joshua)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/2/2019, Entered: 12/2/2019 Certificate of service
                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: 11/26/2019 Certificate of service
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Expert Report
                                                  Expert Report of Lorraine C. Minnite by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: 11/25/2019 Certificate of service
                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Deposition Notices for Ryan Germany, Kevin Rayburn, Michael Barnes, and Chris Harvey by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: 11/21/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER: The Court ORDERS Defendants to produce the Kansas Cross-Check list that Plaintiffs indicated that they would accept as responsive. Said production shall occur on or before November 27, 2019. The Court AMENDS its prior scheduling order (Doc. No. [79]) to provide that Defendants shall have the full thirty-days that they need to prepare responsive expert reports, even if the thirty-days extends beyond the anticipated December 16, 2019, close of expert discovery date. In conclusion, the parties' discovery disputes are resolved (in part) in accordance with the rulings herein. The Court defers ruling on the issue of whether Plaintiffs may depose Governor Brian Kemp and Secretary of State Brad Raffensperger. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/21/2019. (rjs)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: 11/20/2019 discovery hearingCourt Filing
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Discovery Hearing held on 11/20/2019 regarding a discovery dispute. Oral argument heard. Plaintiff's exhibits 1-7 and Defendants' exhibit 1 admitted. Matter taken under advisement by the Court, with order to follow. Exhibits retained to be forwarded to the Clerks Office. (Court Reporter David Ritchie)(rjs)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank  Order
                                                          DOCKET ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file (or produce to the Court's chambers) the deposition transcripts (that were requested by the Court at today's hearing) by 5 p.m., Friday, November 22, 2019. In the event that any party is unable to meet this deadline, counsel shall immediately notify the Court. Ordered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/20/2019 and entered as directed by Chambers. (rjs)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Certificate of service
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Plaintiffs Production Log)(Bryan, Leslie)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Response (Non-Motion)Court Filing
                                                              RESPONSE Letter re [139] Letter to Judge Jones filed by Brad Raffensperger. (Belinfante, Joshua) Modified on 11/20/2019 (rjs).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Order on Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the CourtroomCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER granting [140] Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom on 11/20/2019 at 10:30 AM: cellular phones, laptop computers, and tablets (as well as any power cords) to the courtroom by Lauren Groh-Wargo, Andrew Herman, Kali Bracey,Jeremy Ershow, and Norman Anderson. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/19/2019. (pdw)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Swindle, Andrew) Modified on 11/19/2019 (rjs).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019, Terminated: 11/19/2019 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom
                                                                    Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Notice of filingCourt Filing
                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing Letter to Judge Jones by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (Bryan, Leslie) Modified on 11/19/2019 (rjs).
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: 11/18/2019 Expert Report
                                                                        Expert Report of Dr. Khalilah L. Brown-Dean, et al. by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                          DOCKET ORDER: Having been informed that Plaintiffs would like to raise additional issues involving production of documents at the November 20, 2019 discovery hearing, the Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs file a one-page overview of the issues by 5 p.m., today, November 18, 2019. Defendants shall file a one- page response by 5 p.m., Tuesday, November 19, 2019. Filings shall be via CM/ECF using the "Notice of Filing" category. Ruled on by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/18/2019 and entered as directed by Chambers. (rjs)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RULE 5.4 by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Swindle, Andrew)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Swindle on behalf of Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Swindle, Andrew)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Notice of filing
                                                                                Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (Bryan, Leslie) Modified on 11/18/2019 (rjs).
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Notice of filing
                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Amended Expert Disclosures by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (Bryan, Leslie) Modified on 11/18/2019 (rjs).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: 11/15/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. Plaintiffs' First Request for Admissions (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. Care in Action Supplemental Responses and Objections to Harps Interrogatories (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                        AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing reset for 11/20/2019 at 10:30 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Correspondence, # (2) Correspondence)(pdw)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                          NOTICE by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley of Subpoena for Let America Vote (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Subpoena for Let America Vote)(Lake, Brian)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER granting [109] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Norman G. Anderson. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/13/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER granting [108] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Nina C. Gupta. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 11/13/2019. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rjs)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Conference set for 11/21/2019 at 02:30 PM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (Attachments: # (1) Correspondence)(pdw) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/13/2019: # (2) Additional Correspondence) (pdw).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                  Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Norman G. Anderson re [129] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                    Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Nina C. Gupta re [128] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service Deposition Notices for Ryan Germany and Michael Barnes by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                        NOTICE by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. Plaintiffs Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 11/6/2019, Entered: 11/6/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/4/2019, Entered: 11/4/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 10/29/2019, Entered: 10/29/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Festin LaRoss on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (LaRoss, Diane)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by Brad Raffensperger.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/28/2019, Entered: 10/28/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. COS of Discovery Materials for Filing with the Court (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 of State-Defendants-00042037 To State-Defendants-00078027 (October 16, 2019) by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 of State-Defendants-00040888 To State-Defendants-00042036 (October 9, 2019) by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 of State-Defendants-00036316 To State-Defendants-00040887 (October 8, 2019) by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 of State-Defendants-00015813 To State-Defendants-00036315 (October 4, 2019) by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: 10/24/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 of State-Defendants-00000001 To State-Defendants-00009070 (August 16, 2019) by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 2019 10 23 COS of Discovery Materials for filing with the Court by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/23/2019, Entered: 10/23/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                NOTICE Plaintiffs' Second Supplemental Expert Disclosures by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (Bryan, Leslie) Modified on 10/24/2019 to correct text from all caps (rjs).
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Notice of E-filing Requirement
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 16-01 as to Suzanne Smith Williams re [111] Notice of Appearance. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/21/2019, Entered: 10/21/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne Smith Williams on behalf of Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/16/2019, Entered: 10/16/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service Plaintiffs Fourth RFP by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                        APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [108] APPLICATION for Admission of Nina C. Gupta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8995280). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Nina C. Gupta added appearing on behalf of Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (pmb)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                          APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [109] APPLICATION for Admission of Norman G. Anderson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8995314). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.. Attorney Norman G. Anderson added appearing on behalf of Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (pmb)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019, Terminated: 11/13/2019 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Admission of Norman G. Anderson Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8995314). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019, Terminated: 11/13/2019 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Nina C. Gupta Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-8995280). Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY OF HARD COPY AND ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 10/9/2019. (tcc)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 Proposed Consent Order
                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Order Governing Discovery of Hard Copy and Electronically Stored Information. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service for documents (GA00000001 - GA01226019) in response to Request No. 20 to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents and Things to the Georgia Office of Secretary of State by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Tyson, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: 9/27/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service Deposition Notices for Worley Harp and Sullivan (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: 9/26/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Lake, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service for documents (STATE-DEFENDANTS-00015806 - STATE-DEFENDANTS-00015812) in response to Request No. 19 to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents and Things to the Georgia Office of Secretary of State by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Tyson, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley Of Leave of Absence (Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for Plaintiffs Third Request for Production of Documents to the Georgia Office of the Secretary of State by Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 of Defendant Harps Second Requests for Production of Documents to Fair Fight Action, Inc.; Notice of Subpoena to New Georgia Project, Inc.; Notice of Subpoena to AFG Group, Inc.; and Notice of Subpoena to Democratic Party of Georgia, Inc. by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Lake, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: 9/20/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service for documents (STATE-DEFENDANTS-00009255 - STATE-DEFENDANTS-00015805) in response to Request No. 1 to Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents and Things to the Georgia Office of Secretary of State and Request No. 19 to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents and Things to the Georgia Office of Secretary of State by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Tyson, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 Certificate of Service for documents (STATE-DEFENDANTS-00009071 - STATE-DEFENDANTS-00009254) produced by State Defendants in response to Request No. 18 to Plaintiffs' Second Request for Production of Documents and Things to the Georgia Office of Secretary of State by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Tyson, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: 9/17/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoenas (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: 9/10/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Lake, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                          DOCKET ORDER granting [89] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sarah A. Dowd terminated as counsel for Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/5/2019. (pdw)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Submission to District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                            Submission of [89] MOTION to Withdraw Sarah A. Dowd as Attorney to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Defendants' First Supplemental Expert Disclosures by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley re [79] Scheduling Order, (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Dr. Thomas Brunell Curriculum Vitae, # (2) Exhibit Sean P. Trende, Esq. Curriculum Vitae, # (3) Exhibit Dr. Janet R. Thornton Curriculum Vitae)(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                                  Expert Report of Dr. Adrienne Jones by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                                    Expert Report of Dr. Khalilah L. Brown-Dean by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019, Terminated: 9/5/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw Sarah A. Dowd as Attorney with Brief In Support by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Dowd, Sarah)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/15/2019, Entered: 8/15/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Von A. DuBose on behalf of Fair Fight Action, Inc (DuBose, Von)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/12/2019, Entered: 8/12/2019 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. Plaintiffs First Supplemental Expert Disclosures (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: 8/6/2019 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Initial Disclosures by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/26/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                (FILED IN ERROR)TRANSCRIPT of the Motions Hearing Proceedings held on July 11, 2019, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac) Modified on 7/26/2019 (kac).
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 7/11/19 (Motions Hrg), before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley. A full directory of court reporters and their contact information can be found at www.gand.uscourts.gov/directory-court-reporters. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2019. (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Filing Transcript) (pjm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: 7/17/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Materials by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc.(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/15/2019. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/15/2019, Entered: 7/15/2019 Expert Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Initial Disclosures by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc.(Lawrence, Allegra) Modified on 7/16/2019 (rjs).
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: 7/11/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery is November 15, 2019. Dispositive Motions due January 15, 2020. Proposed pretrial order due March 4, 2020. The Court recognizes from the discussions at the July 11, 2019 scheduling conference that there will possibly be a need for a discovery extension. The Court will be open to any such request from either party upon proper motion and rule at the appropriate time. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 7/11/2019. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/11/2019, Entered: 7/11/2019 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Scheduling Conference held on 7/11/2019. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Order on motion for discoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part [70] Plaintiffs' Motion to Open Discovery and For a Scheduling Conference. Discovery shall begin on July 15, 2019. In addition, a scheduling conference will be held on Thursday, July 11, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. (Courtroom 1907, US Courthouse, Atlanta, Georgia). Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 6/28/2019. (pdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/28/2019, Entered: 6/28/2019 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY BRIEF re [70] MOTION to Open Discovery and for a Scheduling Conference filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in ATLA Courtroom 1907 before Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/25/2019, Entered: 6/25/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re [70] MOTION to Open Discovery and for a Scheduling Conference filed by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Tyson, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/20/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019 Leave of Absence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 19-23, 2019; November 14-15, 2019, by Joshua Barrett Belinfante. (Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER: Sample Proposed Protective Order re [72] Notice of Filing. (Lawrence, Allegra) Modified on 6/20/2019 to add hyperlink (rjs).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/19/2019 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Corrected Exhibit by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (Lawrence, Allegra) Modified on 6/20/2019 to correct filer information (rjs).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/13/2019, Entered: 6/13/2019 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to [41] Amended Complaint by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. Discovery ends on 11/12/2019.(Tyson, Bryan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019, Terminated: 6/28/2019 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Open Discovery and for a Scheduling Conference with Brief In Support by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C)(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Discovery Materials by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: 5/30/2019 Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: 5/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Francis Jacoutot on behalf of Brad Raffensperger (Jacoutot, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re [48] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/6/2019, Entered: 5/6/2019 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Support re [48] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of the Motions Hearing Proceedings held on April 29, 2019, before Judge Steve C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber Andy Ashley, Telephone number 404-215-1478. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/23/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/3/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/31/2019. Attachments: # (1) Notice of Filing of Official Transcript) (kac)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/29/2019, Entered: 4/30/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Steve C. Jones: Hearing held on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Oral argument heard. Matter taken under advisement by the Court with written order to follow in due course. [48]Motion to Dismiss TAKEN UNDER ADVISEMENT (Court Reporter Andy Ashley)(rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/26/2019, Entered: 4/26/2019 Order on Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the CourtroomCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [61] Plaintiffs' Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in Courtroom 1907 on 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/26/2019. (pdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: 4/25/2019, Terminated: 4/26/2019 Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to Bring Audio/Visual/Electronic Equipment in the Courtroom with Brief In Support by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/23/2019, Entered: 4/23/2019 Leave of Absence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): September 30, through October 11, 2019, by Vincent Robert Russo, Jr. (Russo, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/22/2019, Entered: 4/22/2019, Terminated: 4/22/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplement to [58] MOTION To Postpone Hearing and Order Briefing [48] Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Plaintiffs' Correspondence)(Belinfante, Joshua) Modified on 4/23/2019 (rjs).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  order on motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET ORDER denying [58] [59] Motions to Postpone Hearing and Order Briefing. The hearing on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [48] will proceed as scheduled on April 29, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Courtroom 1907, Richard B. Russell Federal Building, Atlanta, Georgia). Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/22/2019. (pdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/19/2019, Entered: 4/19/2019, Terminated: 4/22/2019 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION To Postpone Hearing and Order Briefing [48] MOTION to Dismiss by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certified Copy of Act 24 HB 316, # (2) Exhibit HB 316 as Passed, # (3) Exhibit Letter to A. Lawrence-Hardy, # (4) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly K. Anderson on behalf of Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Anderson, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on Defendants' Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint (Doc. No. [48]) on April 29, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. (Courtroom 1907, Richard B. Russell Federal Building, Atlanta, Georgia). Each side will be allotted one hour for argument. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/8/2019. (rjs) Modified on 4/22/2019 (rjs).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: 4/8/2019 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: The State Defendants' [35] Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint is DEEMED MOOT. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 4/8/2019. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Submission to District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submission of [48] MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 Leave of Absence
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): 6/3/19 - 6/13/19, by Bryan P. Tyson. (Tyson, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/2/2019, Entered: 4/2/2019 Reply Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY BRIEF re [48] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DOCKET ORDER granting [46] Letter to Clerk of Court (construed as a) MOTION to Withdraw Lovita T. Tandy as Attorney by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, IncMotion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lovita T. Tandy terminated. Entered by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/25/2019. (pdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Submission to District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Submission of [46] MOTION to Withdraw Lovita T. Tandy as Attorney to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: 3/19/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE re [48] MOTION to Dismiss filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: re:[44] Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. This matter is assigned to a four (4) month discovery track. Discovery and all related deadlines will proceed in accordance the Local Rules of this Court as well as the Federal Rules of Federal Procedure following the Court's ruling on the outstanding motion to dismiss. Plaintiffs may renew their request for a scheduling conference at that time if they wish to do so. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/15/2019. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: 3/15/2019 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [37] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Jeremy Hale Ershow. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 3/15/2019. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Jeremy Hale Ershow re [50] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. OF DISCOVERY MATERIALS (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019, Terminated: 5/30/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: # (1) Brief Defendants' Brief in Support of Their Renewed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint)(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019 Notice of E-filing Requirement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY pursuant to Standing Order 16-01 as to Lovita T. Tandy re [46] MOTION to Withdraw Lovita T. Tandy as Attorney. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/4/2019, Entered: 3/5/2019 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Clerk of Court (construed as a) MOTION to Withdraw Lovita T. Tandy as Attorney by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 Initial Disclosures
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Initial Disclosures by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc, Care in Action, Inc, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, Inc, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/27/2019, Entered: 2/27/2019 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Rule 5.4 by Seth Harp, Brad Raffensperger, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley.(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Submission to District Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Submission of [35] MOTION to Dismiss to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Certificate of Interested Persons by Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc., Care in Action, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., Fair Fight Action, The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc.. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/19/2019, Entered: 2/19/2019 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against Seth Harp, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley, Brad Raffenspergerwith Jury Demand filed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action, Ebenezer Baptist Church of Atlanta, Georgia, Inc., The Sixth Episcopal District, Inc., Baconton Missionary Baptist Church, Inc., Virginia-Highland Church, Inc..(Lawrence, Allegra) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [37] APPLICATION for Admission of Jeremy Hale Ershow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8436966). Attorney Jeremy Hale Ershow added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [35] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Edward Lake on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Lake, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Carey Allen Miller on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Miller, Carey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019, Terminated: 3/15/2019 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Jeremy Hale Ershow Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8436966)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/7/2019, Entered: 2/7/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Robert Russo, Jr on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley (Russo, Vincent)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019, Terminated: 4/8/2019 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint with Brief In Support by Robyn A. Crittenden, Seth Harp, Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson, State Election Board, Rebecca N. Sullivan, David J. Worley. (Attachments: # (1) Brief Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Belinfante, Joshua)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: 1/24/2019 Notice of filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COURT'S NOTICE Of Filing INSTRUCTIONS FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE STEVE C. JONES. (pdw)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [31] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Kali Nneka Bracey. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/23/2019. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Kali Nneka Bracey re [33] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [31] APPLICATION for Admission of Kali Nneka Bracey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8378357). Attorney Kali Nneka Bracey added appearing on behalf of Fair Fight Action (pmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/15/2019, Entered: 1/15/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan P. Tyson on behalf of Robyn A. Crittenden (Tyson, Bryan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/10/2019, Entered: 1/10/2019, Terminated: 1/23/2019 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Kali Nneka Bracey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8378357)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/2/2019, Entered: 1/2/2019 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [27] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Scott Steven Bernstein. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 1/2/2019. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Return of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN of [19] APPLICATION for Admission of Kali Nneka Bracey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8321700) to attorney for correction re: courts. (pmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [27] APPLICATION for Admission of Scott Steven Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8335642). Attorney Scott Bernstein added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [14] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Thomas R. Bundy, III. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/28/2018. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: 12/28/2018 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [13] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Dara Sircus Lindenbaum. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/28/2018. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Thomas R. Bundy, III re [29] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Dara Sircus Lindenbaum re [28] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018, Terminated: 1/2/2019 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Scott Steven Bernstein Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8335642)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. Rebecca N. Sullivan waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. Seth Harp waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. State Election Board waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. David J. Worley waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Fair Fight Action, Care in Action. Robyn A. Crittenden waiver mailed on 11/28/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Notice of change of address
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address for Leslie J. Bryan, counsel for Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [13] APPLICATION for Admission of Dara Sircus Lindenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8304297). Attorney Dara Lindenbaum added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (cdg)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [14] APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas R. Bundy, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8304391). Attorney Thomas Robinson Bundy, III added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018, Terminated: 1/2/2019 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Admission of Kali Nneka Bracey Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8321700)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Bryan, Leslie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [12] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Sarah R. Fink. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/11/2018. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [11] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Matthew G. Kaiser. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/11/2018. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [10] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Andrew D. Herman. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/11/2018. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: 12/11/2018 Order on Application for Admission PHVCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [9] Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Petitioner Sarah A. Dowd. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 12/11/2018. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Sarah R. Fink re [18] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Matthew G. Kaiser re [17] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Andrew D. Herman re [16] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Clerks Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Sarah A. Dowd re [15] Order on Application for Admission PHV. (rjs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [12] APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah R. Fink Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296521). Attorney Sarah R. Fink added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [11] APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew G. Kaiser Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296518). Attorney Matthew G. Kaiser added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [10] APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew D. Herman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296499). Attorney Andrew D. Herman added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Approval of Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: [9] APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah A. Dowd Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296407). Attorney Sarah A. Dowd added appearing on behalf of Care in Action, Fair Fight Action (pmb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018, Terminated: 12/28/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              APPLICATION for Admission of Thomas R. Bundy, III Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8304391)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018, Terminated: 12/28/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for Admission of Dara Sircus Lindenbaum Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8304297)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018, Terminated: 12/11/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah R. Fink Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296521)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018, Terminated: 12/11/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPLICATION for Admission of Matthew G. Kaiser Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296518)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018, Terminated: 12/11/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Admission of Andrew D. Herman Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296499)by Care in Action, Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018, Terminated: 12/11/2018 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Admission of Sarah A. Dowd Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-8296407)by Fair Fight Action. (Lawrence, Allegra)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Certificate of Interested Persons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Interested Persons by Care in Action and Fair Fight Action. (eop)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Electronic Summons Issued as to Rebecca N. Sullivan. (eop)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Electronic Summons Issued as to State Election Board. (eop)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Electronic Summons Issued as to Seth Harp. (eop)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Electronic Summons Issued as to Ralph F. (Rusty) Simpson. (eop)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Electronic Summons Issued as to David J. Worley. (eop)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Electronic Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Summons Issued as to Robyn A. Crittenden. (eop)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: 11/27/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Fair Fight Action and Care in Action. (Filing fee $400.00, receipt number 113E-8292516) (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 93 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?