Parsa et al v. Google L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:19-cv-02407-CAB-AHG
Magistrate Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo, presiding

Tags
Last Updated June 1, 2020 at 2:25 PM DT (11.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

WARNING

This court case contains legal filings with known false information that is being misused by right-wing media and conspiracy theorists. Do not rely upon the information you find here.

No Logo Christians, Plaintiff
No Logo Cyrus A. Parsa, Plaintiff
No Logo Falun Dafa Practitioners, Plaintiff
No Logo John Does 1-Unlimited, Plaintiff
No Logo Journalists, Plaintiff
No Logo Judges, Plaintiff
No Logo Lawyers, Plaintiff
No Logo The AI Organization, Inc, Plaintiff
No Logo Tibetans, Plaintiff
No Logo Uyghurs, Plaintiff
No Logo Victims of Persecution, Rape, Torture, Concentration Camps, Sex, Human, and Organ Trafficking and Organ Harvesting in China, Hong Kong, America and Around the World, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Alphabet, Inc., Defendant
Google, Inc. Unknown Role, Google, Inc.
Unknown Role, Care.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, CapitalG 2015 LP
Unknown Role, CapitalG 2015 GP LLC
No Logo CISON PR NewsWire, Defendant
No Logo DeepMind Inc, Defendant
Musk, Elon Reeve Musk, Elon Reeve, Defendant
Officially listed as "Elon Musk"
Tesla, Inc. CEO, Tesla, Inc., October 15, 2008 - Present
Beneficial Owner, Excession LLC
SolarCity Corporation Chairman of the Board, SolarCity Corporation
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant
Google LLC Google LLC, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-29, Defendant
No Logo LARRY PAGE, Defendant
Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot Zuckerberg, Mark Elliot, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mark Zuckerberg"
Neuralink Corporation Neuralink Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Neuralink Inc"
Brin, Sergey Brin, Sergey, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sergey Brin"
Google, Inc. Unknown Role, Google, Inc.
Unknown Role, Alphabet, Inc.
No Logo Pichai, Sundar, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sundar Pichai"
Unknown Role, Jive Software, Inc.
Google, Inc. Unknown Role, Google, Inc.
Unknown Role, Alphabet, Inc.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Office San Diego
Filed 12/16/2019
Jury Demand None
Demand $9999000
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331cv Fed. Question
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County San Diego
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/1/2020, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Summons Issued
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          LREF
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Summons issued
          Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jmr)
            LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/16/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 ComplaintCourt Filing
            COMPLAINT against Alphabet Inc, Sergey Brin, CISON PR NewsWire, DeepMind Inc, Facebook Inc, Google L.L.C., John Does 1-29, Larry Page, Elon Musk, Neuralink Inc, Sundar Pichai, Tesla Inc, Mark Zuckerberg ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS117684.), filed by John Does 1-Unlimited, Tibetans, The AI Organization, Inc, Cyrus A. Parsa, Christians, Victims of Persecution, Rape, Torture, Concentration Camps, Sex, Human, and Organ Trafficking and Organ Harvesting in China, Hong Kong, America and Around the World, Lawyers, Judges, Falun Dafa Practitioners, Journalists, Uyghurs. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02407-CAB-AHG. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Parsa, Cyrus A.)(jmr)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 26,666 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?