Lucban v. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, Case No. RG19047138

Tags
Last Updated September 9, 2021 at 12:31 PM EDT (3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lucban, Danilo, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla Energy Operations, Inc. Tesla Energy Operations, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Zambrano, Ronald L, Attorney
Case Type Civil
Complaint Type Other Employment
Case Subtype General Civil
Filing Location Rene C. Davidson Alameda County Courthouse
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None ?
Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Entered (3 Pages)
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None ?
    Request Re: Dismissal with prejudice - entire action Filed (3 Pages)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 23 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None ?
      Compliance Hearing 06/22/2021 03:00 PM D- 19
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None ?
        Case Management Conference Order Issued (1 Page)
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/27/2021, Entered: None ?
          Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None ?
            Compliance Hearing 04/27/2021 03:00 PM D- 19 (1 Page)
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 19 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None ?
              Hearing Vacated: Case Management Conf Continuance 03/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 19
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None ?
                Notice of Settlement Filed for Danilo Lucban (2 Pages)
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None ?
                  Joint Statement Regarding Status of Arbitration. Filed (3 Pages)
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 16 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                    Case Management Conf Continuance 03/16/2021 03:00 PM D- 19
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                      Case Management Conference Order Issued (2 Pages)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                        Compliance Hearing Commenced and Completed (1 Page)
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 13 Filed: 11/5/2020, Entered: None ?
                          Joint Statement Regarding Compliance Hearing Filed
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/12/2020, Entered: None ?
                            Hearing Reset to Compliance Hearing 11/10/2020 03:00 PM D- 19 (1 Page)
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2020, Entered: None ?
                              Notice of Judicial Reassignment for All Purposes Issued (4 Pages)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 10 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                Compliance Hearing 11/09/2020 09:00 AM D- 16
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                  Initial Case Management Conference Hearing Dropped from dept: 16 date: 04/30/2020 time: 09:00 AM
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/10/2020, Entered: None ?
                                    Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Granted (5 Pages)
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None ?
                                      Stipulation and Order Re: Other Ex Parte Filed: (5 Pages)
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None ?
                                        Proof of Service on Complaint As to Tesla Energy Operations, Inc Filed (2 Pages)
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None ?Court Filing
                                          Notice of Assignment of Judge for All Purposes Issued (3 Pages)
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2019, Entered: None ?
                                            Initial Case Management Conference 04/30/2020 09:00 AM D- 16 (2 Pages)
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                              Summons on Complaint Issued and Filed (1 Page)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed for Danilo Lucban (2 Pages)
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: None ?
                                                  Complaint - Other Employment Filed (11 Pages)

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 72 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?