Earley, Seth vs. Tesla Motors MA, Inc. et al
State Civil Lawsuit Middlesex County Superior Court, Case No. 1981CV03557

Tags
Last Updated December 20, 2019 at 11:30 AM ST (1.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Earley, Seth, Plaintiff
v.
Tesla, Inc. Tesla, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Telsa, Inc."
Tesla Motors MA, Inc. Tesla Motors MA, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 28 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: 10/2/2020 Court Filing
Endorsement on Motion to Stay Pending Arbitration (#8.0): ALLOWED The motion is ALLOWED. The court has considered the arguments of counsel, reviewed the motors of the parties and reviewed the law. The count finds that there is a valid arbitration agreement. Judge: Doolin, Hon. Michael
    Blank 27 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: 9/30/2020
    Matter taken under advisement: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 09/30/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Held - Under advisement Hon. Michael Doolin, Presiding Comments: Via Zoom Staff: Amanda Ward, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
      Blank 26 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020
      The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 09/10/2020 16:16:08 Notice Sent To: Evans Huber, Esq. Frieze Cramer Rosen & Huber LLP 60 Walnut St, Wellesley Hills, MA 02481 Notice Sent To: Peter Craig Netburn, Esq. Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing, P.C. 265 Franklin St 7th Floor, Boston, MA 02110 Notice Sent To: Deirdre Donovan Foley, Esq. Hermes Netburn O'Connor & Spearing, P.C. 265 Franklin St 7th Floor, Boston, MA 02110 Notice Sent To: Deirdre Donovan Foley, Esq. Hermes Netburn O'Connor & Spearing, P.C. 265 Franklin St 7th Floor, Boston, MA 02110 Notice Sent To: Peter Craig Netburn, Esq. Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing, P.C. 265 Franklin St 7th Floor, Boston, MA 02110
        Blank 25 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: 9/10/2020
        Event Result:: Motion Hearing scheduled on: 09/30/2020 02:00 PM Has been: Rescheduled For the following reason: Transferred to another session Hon. Helene Kazanjian, Presiding Staff: Dia S Roberts-Tyler, Assistant Clerk Magistrate
          Blank 24 Filed: 8/28/2020, Entered: 8/28/2020
          The following form was generated: Notice to Appear Sent On: 08/28/2020 14:01:26 Notice Sent To: Evans Huber, Esq. Frieze Cramer Rosen & Huber LLP 60 Walnut St, Wellesley Hills, MA 02481 Notice Sent To: Peter Craig Netburn, Esq. Hermes, Netburn, O'Connor & Spearing, P.C. 265 Franklin St 7th Floor, Boston, MA 02110 Notice Sent To: Deirdre Donovan Foley, Esq. Hermes Netburn O'Connor & Spearing, P.C. 265 Franklin St 7th Floor, Boston, MA 02110
            Blank 23 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
            Affidavit of Peter C Netburn
              Blank 22 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
              Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc., Telsa, Inc.'s Reply in support of defendants' motion to stay arbitration
                Blank 21 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                Affidavit of Evans Huber, Esq in support of plaintiff's opposition
                  Blank 20 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                  Opposition to defendants' motion to stay pending arbitration filed by Seth Earley
                    Blank 19 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                    Affidavit of Deirdre D Foley in support of defendants' motion
                      Blank 18 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                      Tesla Motors MA, Inc., Telsa, Inc.'s Memorandum in support of motion to stay pending arbitration
                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020
                        Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc., Telsa, Inc.'s Motion to stay pending arbitration
                          Blank 16 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020
                          Received from Defendant Telsa, Inc.: Answer to First Amended Complaint with claim for trial by jury. See P#7
                            Blank 15 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: 7/22/2020
                            Received from Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc.: Answer to First Amended Complaint with claim for trial by jury;
                              Blank 14 Filed: 3/18/2020, Entered: 3/18/2020 Court Filing
                              Endorsement on Motion to file a response of pleading (#6.0): ALLOWED Judge: Kazanjian, Hon. Helene
                                Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                Attorney appearance On this date Peter Craig Netburn, Esq. added for Defendant Telsa, Inc.
                                  Blank 12 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                  Attorney appearance On this date Deirdre Donovan Foley, Esq. added for Defendant Telsa, Inc.
                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                    Attorney appearance On this date Deirdre Donovan Foley, Esq. added for Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc.
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                      Attorney appearance On this date Peter Craig Netburn, Esq. added for Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc.
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: 3/10/2020
                                        Defendants Tesla Motors MA, Inc., Telsa, Inc.'s Assented to Motion to extend time to respond to plaintiff's complaint
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020
                                          Service Returned for Defendant Telsa, Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent;
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: 3/2/2020
                                            Service Returned for Defendant Tesla Motors MA, Inc.: Service through person in charge / agent;
                                              Blank 6 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020
                                              Amended: amended complaint filed by Seth Earley First Amended Complaint
                                                Blank 5 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019
                                                Demand for jury trial entered.
                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019
                                                  Civil action cover sheet filed.
                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019
                                                    Attorney appearance On this date Evans Huber, Esq. added as Private Counsel for Plaintiff Seth Earley
                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019
                                                      Case assigned to: DCM Track F - Fast Track was added on 12/05/2019
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: 12/5/2019
                                                        Original civil complaint filed.

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 470 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?