Knight v. Standard Chartered Bank et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:19-cv-11739

Tags
Last Updated March 31, 2021 at 1:38 PM DT (5.9 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anshuman Chandra, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by mck-lawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Michael McSweeney +1 703 621 3300 patrick@mck-lawyers.com
No Logo Julian Knight, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by mck-lawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick Michael McSweeney +1 703 621 3300 patrick@mck-lawyers.com
v.
Standard Chartered Bank PLC Standard Chartered Bank PLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Standard Chartered Bank"
Standard Chartered Bank DIFC Standard Chartered Bank DIFC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Standard Chartered Bank (Dubai)"
No Logo Standard Chartered Bank (New York), Defendant
Office Foley Square
Filed 12/23/2019
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 375 - Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause Section 31 U.S.C. § 3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County NewYork
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/31/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: None Letter
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Oral Argument
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support (non-motion)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support (non-motion)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/20/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/26/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/5/2020, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Oral Argument
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Dismiss
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/10/2020, Entered: None Proposed Stipulation and Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Statement of Relatedness
                                                              RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Patrick M.McSweeney re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-11117(PAE). Document filed by Anshuman Chandra, Julian Knight.(McSweeney, Patrick)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                MOTION for Patrick M.McSweeney to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18348756. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anshuman Chandra, Julian Knight.(McSweeney, Patrick)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Civil Cover Sheet
                                                                  CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (McSweeney, Patrick)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/23/2019, Entered: 12/23/2019 Complaint
                                                                    COMPLAINT against Standard Chartered Bank, Standard Chartered Bank (Dubai), Standard Chartered Bank (New York). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18347968)Document filed by Julian Knight, Anshuman Chandra.(McSweeney, Patrick)
                                                                      LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?