WALDEN FARMS, INC. v. FMS CORP., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:01-cv-00578-WGB

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Walden Farms, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stamell & Schaffer, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jared Bennett Stamell +1 212 566 4047 +1 212 566 4061 stamell@ssnyc.com
v.
No Logo Asahi Kasei Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "ASAHI KASEI CORP."

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Mason Meisels +1 212 225 2000
No Logo Fms Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FMS CORP."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
Office Newark
Filed 2/5/2001
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Transfer/Remand - MDL Transfer
County XX US, Outside State
Terminated 6/29/2001
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BM, CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Interdistrict transfer to Eastern District of Pennsylvania (aa)
    LREF
    Blank 15 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 Order
    Certified ORDER of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring action to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (aa)
      LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 4/3/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001 Response in Opposition to Motion
      RESPONSE by pltf. Ivax Corp, Freeda Vitamins, Par Pharmaceuticsal and Horizon Lab. in opposition to plft. JAG's motion (nr)
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Remark
        PLTF'S IVAX CORPORATION BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE AND TRANSFER (nr)
          LREF
          Blank 12 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001 Response to Motion
          RESPONSE to [0-1] motion to consolidate and transfer case to the N.D. of Illinois (nr)
            LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 3/12/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001 OrderCourt Filing
            CONSENT ORDER, extending time to answer the amended consolidated complt. until 30 days after service of the consolidated amended complt. ( signed by Magistrate Judge Madeline C. Arleo ) (nr)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Certification
              CERTIFICATION of DAVID MEISELS on behalf of ASAHI KASEI CORP. Re: related cases (nr)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001, Terminated: 6/29/2001 Answer
                ANSWER to Complaint by ASAHI KASEI CORP. (nr)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to FMS CORP. 2/12/01 Answer due on 3/4/01 for FMS CORP. (nr)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/7/2001 Summons Returned Executed
                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to ASAHI KASEI CORP. 2/12/01 Answer due on 3/4/01 for ASAHI KASEI CORP. (nr)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Motion to Reassign Case
                      Copy of Notice of MOTION to transfer case to the N.D. of Illinois by INTERNATIONAL NUTRITION Motion [0-1] motion Brief with certsvc and exhibits attached (cs)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/2/2001, Entered: 3/8/2001 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
                        APPLICATION by FMS CORP. and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 3/5/01 for FMS CORP. (nr)
                          LREF
                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/1/2001, Entered: 3/2/2001 Certificate Of Service.
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of copies of Schedule A (nr)
                            LREF
                            Blank 4 Filed: 2/26/2001, Entered: 2/27/2001 Letter
                            LETTER dated 2/23/01, received 2/26/01 w/attached copies of pla Heller Seasoning & Ingredients' Motion to Consolidate and Coordinate etc. and to Transfer Actions to USDC SD NY or to Northern District of Ilinois and supporting memo of law before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation [MDL Docket No. 1402 In Re MICROCRYSTALLINE CELLULOSE ANTITRUST LITIGATION]. [Reference to Walden Farms is found on page 4 of Brief] (ar)
                              LREF
                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/9/2001, Entered: 2/13/2001 ~Notice (other)
                              Copy of NOTICE of by ASAHI KASEI CORP. of joinder and adoption of deft. FMC Corporation's motion for transfer (nr)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2 Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001, Terminated: 6/29/2001 Case Assigned/ReassignedCourt Filing
                                NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate Judge Madeline Cox Arleo (DS)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/6/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Summons Issued
                                  SUMMONS(ES) issued for FMS CORP., ASAHI KASEI CORP. ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (DS)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 2/5/2001, Entered: 2/6/2001 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 150.00; Receipt No. 279438 (DS)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 284 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?